Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Deborah L Thorne
Case #: 1:24-bk-13990
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2024

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Egzit Corporation
1510 Plainfield Rd Suite 5
Darien, IL 60561
Represented By
Peter C. Nabhani
Law Office Of Peter C. Nabhani
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604


Docket last updated: 39 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
145 145 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 04/09 6:10 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. hearing scheduled for 05/07/2025 at 01:15 PM at Appear in Courtroom 682, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Thorne. (Patterson, Carlos)
Related: [-] 19 Cash Collateral (Use)
144 144 3 pgs order Use Cash Collateral Wed 04/09 2:52 PM
Seventh Interim Order Granting in Part, Continuing Motion To Use Cash Collateral Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 5/7/2025 at 01:15 PM at Appear In Courtroom 682, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Thorne. Signed on 4/9/2025. (Bowles, Aaron)
Related: [-] 19
143 143 order Relief from Stay Wed 04/09 2:47 PM
Order Granting Motion for Relief from Stay Related [+]. Signed on 4/9/2025. (Bowles, Aaron)
Related: [-] 107