Member Case
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-44027

New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Elizabeth S Stong
Case #: 1:24-bk-44032
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
ONE15 Brooklyn Sail Club LLC
159 Bridge Park Dr
Brooklyn, NY 11201-4541
Represented By
Dawn Kirby
Kirby Aisner & Curley LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn) Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green Room 510
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 6:06 PM EDT
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
23 23 misc Amended Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1009-1(a) (No Fee) Wed 11/13 2:27 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202), Amended Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1009-1(a) Schedule A/B, Filed by Erica Feynman Aisner on behalf of ONE15 Brooklyn Sail Club LLC (Aisner, Erica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Pursuant to Local Rule 1009-1(a)
Monday, November 04, 2024
trustee Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors Mon 11/04 1:14 PM
Trustee's Notice of Continued Meeting of Creditors Filed by Office of the United States Trustee. 341(a) Meeting Adjourned to 11/18/2024 at 04:00 PM at Teleconference - Brooklyn. (Sussman, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP) Thu 10/17 4:33 PM
Hearing Held; Related [+] Appearances: Debtor, Ms. Lau, Office of the United States Trustee, NYC\Brooklyn Bridge Park Corporation. No opposition - Granted on a final basis as reflected in the record - Submit order. (sej)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Use Cash Collateral,Motion to Limit Notice Filed by Debtor ONE15 Brooklyn Sail Club LLC,17 Order to Schedule Hearing (Generic)
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP) Thu 10/17 4:35 PM
Hearing Held; Related [+] Appearances: Debtor, Ms. Lau, Office of the United States Trustee, NYC\Brooklyn Bridge Park Corporation. No opposition - Granted on a final basis as reflected in the record - Submit order. (sej)
Related: [-] 18 Order to Schedule Hearing (Generic),9 Motion to Authorize/Direct,Motion to Limit Notice Filed by Debtor ONE15 Brooklyn Sail Club LLC,14 Motion to Authorize/Direct Filed by Debtor ONE15 Brooklyn Sail Club LLC
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
22 22 2 pgs misc Amended List of Creditors Tue 10/15 4:39 PM
Declaration, Amended List of Creditors / Declaration pursuant to Local Rule 1007-1(b) . Filed by Dawn Kirby on behalf of ONE15 Brooklyn Sail Club LLC Related [+] (Kirby, Dawn)
Related: [-] 21 Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) filed by Debtor ONE15 Brooklyn Sail Club LLC, Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals (Form 206Sum), Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) (Fee Due), Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individuals (Form 207)
Friday, October 11, 2024
crditcrd Automatic docket of credit card/debit card Fri 10/11 8:58 AM
Receipt of Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) (Fee Due)([LINK:1 24-44032 ess] ) [misc,schsfa] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A23022528. Fee amount 34.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#21
Thursday, October 10, 2024
21 21 19 pgs misc Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) Thu 10/10 4:13 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202), Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals (Form 206Sum) for Non-Individuals , Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H, Fee Amount $34, Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individuals (Form 207) Filed by Dawn Kirby on behalf of ONE15 Brooklyn Sail Club LLC (Kirby, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 05, 2024
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Consolidation and Amend Caption Sun 10/06 12:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Consolidation and Amend Caption Notice Date 10/05/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
19 19 order Joint Administration Thu 10/03 8:02 AM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration on Lead Case: 24-44027 ess ONE Edge Marina Finance Company LLC with Member Cases: 24-44028 ess ONE15 Brooklyn Marina, LLC, 24-44030 ess ONE15 Restaurant, LLC, 24-44032 ess ONE15 Brooklyn Sail Club LLC Related [+] Signed on 10/2/2024. (one)
Related: [-] 3
18 18 order Schedule Hearing (Generic) Thu 10/03 7:31 AM
Interim Order (I) Authorizing Certain Of The Debtors To Pay And Honor Certain Prepetition Claims For (A) Wages, Salaries, Employee Benefits And Other Compensation, And (B) Withholdings And Deductions; And (Ii) Directing Banks To Receive, Process, Honor And Pay All Checks Presented For Payment And Electronic Payment Requests Relating To The Foregoing and Scheduling Final Hearin Related [+]. Signed on 10/2/2024, Hearing scheduled for 10/16/2024 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (sej)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Authorize/Direct filed by Debtor ONE15 Brooklyn Sail Club LLC, Motion to Limit Notice,14 Motion to Authorize/Direct filed by Debtor ONE15 Brooklyn Sail Club LLC
17 17 order Schedule Hearing (Generic) Thu 10/03 7:19 AM
