California Central District Court
Judge:Cynthia Valenzuela
Referred: Sheri Pym
Case #: 5:24-cv-01963
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 12, 2025 2:31 AM PDT
Defendant
Toyota Motor North America, Inc.
Represented By
John P. Hooper
King And Spalding LLP
contact info
Alexandra Julia Kennedy-Breit
King And Spalding LLP
contact info
Defendant
Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By
John P. Hooper
King And Spalding LLP
contact info
Alexandra Julia Kennedy-Breit
King And Spalding LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Abdul Syed
Represented By
Trenton H. Mann
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis And Miles, P.C.
contact info
W. Daniel Miles, III
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis And Miles PC
contact info
Timothy G Blood
Blood Hurst And O'Reardon LLP
contact info
Alexandra Julia Kennedy-Breit
King And Spalding LLP
contact info
J. Mitch Williams
Beasley Allen Crow
contact info
H. Clay Barnett, III
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis And Miles PC
contact info
Dylan T. Martin
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis And Miles PC
contact info
Thomas Joseph O'Reardon, II
Blood Hurst And O'Reardon LLP
contact info
James Mitchell Williams
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis And Miles PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
46 46 misc Statement Wed 02/19 4:48 PM
STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement re: Order44 . (Kennedy-Breit, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
45 45 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 02/14 10:19 AM
STANDING ORDER For Civil Cases upon filing of the complaint by Judge Cynthia Valenzuela. (cbr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
44 44 4 pgs order Order Thu 02/06 11:35 AM
REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Cynthia Valenzuela. Please refer to the Order for complete details. (cbr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
43 43 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Wed 01/29 1:37 PM
Judge Cynthia Valenzuela's designated initials are CV. On all documents filed in this case on or after January 29, 2025, substitute the initials CV after the case number in place of CVD. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cbr)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
42 42 cs_rasgn Chief District Judge Transferring Case Tue 01/28 10:57 AM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#25-024) approved by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Cynthia Valenzuela, this case is transferred from Judge Kenly Kiya Kato to the calendar of Judge Cynthia Valenzuela for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:24-cv-01963-CVD-SPx. (ap)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
41 41 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Fri 01/17 1:46 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: The Court is in receipt of the parties' stipulation for an order regarding the briefing schedule for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Dkt. 39. The stipulation is GRANTED. Therefore, Plaintiff shall file an Opposition no later than April 17, 2025. Any reply shall remain due on May 1, 2025. In addition, future requests shall be accompanied by a proposed order as required by the Local Rules. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo)
Related: [-]
40 40 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Fri 01/17 11:57 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Stipulation for Order39 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
39 39 3 pgs stip Order Thu 01/16 1:11 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Order Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Abdul Syed.(Attorney Alexandra Julia Kennedy-Breit added to party Abdul Syed(pty:pla))(Kennedy-Breit, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
38 38 motion Dismiss (cause or other) Wed 01/08 12:09 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Defendants' Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/15/2025 at 09:30 AM before Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (Kennedy-Breit, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
37 37 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Tue 12/03 1:28 PM
ORDER GRANTING SECOND STIPULATION REQUESTING EXTENSION OF DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC.'S AND TOYOTA MOTOR NORTH AMERICA, INC.'S RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. RE: Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Complaint,36 . (aco)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
36 36 4 pgs stip Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 12/02 2:44 PM
Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc..(Kennedy-Breit, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Alexandra Kennedy-Breit,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
35 35 1 pgs order Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/24 9:38 AM
ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato Granting34 Non-Resident Attorney John P Hooper APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., designating Alexandra J Kennedy-Breit as local counsel. (bm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
34 34 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Tue 10/22 4:38 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John P. Hooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. CCACDC-38445392) filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Kennedy-Breit, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
29 29 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Wed 09/25 9:35 AM
NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: In light of the Court's prior order granting the pro hac vice application of Henry Clay Barnett, III, dkt.23 , the motion to appear pro hac vice, dkt.28 , is deemed MOOT. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
28 28 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Tue 09/24 4:16 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney H. Clay Barnett, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Abdul Syed (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 9/20/2024, Receipt No. ACACDC-38253523) filed by plaintiff Abdul Syed. (Blood, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, September 23, 2024
