Madumelu v. Collins Aerospace et al
Iowa Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Kelly KE Mahoney |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00098 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Sep 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 14, 2024 12:18 AM CDT |
Defendant
Collins Aerospace
|
|
Defendant
Chrissy Michalec
|
|
Defendant
Jose Resendiz Sanchez
|
|
Plaintiff
Afamadi Madumelu
175 Mountain Rest Court SE
Mableton, GA 30126 |
Docket last updated: 09/19/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, September 13, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 09/13 3:11 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION****. (Copy to Plaintiff) (rjs) |
|
Att: 1 New Civil Case Packet | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice - MJ Case Assignment
Fri 09/13 2:54 PM
NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 12/12/2024. (Copy to Plaintiff)) (rjs) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Supplement/Addendum
Fri 09/13 2:47 PM
PRO SE SUPPLEMENT to1 Complaint by Afamadi Madumelu. (PSLC) (NEF to Plaintiff) (rjs) |
|
misc
Fee Receipt
Fri 09/13 2:29 PM
FEE Receipt: $ 405, receipt number 4440 for Civil Filing Fee by Afamadi Madumelu. (rjs) |
||
Thursday, September 12, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Dismissal Ddl)
Fri 09/13 2:25 PM
PRO SE COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Afamadi Madumelu. (PSLC) (NEF to Plaintiff) (rjs) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Supporting Documents |