Interim Order Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral by Debtor and to Schedule Final Hearin Related [+]. Signed on 10/2/2024. Hearing scheduled for 10/16/2024 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (sej)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor ONE15 Brooklyn Sail Club LLC, Motion to Limit Notice
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Budget
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Thu 10/03 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 10/02/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Thu 10/03 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 10/02/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Authorize/Direct Wed 10/02 12:04 PM
Supplemental Motion to Authorize/Direct / Supplement to Motion for an Order (a) Authorizing Certain Debtors to (1) Pay and Honor Certain Prepetition Claims for (i) Wages, Salaries, Employee Benefits and other Compensation, and (ii) Withholdings and Deductions; (2) Continue to Provide Employee Benefits in the Ordinary Course of Business; (3) Pay All Related Costs and Expenses; and (4) Directing Banks to Receive, Process, Honor and Pay all Checks and Electronic Payment Requests Relating to the Foregoing Filed by Erica Feynman Aisner on behalf of ONE15 Brooklyn Sail Club LLC Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 10/2/2024 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 3858 (Judge Stong). (Aisner, Erica) Modified on 10/2/2024 (one)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Authorize/Direct filed by Debtor ONE15 Brooklyn Sail Club LLC, Motion to Limit Notice
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP) Wed 10/02 4:24 PM
Hearing Held; Related [+] - Appearances by Debtor, Ms. Lau, OBBP Retail Owner LLC, New York City Law Department-Brooklyn Bridge Park Corp., Office of the United States Trustee - No opposition - Motion Granted - Submit order. (sej)
Related: [-] 11 Order to Schedule Hearing (Generic),3 Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor ONE15 Brooklyn Sail Club LLC
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP) Thu 10/03 7:09 AM
Hearing Held; Related [+] - Appearances by Debtor, Ms. Lau, OBBP Retail Owner LLC, New York City Law Department-Brooklyn Bridge Park Corp., Office of the United States Trustee - No opposition - Granted as reflected in the record - Submit order. (sej)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Authorize/Direct,Motion to Limit Notice Filed by Debtor ONE15 Brooklyn Sail Club LLC,14 Motion to Authorize/Direct Filed by Debtor ONE15 Brooklyn Sail Club LLC
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP) Thu 10/03 7:09 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; - Appearances by Debtor, Ms. Lau, OBBP Retail Owner LLC, New York City Law Department-Brooklyn Bridge Park Corp., Office of the United States Trustee - Granted as reflected in the record - Submit order. 'Hearing scheduled for 10/16/2024 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY Related [+] (sej)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Use Cash Collateral,Motion to Limit Notice Filed by Debtor ONE15 Brooklyn Sail Club LLC
court Entry Thu 10/03 8:06 AM
An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the Chapter 11 cases commenced in ONE Edge Marina Finance Company LLC, ONE15 Brooklyn Marina, LLC, ONE15 Restaurant LLC and ONE15Brooklyn Sail Club, LLC. The docket in Case No. 24-44027 ESS should be consulted for all matters affecting the above listed cases. (one)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
13 13 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Mon 09/30 3:33 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Erica Feynman Aisner on behalf of ONE15 Brooklyn Sail Club LLC Related [+] (Aisner, Erica)
Related: [-] 3 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor ONE15 Brooklyn Sail Club LLC,9 Motion to Authorize/Direct filed by Debtor ONE15 Brooklyn Sail Club LLC, Motion to Limit Notice,10 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor ONE15 Brooklyn Sail Club LLC, Motion to Limit Notice,11 Order to Schedule Hearing (Generic)
Saturday, September 28, 2024
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Sun 09/29 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Notice Date 09/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
11 11 order Schedule Hearing (Generic) Fri 09/27 8:09 PM
Order to Schedule Hearing on Shortened Notice on Debtor's First Day Motion Related [+]. Signed on 9/27/2024. Hearing scheduled for 10/2/2024 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (sej)
Related: [-] 3 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor ONE15 Brooklyn Sail Club LLC,7 Motion to Limit Notice filed by Debtor ONE15 Brooklyn Sail Club LLC,9 Motion to Authorize/Direct filed by Debtor ONE15 Brooklyn Sail Club LLC, Motion to Limit Notice,10 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor ONE15 Brooklyn Sail Club LLC, Motion to Limit Notice
10 10 0 pgs motion Limit Notice Fri 09/27 3:03 PM
Motion to Use Cash Collateral / Debtors' Motion, on Shortened Notice, Requesting (i) Use of Cash Collateral Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §363(c)(2) and Bankruptcy Rule 4001, (ii) Providing Adequate Protection Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§361 and 362 and (iii) Scheduling a Final Hearing , Motion to Limit Notice Filed by Erica Feynman Aisner on behalf of ONE15 Brooklyn Sail Club LLC. (Aisner, Erica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 21 pgs Exhibit A - Sail Club Loan Documents & UCC-1
