Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:24-cr-06072
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 15, 2024 12:24 AM MST
Defendant
David Ely Peterson (1)
Represented By
Kristian Harrison Salter
Law Office Of Rubin Salter Jr.
contact info
Material Witness
Material Witnesses
Represented By
Joseph Dimas Rueda, Jr.
Rueda Law Office PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jose Ruben Solis, Jr.
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 1:46 AM MST
Saturday, August 31, 2024
Arrest of David Peterson on 8/31/2024. (JAM) [4:24-mj-02474-N/A-BGM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to David Peterson. (JAM) [4:24-mj-02474-N/A-BGM]
Related: [-]
2 2 AFFIDAVIT FOR DETENTION OF MATERIAL WITNESS by USA as to David Peterson signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald. (JAM) [4:24-mj-02474-N/A-BGM]
Related: [-]
4 4 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald: Initial Appearance for Material Witness in case as to David Peterson held on 9/3/2024. Material Witness(es) are present and in custody. Joseph Rueda appointed as counsel for the material witnesses with appointment type CJA. The Court orders the Material Witnesses temporarily detained in the custody of the United States Marshal pursuant to 18§3144. IT IS ORDERED the United States Attorney shall schedule a date and time for the video deposition of the material witness(es) within 30 days of appearance. (a juvenile material witness within 24 hours) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall preserve video deposition testimony pending resolution of this matter. Material Witness(es) present and state true name to be the following: Luis Maldo Aristeo-Cortez and David Gonzalez-Garcia. Appearances : AUSA Josh Ackerman, duty for the Government, CJA Attorney Joseph Rueda for material witness(es). Material Witness(es) are present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Arturo Garcia, appears telephonically, and assists material witness(es). Related [+] Hearing held 1:25 PM to 1:35 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CXE) [4:24-mj-02474-N/A-BGM]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
5 5 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald: Initial Appearance as to David Peterson held on 9/3/2024. FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT TAKEN. Appointing Kristian Harrison Salter for the defendant with Appointment Type: CJA. Defendant(s) state TRUE NAME to be David Ely Peterson. Further proceedings ordered in defendant's true name. Detention Hearing as to the defendant held on 9/3/2024. Defendant ordered/continued detained pending trial. Interpreter N/A English. Defendant is hearing impaired and using a headset for Court. In the presence of government and defense counsel, the Court orally advises the government of their Brady obligation. Written order to follow. Appearances : AUSA Josh Ackerman, duty for the Government, CJA Attorney Kristian Salter for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Preliminary Hearing set for 9/17/2024 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald. Related [+] Hearing held 2:55 pm to 4:15 pm. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BHA) [4:24-mj-02474-N/A-BGM]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
6 6 ORDER: Under federal law, including Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and all applicable decisions from the Supreme Court and the Ninth Circuit interpreting Brady , the government has a continuing obligation to produce all information or evidence known to the government relating to guilt or punishment that might reasonably be considered favorable to the defendant's case, even if the evidence is not admissible so long as it is reasonably likely to lead to admissible evidence. See United States v. Price , 566 F.3d 900,913 n.14 (9th Cir. 2009). Accordingly, the court orders the government to produce to the defendant in a timely manner all such information or evidence. Information or evidence may be favorable to a defendant's case if it either may help bolster the defendant's case or impeach a prosecutor's witness or other government evidence. If doubt exists, it should be resolved in favor of the defendant with full disclosure being made. If the government believes that a required disclosure would compromise witness safety, victim rights, national security, a sensitive law-enforcement technique, or any other substantial government interest, the government may apply to the Court for a modification of the requirements of this Disclosure Order, which may include in camera review and/or withholding or subjecting to a protective order all or part of the information. This Disclosure Order is entered under Rule 5(f) and does not relieve any party in this matter of any other discovery obligation. The consequences for violating either this Disclosure Order or the government's obligations under Brady include, but are not limited to, the following: contempt, sanction, referral to a disciplinary authority, adverse jury instruction, exclusion of evidence, and dismissal of charges. Nothing in this Disclosure Order enlarges or diminishes the government's obligation to disclose information and evidence to a defendant under Brady , as interpreted and applied under Supreme Court and Ninth Circuit precedent. As the Supreme Court noted, "the government violates the Constitution's Due Process Clause 'if it withholds evidence that is favorable to the defense and material to the defendant's guilt or punishment." ' Turner v. United States , 137 S. Ct. 1885, 1888 (2017), quoting Smith v. Cain , 565 U.S. 73, 75 (2012). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald.(BHA)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) [4:24-mj-02474-N/A-BGM]
Related: [-]
7 7 SEALED CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by David Peterson. (BHA) [4:24-mj-02474-N/A-BGM]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER OF DETENTION as to David Ely Peterson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald on 9/3/2024. (BHA) [4:24-mj-02474-N/A-BGM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
9 9 2 pgs INFORMATION - Felony as to David Ely Peterson (1) count(s) 1, 2. (ARC)
Related: [-]
10 10 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by David Ely Peterson. (ARC)
Related: [-]