Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-02452
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2024
Last checked: Friday Sep 27, 2024 2:59 AM CDT
Defendant
Cesar Alexi Carranza-Soler (1)
Represented By
Nitya Morales Vazquez
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Holly Diane Pavlinski
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Nov 21 2024
FINDINGS OF FACT AND RECOMMENDATION on felony guilty plea before United States Magistrate Judge as to Cesar Alexi Carranza-Soler. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters. (ah2)
GPO Dec 19 2024
ORDER accepting re 21 Findings of Fact on Plea as to Cesar Alexi Carranza-Soler. Guilty plea accepted. Signed by District Judge Ernest Gonzalez. (ah2)

Docket last updated: 09/27/2024 4:13 AM CDT
Saturday, August 31, 2024
Arrest of Cesar Alexi Carranza-Soler (drda) [2:24-mj-02446-MHW]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 02, 2024
Warrant Returned Executed as to Cesar Alexi Carranza-Soler. (drda) [2:24-mj-02446-MHW]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters as to Cesar Alexi Carranza-Soler. (drda) [2:24-mj-02446-MHW]
Related: [-]
2 2 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters as to Cesar Alexi Carranza-Soler. (drda) [2:24-mj-02446-MHW]
Related: [-]
3 3 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Matthew H. Watters as to Cesar Alexi Carranza-Soler. (drda) [2:24-mj-02446-MHW]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to USA as to Cesar Alexi Carranza-Soler. (drda) [2:24-mj-02446-MHW]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Cesar Alexi Carranza-Soler (1); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond as to Cesar Alexi Carranza-Soler (1).By Judge Matthew H. Watters. (drda) [2:24-mj-02446-MHW]
Related: [-]
4 4 Proceedings held before Judge Matthew H. Watters:Initial Appearance as to Cesar Alexi Carranza-Soler held on 9/3/2024 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 9/6/2024 9:00AM before Judge Matthew H. Watters, SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Cesar Alexi Carranza-Soler (Court Reporter FTR GOLD - C. LEVRIE.) (drda) [2:24-mj-02446-MHW]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Nitya Morales Vazquez for Cesar Alexi Carranza-Soler. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters. (ic) [2:24-mj-02446-MHW]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
6 6 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Cesar Alexi Carranza-Soler (Morales Vazquez, Nitya) [2:24-mj-02446-MHW]
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE Assertion of Rights by Cesar Alexi Carranza-Soler (Morales Vazquez, Nitya) [2:24-mj-02446-MHW]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER OF DETENTION: Bond set to No Bond as to Cesar Alexi Carranza-Soler. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters. (bot1) [2:24-mj-02446-MHW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
9 9 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Cesar Alexi Carranza-Soler (1) count(s) 1. (bot1)
Related: [-] dacted Version
11 11 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Cesar Alexi Carranza-Soler (bot2)
Related: [-]