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Restaurant Loan Documents & UCC-1
Att: 3 9 pgs Exhibit C - Proposed Order
Att: 4 6 pgs Exhibit D - Budget
9 9 motion Authorize/Direct Fri 09/27 2:36 PM
Motion to Authorize/Direct / Motion for an Order (a) Authorizing Certain Debtors to (1) Pay and Honor Certain Prepetition Claims for (i) Wages, Salaries, Employee Benefits and other Compensation, and (ii) Withholdings and Deductions; (2) Continue to Provide Employee Benefits in the Ordinary Course of Business; (3) Pay All Related Costs and Expenses; and (4) Directing Banks to Receive, Process, Honor and Pay all Checks and Electronic Payment Requests Relating to the Foregoing , Motion to Limit Notice Filed by Erica Feynman Aisner on behalf of ONE15 Brooklyn Sail Club LLC. (Aisner, Erica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Restaurant 9/27/2024 Payroll Summary
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order
8 8 trustee Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 - US Trustee Fri 09/27 11:37 AM
Meeting of Creditors Filed by Office of the United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/4/2024 at 01:00 PM at Telephonic Meeting: Phone 1 (866) 919-4760, Participant Code 4081400, Enter # sign. (Sussman, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Limit Notice Fri 09/27 10:05 AM
Motion to Limit Notice / Declaration of Estelle Lau Pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 1007-4 and 9077-1 in Support of an Order Scheduling Hearing on Shortened Notice and the Relief Sought in First Day Motions Filed by Erica Feynman Aisner on behalf of ONE15 Brooklyn Sail Club LLC. (Aisner, Erica)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
6 6 misc Affidavit Thu 09/26 6:25 PM
Affidavit Re: Declaration of Estelle Lau Pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 1007-4 and 9077-1 in Support of an Order Scheduling Hearing on Shortened Notice and the Relief Sought in First Day Motions Filed by Erica Feynman Aisner on behalf of ONE15 Brooklyn Sail Club LLC (Aisner, Erica)
Related: [-]
5 5 3 pgs misc Exhibit Thu 09/26 3:36 PM
Exhibit / Amended Proposed Order Filed by Erica Feynman Aisner on behalf of ONE15 Brooklyn Sail Club LLC Related [+] (Aisner, Erica)
Related: [-] 3 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor ONE15 Brooklyn Sail Club LLC
4 4 0 pgs court Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Thu 09/26 3:35 PM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1073-2b due by 9/26/2024.Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-4 due 9/26/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FBR 1007(a)(1) due 9/26/2024. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 9/26/2024. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor. 11 U.S.C. § 329 and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2016(b) (Official Form 2030) due 10/10/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 10/10/2024. Schedule A/B due 10/10/2024. Schedule D due 10/10/2024. Schedule E/F due 10/10/2024. Schedule G due 10/10/2024. Schedule H due 10/10/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due 10/10/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 10/10/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 10/10/2024. (one)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Joint Administration Thu 09/26 1:26 PM
Motion for Joint Administration of Case 24-44027 with Case(s) 24-44028 24-44030 24-44032 Filed by Erica Feynman Aisner on behalf of ONE15 Brooklyn Sail Club LLC. (Aisner, Erica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" Proposed Order
2 2 0 pgs motion Employ (Application) Thu 09/26 1:23 PM
Application to Employ Kirby Aisner & Curley LLP as Attorneys for the Debtors Filed by Erica Feynman Aisner on behalf of ONE15 Brooklyn Sail Club LLC. Order to be presented for signature on 10/17/2024. (Aisner, Erica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 7 pgs Application
Att: 2 Exhibit "A" Declaration
Att: 3 Exhibit "B" Proposed Order
1 1 11 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 09/26 11:55 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $ 1738. Filed by Dawn Kirby on behalf of ONE15 Brooklyn Sail Club LLC Chapter 11 Plan due by 01/24/2025. Disclosure Statement due by 01/24/2025. (Kirby, Dawn)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Automatic docket of credit card/debit card Thu 09/26 11:57 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:1 24-44032 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A22982871. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
court Related Cases Thu 09/26 2:36 PM
The above case is related to Case Number(s) 24-44027 ess, 24-44028 ess, 24-44030 ess, ONE Edge Marina Finance Company LLC, ONE15 Brooklyn Marina, LLC, ONE15 Restaurant, LLC (one)
Related: [-]
utility Judge Reassignment Utility Thu 09/26 2:36 PM
Judge Nancy Hershey Lord removed from the case due to Related Case, Judge Reassigned. Judge Elizabeth S. Stong added to the case. (one)
Related: [-]