New Mexico District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-01312
Case Filed:Sep 17, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Sep 19, 2024 1:44 AM MDT
Defendant
Kyle Linker (1)
Represented By
Robert R. Cooper
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Sean Long
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/19/2024 3:48 AM MDT
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
1 1 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Kyle Linker : Change of Plea set for 9/24/2024 at 01:30 PM in Albuquerque - 320 Rio Grande Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. (cp) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
Related: [-]