California Eastern District Court
Judge:John A Mendez
Referred: Carolyn K Delaney
Case #: 2:24-cv-02527
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 17, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 1:40 AM PDT
Defendant
Rob Bonta
Represented By
Kristin A. Liska
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Shirley N. Weber
Represented By
Kristin A. Liska
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher Kohls
Represented By
Theodore H. Frank
Hamilton Lincoln Law Institute
contact info
Adam E. Schulman, PHV
Hamilton Lincoln Law Institute
contact info
Plaintiff
Kelly Chang Rickert
Represented By
Johannes Widmalm-Delphonse, PHV
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Brian Ricardo Chavez-Ochoa
Chavez-Ochoa Law Offices, Inc.
contact info
Jonathan A. Scruggs, PHV
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Plaintiff
The Babylon Bee, LLC
Represented By
Johannes Widmalm-Delphonse, PHV
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Brian Ricardo Chavez-Ochoa
Chavez-Ochoa Law Offices, Inc.
contact info
Jonathan A. Scruggs, PHV
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Plaintiff
Rumble Canada Inc.
Represented By
Mercer S. Martin, PHV
contact info
Philip A Sechler, PHV
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Brian Ricardo Chavez-Ochoa
Chavez-Ochoa Law Offices, Inc.
contact info
Mathew W. Hoffmann, PHV
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Plaintiff
Rumble Inc.
Represented By
Mercer S. Martin, PHV
contact info
Philip A Sechler, PHV
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Brian Ricardo Chavez-Ochoa
Chavez-Ochoa Law Offices, Inc.
contact info
Mathew W. Hoffmann, PHV
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Plaintiff
X Corp.
Represented By
Jason David Rozbruch, PHV
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
contact info
Floyd Abrams, PHV
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
contact info
Joel Kurtzberg, PHV
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
contact info
William Ross Warne
Downey Brand, LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Amicus
Protect Democracy Project
Terminated: 09/27/2024
2020 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Suite #163
Washington, DC 20006
Represented By
John Langford
Protect Democracy
contact info

GPO Sep 19 2024
PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 09/18/2024 GRANTING 5 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Adam E. Schulman, PHV for Christopher Kohls. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Murphy, J)
GPO Oct 02 2024
ORDER signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/02/24 GRANTING 6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants Rob Bonta and Shirley N. Weber and their agents, employees, public servants, officers and persons acting in concert with them are ENJOINED from enforcing AB 2839 except for the audio only severed portion of the statute. The bond requirement under Federal Rule 65(c) is WAIVED. (Benson, A.)
GPO Oct 18 2024
RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/17/24 RELATING cases 2:24-cv-02527 JAM CKD and 2:24-cv-02787 JAM CKD. (Licea Chavez, V)
GPO Oct 25 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/24/24, ORDERING that Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42, the actions denominated as Kohls v. Bonta, et al. Case No. 2:24-cv-02527-JAM-CKD and The Babylon Bee, LLC, et al v. Feldstein Soto, et al., Case No. 2:24-cv-02787-JAM-CKD are hereby CONSOLIDATED. Case No. 2:24-cv-02527-JAM-CKD is designated as the "master file;" The Clerk is DIRECTED to add all complaints and answers filed in Case No. 2:24-cv-02787-JAM-CKD to the master file. The Clerk is DIRECTED to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE Case No. 2:24-cv-02787-JAM-CKD. The parties are DIRECTED to file all future pleadings, motions and other filings ONLY in Case No. 2:24-cv-02527-JAM-CKD. (Salmeron, A)
GPO Oct 25 2024
ORDER FOR INJUNCTION signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/24/2024. [FILED in Lead Case per Chambers] (Salmeron, A)
GPO Nov 15 2024
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY ENFORCEMENT OF AB 2655 signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/15/2024. (York, M)
GPO Nov 16 2024
ORDER FOR BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON SUMMARY JUDGMENT signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/15/2024 re 23 Stipulation. The Court ORDERS the following schedule:(1) Plaintiffs shall file their opening summary judgment briefs of no more than 25 pages each by 01/15/2025.(2) Defendants shall file a consolidated cross-motion for summary judgment and/or opposition brief of no more than 35 pages by 03/12/2025.(3) Plaintiffs shall each file their respective consolidated opposition and reply brief of no more than 25 pages by 04/11/2025(4) Defendants shall file their reply brief of no more than 15 pages by 05/02/2025. The motions will be SUBMITTED without appearance and without oral argument pursuant to Local Rule 230(g). If the Court subsequently concludes that oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be set and the parties notified accordingly. (York, M)
GPO Dec 04 2024
RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/3/2024 RELATING case 2:24-cv-03315 DC-CKD; Reassigning the action to Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney for all further proceedings. (Becknal, R.)
GPO Dec 20 2024
RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/19/24 RELATING cases 2:24-cv-2527 JAM CKD, 2:24-cv-2787 JAM CKD, 2:24-cv-3315 JAM CKD and 2:24-cv-3162 JAM CKD. (Benson, A.)
