Hawkers Intermediate, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 6:24-bk-05079
Lead case is: 6:24-bk-05079
Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Lori V Vaughan |
Case #: | 6:24-bk-04935 |
Case Filed: | Sep 16, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Hawkers Intermediate, LLC
54 W Church St Ste 250
Orlando, FL 32801-3469 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - ORL
Office of the United States Trustee George C Young Federal Building 400 West Washington Street, Suite 1100
Orlando, FL 32801 |
Docket last updated: 57 seconds ago |
Tuesday, September 24, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
order
Appear pro hac vice
Tue 09/24 11:45 AM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice of Allyson B. Smith for Summit Investors Credit IV, LLC; Summit Partners Credit Fund IV, L.P.; Summit Partners Credit Offshore Intermediate Fund IV, L.P.; ABC Funding, LLC, as administrative and collateral agent and Summit Investors Credit IV (UK), L.P.. Upon completion of the required registration form, a temporary login and password will be issued. Filing privileges are limited to this case and any related adversary proceedings. The attorney is directed to file a statement notifying the Clerk when Attorneys involvement in this case is concluded . Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Vivianne) |
|
18 | 18
order
Appear pro hac vice
Tue 09/24 11:15 AM
Order Denying Motion To Appear pro hac vice of Brian E. Schartz of Kirkland & Ellis LLP . Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Vivianne) |
|
17 | 17
5
pgs
order
Joint Administration
Tue 09/24 7:46 AM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration with Cases: 6:24-bk-04935-LVV; 6:24-bk-04936-LVV; 6:24-bk-04937-LVV; 6:24-bk-04938-LVV; 6:24-bk-04940-LVV; 6:24-bk-05083-LVV; 6:24-bk-05086-LVV; 6:24-bk-05100-LVV; 6:24-bk-05087-LVV; 6:24-bk-05088-LVV; 6:24-bk-05097-LVV; 6:24-bk-05098-LVV; 6:24-bk-05089-LVV; 6:24-bk-05090-LVV; 6:24-bk-05091-LVV; 6:24-bk-05092-LVV; 6:24-bk-05084-LVV; 6:24-bk-05101-LVV; 6:24-bk-05102-LVV; 6:24-bk-05103-LVV; 6:24-bk-05104-LVV; 6:24-bk-05094-LVV; 6:24-bk-05095-LVV; 6:24-bk-05099-LVV; 6:24-bk-05096-LVV; 6:24-bk-05085-LVV; 6:24-bk-05081-LVV; 6:24-bk-05080-LVV. Hawkers, LLC, Case No. 6 24-05079 LVV is Designated as the Lead Case. . This case is associated with lead case 6:24-bk-5079. . Service Instructions: R Shuker is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Vivianne) |
|
Monday, September 23, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Motion for Joint Administration
Mon 09/23 1:01 PM
|
|
15 | 15
court
Notice of Hearing / Status Conference / Reaffirmation Hearing
Mon 09/23 12:35 PM
Notice of Status Conference . Hearing scheduled for 9/25/2024 at 02:30 PM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6C, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street . (Aimee) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Motion to Appear pro hac vice (BK)
Mon 09/23 11:37 AM
Motion of Allyson B. Smith of Kirkland & Ellis LLP to Appear pro hac vice Filed by Jordi Guso on behalf of ABC Funding, LLC, as administrative and collateral agent, Summit Investors Credit IV (UK) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Motion to Appear pro hac vice (BK)
Mon 09/23 11:35 AM
Motion of Brian E. Schartz of Kirkland & Ellis LLP to Appear pro hac vice Filed by Jordi Guso on behalf of ABC Funding, LLC, as administrative and collateral agent, Summit Investors Credit IV (UK) |
|
Saturday, September 21, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Sun 09/22 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. . Notice Date 09/21/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, September 20, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest
Sat 09/21 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest . Notice Date 09/20/2024. (Admin.) |
|
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Sat 09/21 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. . Notice Date 09/20/2024. (Admin.) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 09/20 5:13 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jordi Guso on behalf of ABC Funding, LLC, as administrative and collateral agent, Summit Investors Credit IV (UK), L.P., Summit Investors Credit IV, LLC, Summit Partners Credit Fund IV, L.P., Summit Partners Credit Offshore Intermediate Fund IV, L.P.. (Guso, Jordi) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Z - Generic Motion (use only when there is no specific motion event) (BK)
Fri 09/20 1:36 PM
Motion for Status Conference Pursuant to 11 U.S.C.§ 105(d) Filed by Jordi Guso on behalf of Summit Partners Credit Offshore Intermediate Fund IV, L.P., Summit Investors Credit IV, LLC, Summit Investors Credit IV (UK) |
|
Thursday, September 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
court
341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 11 Corp w/Claim Deadline
Thu 09/19 12:48 PM
Amended Notice of Bankruptcy Case as to time ONLY . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/17/2024 at 10:00 AM. U.S. Trustee (Orl) will hold the meeting telephonically. Call in Number: 877-801-2055. Passcode: 8940738#. Proofs of Claims due by 11/25/2024. (Lee Hue, Karla) |
|
Wednesday, September 18, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Thu 09/19 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . Notice Date 09/18/2024. (Admin.) |
|
5 | 5
court
341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 11 Corp w/Claim Deadline
Wed 09/18 12:35 PM
Notice of Bankruptcy Case . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/17/2024 at 09:00 AM. U.S. Trustee (Orl) will hold the meeting telephonically. Call in Number: 877-801-2055. Passcode: 8940738#. Proofs of Claims due by 11/25/2024. (Adrienne) |
|
4 | 4
court
Notice of Deficient Filing (BK)
Wed 09/18 12:30 PM
Notice of Deficient Filing. Missing Summary of Assets, Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs, Disclosure of Compensation, 20 Largest List of Unsecured Creditors, Corporate Ownership Statement, Case Management Summary, Certificate or Resolution Authorizing Debtor to file Bankruptcy Petition. . (Adrienne) |
|
Monday, September 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance on behalf of United States Trustee (Attorneys for U.S. Trustee Only)
Mon 09/16 2:53 PM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Jill E Kelso on behalf of U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - ORL. (Kelso, Jill) |
|
2 | 2
2
pgs
order
Order Authorizing DIP to Operate Business
Mon 09/16 11:58 AM
Order Authorizing Debtor-In-Possession to Operate Business. (ADIclerk) |
|
1 | 1
7
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 09/16 10:25 AM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. (Verify Fee). Verification of Creditor Matrix, and Creditor Matrix Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Filed by R Scott Shuker on behalf of Hawkers Intermediate, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan due by 01/14/2025. Disclosure Statement due by 01/14/2025. (Shuker, R) |
|
crditcrd
Receipt of Filing Fee
Mon 09/16 10:38 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:6:24-bk-04935] ) [misc,volp11a2] (1738.00). Receipt Number A76835334, Amount Paid $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
ADI - Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry)
Mon 09/16 9:00 PM
Debtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at[LINK:http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf] . (ADIclerk) |