Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 7:24-cr-01442
Case Filed:Sep 17, 2024
Last checked: Friday Sep 20, 2024 2:55 AM CDT
Defendant
Severo Zavala-Rodriguez (1)
Represented By
Rikin Shah
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Sarina Sophia DiPiazza
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/20/2024 4:24 AM CDT
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
Arrest of Severo Zavala-Rodriguez, filed. (yi7) [7:24-mj-01537]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Severo Zavala-Rodriguez (1), filed. (Hidalgo) Initial Appearance set for 9/5/2024 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker (yi7) [7:24-mj-01537]
Related: [-]
2 2 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Severo Zavala-Rodriguez, filed. (yi7) [7:24-mj-01537]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge J. Scott Hacker. INITIAL APPEARANCE, PRELIMINARY HEARING, AND DETENTION HEARING on Criminal Complaint as to Severo Zavala-Rodriguez held on 9/5/2024. Defendant placed under oath. Defendant present in the courtroom. Defendant informed of legal rights, including the right to have a consular official notified about the arrest. Defendant affirmed that the Financial Affidavit was correct and requested court-appointed counsel, which the Court GRANTED. Federal Public Defender appointed to represent Defendant. The Court advised Defendant as to the charged offense and any factual allegations in the criminal complaint. Defendant, through counsel, waived both the Preliminary and Detention Hearings. The Court entered findings, on the record, and found probable cause. The Court also entered findings that Defendant was a flight risk and denied bond; a written order to follow. In accordance with Rule 5(f), the Court orally admonished the Government of its disclosure obligations under Brady and the consequences of failing to provide such disclosure; a written order to follow. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshals Service. Appearances: Benjamin Lyles, AUSA; Jose Martinez, AFPD. (USPO: Susana Vargas) (ERO: Lazaro Elizondo) (Interpreter: Woody Lewis and Priscilla Muzza Pastor, used) (DUSM: John Briere). (jhacker, ) [7:24-mj-01537]
Related: [-]
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Benjamin Storey Lyles appearing for USA, filed. (Lyles, Benjamin) [7:24-mj-01537]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER for Severo Zavala-Rodriguez (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (jhacker, ) [7:24-mj-01537]
Related: [-]
4 4 Order of Detention Pending Trial as to Severo Zavala-Rodriguez. (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (jhacker, ) [7:24-mj-01537]
Related: [-]
5 5 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Severo Zavala-Rodriguez. (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (jhacker, ) [7:24-mj-01537]
Related: [-]
6 6 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Severo Zavala-Rodriguez, filed. [7:24-mj-01537]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
7 7 Notice of Substitution by USA as to defendant Severo Zavala-Rodriguez. Attorney Sarina DiPiazza added. Attorney Benjamin Storey Lyles terminated, filed. (DiPiazza, Sarina) [7:24-mj-01537]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
8 8 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Severo Zavala-Rodriguez, filed. (sm7) [7:24-mj-01537]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
9 9 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Severo Zavala-Rodriguez (1) count(s) 1, filed. (cb7)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
10 10 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Severo Zavala-Rodriguez, filed. (cb7)
Related: [-]