Hawkers Growth Fund I, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 6:24-bk-05079
Lead case is: 6:24-bk-05079
Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Grace E Robson |
Case #: | 6:24-bk-04937 |
Case Filed: | Sep 16, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Hawkers Growth Fund I, LLC
54 W Church St Ste 250
Orlando, FL 32801-3469 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - ORL
Office of the United States Trustee George C Young Federal Building 400 West Washington Street, Suite 1100
Orlando, FL 32801 |
Docket last updated: 3 minutes ago |
Tuesday, September 24, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
order
Joint Administration
Tue 09/24 11:52 AM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration with Cases: 6:24-bk-04935-LVV; 6:24-bk-04936-LVV; 6:24-bk-04937-LVV; 6:24-bk-04938-LVV; 6:24-bk-04940-LVV; 6:24-bk-05083-LVV; 6:24-bk-05086-LVV; 6:24-bk-05100-LVV; 6:24-bk-05087-LVV; 6:24-bk-05088-LVV; 6:24-bk-05097-LVV; 6:24-bk-05098-LVV; 6:24-bk-05089-LVV; 6:24-bk-05090-LVV; 6:24-bk-05091-LVV; 6:24-bk-05092-LVV; 6:24-bk-05084-LVV; 6:24-bk-05101-LVV; 6:24-bk-05102-LVV; 6:24-bk-05103-LVV; 6:24-bk-05104-LVV; 6:24-bk-05094-LVV; 6:24-bk-05095-LVV; 6:24-bk-05099-LVV; 6:24-bk-05096-LVV; 6:24-bk-05085-LVV; 6:24-bk-05081-LVV; 6:24-bk-05080-LVV. Hawkers, LLC, Case No. 6 24-05079 LVV is Designated as the Lead Case. . This case is associated with lead case 6:24-bk-5079. . Service Instructions: R Shuker is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Vivianne) |
|
Monday, September 23, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Motion for Joint Administration
Mon 09/23 1:03 PM
|
|
Saturday, September 21, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Sun 09/22 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. . Notice Date 09/21/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, September 19, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest
Fri 09/20 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest . Notice Date 09/19/2024. (Admin.) |
|
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Fri 09/20 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. . Notice Date 09/19/2024. (Admin.) |
|
8 | 8
court
341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 11 Corp w/Claim Deadline
Thu 09/19 12:51 PM
Amended Notice of Bankruptcy Case as to time ONLY . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/17/2024 at 10:00 AM. U.S. Trustee (Orl) will hold the meeting telephonically. Call in Number: 877-801-2055. Passcode: 8940738#. Proofs of Claims due by 11/25/2024. (Lee Hue, Karla) |
|
Wednesday, September 18, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Thu 09/19 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . Notice Date 09/18/2024. (Admin.) |
|
6 | 6
court
Notice of Deficient Filing (BK)
Wed 09/18 12:28 PM
DOCUMENT NOT PROCESSED (Entered In Error). Notice of Deficient Filing. Missing Summary of Assets, Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs, Disclosure of Compensation, 20 Largest List of Unsecured Creditors, Corporate Ownership Statement, Case Management Summary, Certificate or Resolution Authorizing Debtor to file Bankruptcy Petition. . (Adrienne) Modified on 09/18/2024 (Adrienne) |
|
Tuesday, September 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
court
341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 11 Corp w/Claim Deadline
Tue 09/17 10:50 AM
Notice of Bankruptcy Case . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/17/2024 at 11:00 AM. U.S. Trustee (Orl) will hold the meeting telephonically. Call in Number: 877-801-2055. Passcode: 8940738#. Proofs of Claims due by 11/25/2024. (Deborah K.) |
|
4 | 4
court
Notice of Deficient Filing (BK)
Tue 09/17 10:47 AM
Notice of Deficient Filing. Missing Summary of Assets, Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs, Disclosure of Compensation, 20 Largest List of Unsecured Creditors, Corporate Ownership Statement, Case Management Summary, Certificate or Resolution Authorizing Debtor to file Bankruptcy Petition . (Deborah K.) |
|
Monday, September 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance on behalf of United States Trustee (Attorneys for U.S. Trustee Only)
Mon 09/16 2:58 PM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Jill E Kelso on behalf of U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - ORL. (Kelso, Jill) |
|
2 | 2
2
pgs
order
Order Authorizing DIP to Operate Business
Mon 09/16 11:58 AM
Order Authorizing Debtor-In-Possession to Operate Business. (ADIclerk) |
|
1 | 1
7
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 09/16 10:31 AM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. (Verify Fee). Verification of Creditor Matrix, and Creditor Matrix Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Filed by R Scott Shuker on behalf of Hawkers Growth Fund I, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan due by 01/14/2025. Disclosure Statement due by 01/14/2025. (Shuker, R) |
|
crditcrd
Receipt of Filing Fee
Mon 09/16 10:39 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:6:24-bk-04937] ) [misc,volp11a2] (1738.00). Receipt Number A76835334, Amount Paid $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
assign
Assign Judge to Electronically Filed Cases
Mon 09/16 12:37 PM
Assignment of the Honorable Lori V. Vaughan, Bankruptcy Judge to this case . (Kathy D.) |
||
court
ADI - Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry)
Mon 09/16 9:00 PM
Debtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at[LINK:http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf] . (ADIclerk) |