Malikie Innovations et al v. Nintendo Co. Ltd. et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | James L Robart |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01490 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 15:1126 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Sep 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 18, 2024 1:08 AM PDT |
Defendant
Nintendo Co. Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Nintendo of America, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Key Patent Innovations
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Malikie Innovations
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/20/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, September 20, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 09/20 1:03 PM
ORDER re5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Yue Wang for PLAINTIFS Key Patent Innovations Ltd and Malikie Innovations Ltd, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (MG) |
|
utility
Notice to PHV and Local Counsel Unable to Process Application
Fri 09/20 12:52 PM
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice3 by attorney Khue Hoang will not be processed at this time. Firm address in Pacer does not match PHV application address. Please contact Admissions Clerk Monique Guillebeau at 206-370-8433 or[LINK:WAWD_Admissions@wawd.uscourts.gov] with additional questions.(MG) |
||
utility
Notice to PHV and Local Counsel Unable to Process Application
Fri 09/20 12:54 PM
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice4 by attorney Taylor N. Mauze will not be processed at this time. Firm address in Pacer does not match PHV application address. Please contact Admissions Clerk Monique Guillebeau at 206-370-8433 or[LINK:WAWD_Admissions@wawd.uscourts.gov] with additional questions. (MG) |
||
utility
Notice to PHV and Local Counsel Unable to Process Application
Fri 09/20 1:05 PM
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice6 by attorney Matthew G. Berkowitz will not be processed at this time. The Pro Hac attorney must submit a Pro Hac Vice access request via[LINK:Manage My Account] on PACER, under the Maintenance tab. See page 2 of the[LINK:Pro Hac Vice Application Guide] for detailed instructions. Please contact Admissions Clerk Monique Guillebeau at 206-370-8433 or[LINK:WAWD_Admissions@wawd.uscourts.gov] with additional questions. (MG) |
||
Wednesday, September 18, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
utility
Report Regarding Patent/Trademark/Copyright
Wed 09/18 10:43 AM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (MG) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 09/18 9:45 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Matthew G. Berkowitz FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for All Plaintiffs (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8632156 (Townsend, Roger) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 09/18 10:33 AM
Judge James L. Robart added. (MG) |
||
Tuesday, September 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 09/17 7:19 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Yue (Joy) Wang FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for All Plaintiffs (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8631742 (Townsend, Roger) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 09/17 7:18 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Taylor N. Mauze FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for All Plaintiffs (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8631741 (Townsend, Roger) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 09/17 7:16 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Khue Hoang FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for All Plaintiffs (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8631740 (Townsend, Roger) |
|
2 | 2
discov
Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement
Tue 09/17 7:13 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Key Patent Innovations Limited for Malikie Innovations; Corporate Parent New PP Licensing LLC for Key Patent Innovations. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Townsend, Roger) |
|
1 | 1
257
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 09/17 6:58 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Malikie Innovations, Key Patent Innovations with JURY DEMAND filed by Malikie Innovations, Key Patent Innovations.(Townsend, Roger) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Nintendo Co. Ltd., | ||
Att: 3 Summons Nintendo of America, Inc., | ||
Att: 4 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120) |