26 26 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 09/23 12:48 PM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. APPLICATION of Attorney Trenton H. Mann to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Abdul Syed, designating Timothy G. Blood as local counsel is GRANTED.; granting21 Non-Resident Attorney Trenton H. Mann. (aco)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 09/23 12:45 PM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. APPLICATION of Attorney Dylan T. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Abdul Syed, designating Timothy G. Blood as local counsel is GRANTED.; granting20 Non-Resident Attorney Dylan T. Martin. (aco)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 09/23 12:44 PM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. APPLICATION of Attorney J. Mitch Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Abdul Syed, designating Timothy G. Blood as local counsel is GRANTED.; granting19 Non-Resident Attorney J. Mitch Williams. (aco)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 09/23 12:42 PM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. APPLICATION of Attorney H. Clay Barnett, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Abdul Syed, designating Timothy G. Blood as local counsel is GRANTED.; granting18 Non-Resident Attorney H. Clay Barnett, III (aco)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 09/23 12:01 PM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. APPLICATION of W. Daniel "Dee" Miles, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Abdul Syed, designating Timothy G. Blood as local counsel is GRANTED.; granting17 Non-Resident Attorney W. Daniel "Dee" Miles, III. (aco)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
27 27 notice Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form Mon 09/23 4:31 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney H. Clay Barnett, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Abdul Syed (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38253523)18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. (sbou)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Fri 09/20 3:36 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Trenton H. Mann to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Abdul Syed (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38253761) filed by plaintiff Abdul Syed. (Blood, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
20 20 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Fri 09/20 3:33 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Dylan T. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Abdul Syed (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38253720) filed by plaintiff Abdul Syed. (Blood, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
19 19 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Fri 09/20 3:29 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James Mitchell Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Abdul Syed (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38253585) filed by plaintiff Abdul Syed. (Blood, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
18 18 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Fri 09/20 3:24 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney H. Clay Barnett, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Abdul Syed (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38253523) filed by plaintiff Abdul Syed. (Blood, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
17 17 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Fri 09/20 3:20 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney W. Daniel "Dee" Miles, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Abdul Syed (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38253425) filed by plaintiff Abdul Syed. (Blood, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
16 16 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 09/20 2:41 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (npo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
15 15 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 09/18 10:03 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Abdul Syed, upon Defendant Toyota Motor North America, Inc. served on 9/17/2024, answer due 10/8/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, registered agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Blood, Timothy)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 09/18 10:00 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Abdul Syed, upon Defendant Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. served on 9/17/2024, answer due 10/8/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, registered agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Blood, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
13 13 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Fri 09/13 3:32 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Trent H. Mann on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
Related: [-]
12 12 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Fri 09/13 3:30 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Dylan T. Martin on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
Related: [-]
11 11 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Fri 09/13 3:29 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney J. Mitch Williams on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
Related: [-]
10 10 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Fri 09/13 3:28 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney H. Clay Barnett, III on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
Related: [-]
9 9 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Fri 09/13 3:27 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney W. Daniel Miles, III. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 09/13 3:23 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. (et)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 09/13 3:19 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 09/13 3:18 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 09/13 3:18 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Kenly Kiya Kato and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (et)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 09/13 1:59 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Abdul Syed, (Blood, Timothy)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Fri 09/13 1:57 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiff Abdul Syed. (Blood, Timothy)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 09/13 1:54 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Abdul Syed. (Blood, Timothy)
Related: [-]
1 1 85 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 09/13 1:52 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38209513 - Fee: $405, filed by plaintiff Abdul Syed. (Attorney Timothy G Blood added to party Abdul Syed(pty:pla))(Blood, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ex. A,
Att: 2 Ex. B,
Att: 3 Ex. C,
Att: 4 Ex. D,
Att: 5 Ex. E,
Att: 6 Ex. F,
Att: 7 Ex. G,
Att: 8 Ex. H,
Att: 9 Ex. I