Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Wendy Beetlestone
Case #: 2:24-cv-04986
Nature of Suit375 Other Statutes - False Claims Act
Cause31:3729 False Claims Act
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2024
Terminated:Oct 29, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 17, 2025 4:32 AM EDT
Defendant
BANK OF AMERICA HOME LOAN
Defendant
COUNTYWIDE HOME LOANS HSBC SECURITIES/HSBC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Defendant
DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY
Defendant
HSI ASSET SECURIZATION TRUST COMPANY, PASS THROUGH CERTIFICATES (2007 HEI)(HASC)
Defendant
J.P. MORGAN CHASE BANK
Defendant
MERSCORP - MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEM
Defendant
MERSCORP HOLDINGS, LLC
Defendant
SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING (INC)
Defendant
WELLS FARGO BANK
Defendant
OWEN MORTGAGE
Plaintiff
SHIRRETHA THURMOND
DECISION ONE MORTGAGE COMPANY, LLC 6404 N. PARK AVENUE
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19126

GPO Oct 29 2024
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 10/29/24. 10/29/24 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE. (mbh)
GPO Oct 29 2024
ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 10/29/24. 10/29/24 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE. (mbh)

Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
misc Remark Wed 10/30 7:58 AM
DOC. NOS.9 AND10 MAILED TO PRO SE ON 10/30/24. (amas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Order Tue 10/29 4:22 PM
ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 10/29/24. 10/29/24 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE. (mbh)
Related: [-]
9 9 5 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Tue 10/29 4:17 PM
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 10/29/24. 10/29/24 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE. (mbh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
8 8 trial Exhibit Tue 10/22 2:33 PM
EXHIBITS by SHIRRETHA THURMOND.(er)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Cover Page
Monday, October 21, 2024
7 7 trial Exhibit Mon 10/21 4:19 PM
Exhibits filed by SHIRRETHA THURMOND. (mbh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
misc Remark Wed 10/02 7:55 AM
PAPER #6 MAILED TO PRO SE (JL)
Related: [-]
misc Remark Wed 10/02 7:59 AM
PAPER #57 MAILED TO PRO SE (JL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order Tue 10/01 12:37 PM
ORDER THAT THE COURT'S ORDER DOCKETED AT ECF NO. 4 IS VACATED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 10/1/24. 10/1/24 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE. (mbh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
misc Remark Thu 09/26 7:47 AM
COPY OF DOC. NO. 4 HAS BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE. (bw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
5 5 trial Exhibit Wed 09/25 10:01 AM
Exhibits filed by SHIRRETHA THURMOND. (mbh)
Related: [-]
4 4 3 pgs order Order Wed 09/25 9:25 AM
ORDER THAT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 40.1(V)(a), THAT C.A. NO. 24-4986 IS REFERRED TO THE ASSIGNMENT CLERK WHO SHALL REASSIGN THE MATTER "BY RANDOM SELECTION IN THE SAME MANNER AS IF IT WERE A NEWLY FILED CASE." SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 9/23/24. 9/25/24 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
misc Remark Fri 09/20 8:49 AM
DOC. NO.3 ALONG WITH PRO SE E-NOTICE CONSENT FORM MAILED TO PRO SE ON 9/20/24. (amas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
3 3 notice Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines Thu 09/19 3:42 PM
PRO SE NOTICE RE: GUIDELINES (mbh)
Related: [-]
2 2 85 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 09/19 3:36 PM
Complaint against BANK OF AMERICA HOME LOAN, COUNTYWIDE HOME LOANS HSBC SECURITIES/HSBC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, HSI ASSET SECURIZATION TRUST COMPANY, PASS THROUGH CERTIFICATES (2007 HEI)(HASC), J.P. MORGAN CHASE BANK, MERSCORP - MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEM, MERSCORP HOLDINGS, LLC, OWEN MORTGAGE, SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING (INC) and WELLS FARGO BANK filed by SHIRRETHA THURMOND.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 09/19 3:34 PM
MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY SHIRRETHA THURMOND.(mbh)
Related: [-]