Georgia Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michele J Kim
Case #: 5:24-bk-50464
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
McDaniel Logging, LLC
5901 U.S. Hwy. 441 W.
Pearson, GA 31642
Represented By
William Orson Woodall, Jr.
Woodall & Woodall
contact info
Last checked: never
U. S. Trustee
Office of the U. S. Trustee
33 Bull Street, Suite 400
Savannah, GA 31401


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 12:02 PM EDT
Saturday, April 26, 2025
108 108 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 04/27 12:31 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/26/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 105
107 107 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/27 12:31 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/26/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 106
Thursday, April 24, 2025
106 106 order Requiring Service Thu 04/24 10:28 AM
Order Requiring Service by DEBTOR . Filed on 4/24/2025 Related [+]. Service due by 5/1/2025. (TGG)
Related: [-] 105
105 105 order Confirming Chapter 11 Subchapter V Plan Thu 04/24 10:25 AM
Order Confirming Consensual Chapter 11 Subchapter V Plan and Discharging Debtor Filed on 4/24/2025 Related [+]. (TGG)
Related: [-] 54 ,55
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
104 104 court Hearing Held Wed 04/23 3:07 PM
Continued Confirmation Hearing Held on Chapter 11 Subchapter V Plan with Objection to Confirmation by John Deere Financial - DOCUMENT IMAGE AVAILABLE ONLY TO COURT USERS. Related [+] (TGG)
Related: [-] 54 ,71