USA v. Phillips
North Carolina Western District Court | |
Case #: | 5:24-mj-00002 |
Case Filed: | Aug 20, 2024 |
Terminated: | Sep 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 19, 2024 3:26 AM EDT |
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Joshua Herman Phillips (1)
Terminated: 09/17/2024
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/19/2024 4:39 AM EDT |