California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-01933
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 21, 2024 12:34 AM PDT
Defendant
Son Nguyen (1)
Represented By
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Cindy Vanessa Muro
Federal Defenders Of San Diego, Inc.
contact info
Ryan T. Mardock
Federal Defenders Of San Diego, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Andrew P. Sherwood
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Shital Thakkar
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/21/2024 1:59 AM PDT
Friday, August 23, 2024
Arrest of Son Nguyen (no document attached) (gac) [3:24-mj-03215-DDL]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Son Nguyen.(gac) [3:24-mj-03215-DDL]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
Monday, August 26, 2024
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Son Nguyen: Initial Appearance set for 8/26/2024 before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. (no document attached) (gac) [3:24-mj-03215-DDL]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Shital Thakkar appearing for USA. (Thakkar, Shital)Attorney Shital Thakkar added to party USA(pty:pla)(axc1). [3:24-mj-03215-DDL]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner: Initial Appearance as to Son Nguyen held on 8/26/2024. Appointed Federal Defenders for Son Nguyen. Detention Hearing as to Son Nguyen held on 8/26/2024. USA oral motion for detention(Flight/Danger); motion denied as to Son Nguyen. Bond set as to Son Nguyen (1) $50,000 PS secured by 2 FRRA and $5,000 cash deposit. Surety exam required. Location monitoring/Home detention. Defendant to be released the following business day after bond has been approved. Rule 5 advisement provided. (Preliminary Hearing set for 9/3/24 at 9:00am before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. Arraignment set for 9/19/24 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu.) Judge update in case as to Son Nguyen. Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner added to the case. Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard is no longer assigned to case and Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner is now assigned to the case. The new case number is 24MJ3215-DDL (CD# 8/26/2024 DDL 24-1:4:06;4:30-4:44). (Plaintiff Attorney Andrew Sherwood AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Nina Papachristou FD-S/A). (aje) [3:24-mj-03215-DDL]
Related: [-]
5 5 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Son Nguyen (no document attached) (aje) [3:24-mj-03215-DDL]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Son Nguyen (1) $50,000 PS secured by 2 FRRA and $5,000 deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 8/26/24. (ecf) [3:24-mj-03215-DDL]
Related: [-]
9 9 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Son Nguyen (ecf) [3:24-mj-03215-DDL]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER as to Son Nguyen: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 8/26/24. (aje) [3:24-mj-03215-DDL]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
6 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ryan T. Mardock appearing for Son Nguyen (Mardock, Ryan)Attorney Ryan T. Mardock added to party Son Nguyen(pty:dft) (axi). [3:24-mj-03215-DDL]
Related: [-]
7 7 Notice of Assertion of Rights by Son Nguyen (Mardock, Ryan) (axi). [3:24-mj-03215-DDL]
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING (DATE ONLY) as to Defendant Son Nguyen. On Court's own motion, Preliminary Hearing reset for 9/5/2024 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. (no document attached) (bas1) [3:24-mj-03215-DDL]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
12 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Cindy Vanessa Muro appearing for Son Nguyen as Co-Counsel (Muro, Cindy)Attorney Cindy Vanessa Muro added to party Son Nguyen(pty:dft) (axi). [3:24-mj-03215-DDL]
Related: [-]
13 13 Order on Stipulated Continuance of a Preliminary Hearing as to Son Nguyen. Preliminary Hearing set for 9/19/2024 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu.Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 08/28/2024. (ggv) [3:24-mj-03215-DDL]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
14 14 MINUTE ORDER of Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner as to Son Nguyen: The Court has received the bond submission for Mr. Nguyen. The Court approves the bond and finds a surety examination is no longer required. Upon the Court's receipt of the cash deposit forthwith, an abstract will be issued for release to Pretrial Services for electronic monitoring. (no document attached) (mme) [3:24-mj-03215-DDL]
Related: [-]
15 15 ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Son Nguyen re 14 Order. (dxj) [3:24-mj-03215-DDL]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USMS read
16 16 P/S Bond Filed as to Son Nguyen in amount of $ 50,000, Receipt # 155711. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. (Document applicable to USA, Son Nguyen.) (mme) [3:24-mj-03215-DDL]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
17 17 BAIL REVIEW PACKET as to Son Nguyen. Report prepared by: C. Patterson. (Document applicable to USA, Son Nguyen.) (Juarez, V.) [3:24-mj-03215-DDL]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
18 18 NOTICE of Lodgment of Information by USA (Sherwood, Andrew)Attorney Andrew P. Sherwood added to party USA(pty:pla) (mef). [3:24-mj-03215-DDL]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
19 19 2 pgs INFORMATION as to Son Nguyen (1) count(s) 1-2. (tkl)
Related: [-]
20 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu: Arraignment on Information as to Son Nguyen (1) Count 1-2 held on 9/19/2024. Not Guilty plea entered. Defendant waived Indictment in open court. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 10/25/2024 09:00 AM before District Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. (CD# 9/19/2024 SBC 1:57-2:10). (Plaintiff Attorney Ryan Mardock, FD). (Defendant Attorney Alex Biggs, AUSA S/A). (mme)
Related: [-]