GPO Dec 20 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/19/24 CONSOLIDATING CASES 2:24-cv-2527 JAM CKD and 2:24-cv-3315 JAM CKD; DESIGNATING this case, 2:24-cv-2527 JAM CKD, as the Master File. Clerk to add all complaints and answers from 2:24-cv-3315 JAM CKD into this Master File and then administratively close that case. Parties are DIRECTED to file all future pleadings, motions, and other filings ONLY in this Case No. 2:24-cv-02527 JAM CKD. (Benson, A.)
GPO Dec 27 2024
STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/26/2024 ORDERING as follows: By 2/19/2025, Plaintiffs shall file their opening consolidated summary-judgment briefs; By 4/16/2025, Defendants shall file their consolidated cross-motions for summary judgment and/or opposition briefs; By 5/16/2025, Plaintiffs shall file their consolidated opposition and/or reply briefs. By 6/6/2025, Defendants shall file their consolidated reply briefs. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
GPO Dec 27 2024
ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/26/2024. The actions denominated 2:24-cv-02527-JAM-CKD, 2:24-cv-03315-JAM-CKD, and 2:24-cv-03162-JAM-CKD are hereby CONSOLIDATED for all purposes. Case No. 2:24-cv-02527-JAM-CKD is designated as the "master file." The Clerk shall add all complaints and answers filed in Case Nos. 2:24-cv-03315-JAM-CKD and 2:24-cv-03162-JAM-CKD to the master file and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE Case Nos. 2:24-cv-03315-JAM-CKD and 2:24-cv-03162-JAM-CKD. The parties are DIRECTED to file all future pleadings, motions, and other filings ONLY in Case No. 2:24-cv-02527-JAM-CKD. (Yin, K)
GPO Jan 03 2025
ORDER signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 01/02/25 DIRECTING Defendants Rob Bonta and Shirly N. Weber to STAY enforcement of AB 2655 in its entirety, including §§ 20514(a) and 20515(a), through 06/28/25. (Deputy Clerk VLC)
GPO Jan 10 2025
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 1/10/2025 ORDERING that Plaintiff X Corp. follow the summary-judgment briefing schedule set forth at ECF No. 36. (Deputy Clerk RRB)

Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Thursday, April 03, 2025
67 67 2 pgs order Order on Application for Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/03 9:08 AM
ORDER signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 04/02/25 GRANTING62 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Joshua P. Morrow, PHV for NetChoice. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Deputy Clerk VLC)
Related: [-]
66 66 2 pgs order Order on Application for Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/03 9:06 AM
ORDER signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 04/02/25 GRANTING61 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Jeremy Evan Maltz, PHV for NetChoice. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Deputy Clerk VLC)
Related: [-]
65 65 2 pgs order Order on Application for Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/03 9:04 AM
ORDER signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 04/02/25 GRANTING60 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Scott A. Keller, PHV for NetChoice. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Deputy Clerk VLC)
Related: [-]
64 64 2 pgs order Order on Application for Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/03 9:02 AM
ORDER signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 04/02/25 GRANTING59 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Steven P. Lehotsky, PHV for NetChoice. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Deputy Clerk VLC)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
63 63 misc Brief Fri 03/28 7:45 AM
BRIEF Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by NetChoice. (Benbrook, Bradley)
Related: [-]
62 62 motion Application for Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order Fri 03/28 7:36 AM
PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by NetChoice for attorney Joshua P. Morrow to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ACAEDC-12124992) (Benbrook, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
61 61 motion Application for Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order Fri 03/28 7:34 AM
PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by NetChoice for attorney Jeremy Evan Maltz to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ACAEDC-12124990) (Benbrook, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
60 60 motion Application for Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order Fri 03/28 7:32 AM
PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by NetChoice for attorney Scott A. Keller to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ACAEDC-12124987) (Benbrook, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Scott A. Keller
59 59 motion Application for Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order Fri 03/28 7:30 AM
PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by NetChoice for attorney Steven P. Lehotsky to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ACAEDC-12124983) (Benbrook, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
Thursday, March 27, 2025
58 58 order Minute Order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 03/27 4:24 PM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) issued by Courtroom Deputy for Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 03/27/2025: The Court hereby GRANTS Netchoice's Consent Motion for Leave to Appear as Amicus Curiae in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. (ECF No.57 ). Netchoice shall refile the Amicus Brief, attached to the motion as "Exhibit A," within five (5) days of this order. Amici curiae is advised that the Court will only consider briefing that helps the Court beyond the help the lawyers for the parties are able to provide; duplicative or cumulative arguments will not be considered. (Deputy Clerk MDY)
Related: [-]
57 57 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 03/27 7:39 AM
MOTION Leave to Appear as Amicus Curiae re46 Motion for Summary Judgment,45 Motion for Summary Judgment, by NetChoice. Attorney Benbrook, Bradley A. added.(Benbrook, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief,
Att: 2 Proposed Order