New York Northern District Court
Judge:Brenda K Sannes
Referred: Miroslav Lovric
Case #: 5:24-cv-01181
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2024
Terminated:Jan 30, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 25, 2025 4:23 AM EDT
Defendant
L. Cooper
Defendant
Gordon J. Cuffy
Defendant
Christina DeJoseph
Defendant
Deputy Delong
Defendant
William J. Fitzpatrick
Defendant
E. Francisco
Defendant
Marsha Hunt
Defendant
Donald Kelly
Defendant
Bradley W. Oastler , Esq.
Defendant
Phillips
Defendant
The City of Syracuse
Defendant
The County of Onondaga
Defendant
Ronnie White, Jr.
Plaintiff
Minister Abraham S. Israel
AR 483 E. Utica St.
Buffalo, NY 14208


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, March 14, 2025
17 17 appeal USCA Order Mon 03/17 3:56 PM
ORDER of USCA as to11 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Abraham S. Israel. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Appellant Israel file a response, by letter, to this order either (1) setting out the claimed basis for this Courts jurisdiction; or (2) withdrawing the appeal. The response is due February 13, 2025. If no response is filed, the appeal will be referred to a panel for a determination regarding this Courts jurisdiction. (bas)
Related: [-]
appeal USCA Case Number Mon 03/17 3:58 PM
USCA Case Number 25-218 assigned for11 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Abraham S. Israel. (bas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
16 16 misc Mail Returned Thu 02/06 1:38 PM
Mail Returned as Return to Sender/Attempted/Not Known/Unable to forward re: 14 Order Dismissing Case. sent to Abraham Israel Address sent to 483 E. Utica St, Buffalo, NY 14208. (tll)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
15 15 appeal Supplemental Electronic Certification Sent to USCA Thu 01/30 2:37 PM
Supplemental Electronic Certification transmitted to US Court of Appeals re11 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal (tll)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order Dismissing Case Thu 01/30 10:50 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's13 Letter seeking to withdraw this case. As no Defendant has appeared in this action, the Court construes Plaintiff's letter as a notice of voluntary dismissal under Fed. R. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) and respectfully directs the Clerk to close this case. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 1/30/2025. (Copy served upon pro se plaintiff via regular mail.) (nmk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
13 13 motion Letter Request/Motion Wed 01/29 11:02 AM
Letter Motion from Abraham S. Israel requesting to close the case and withdrawing all consent from the case filed over the counter in the Syracuse office submitted to Judge Brenda K. Sannes. (tll)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
12 12 appeal Electronic Notice and Certification to USCA of Appeal Mon 01/27 1:58 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE AND CERTIFICATION sent to US Court of Appeals re11 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal (tll)
Related: [-]
11 11 appeal Notice of Interlocutory Appeal Mon 01/27 1:57 PM
NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to 8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Order on Letter Request filed by Abraham S. Israel over the counter in Syracuse. IFP pending. (tll)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 01/27 12:59 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Abraham S. Israel Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (tll)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Letter Request/Motion Mon 01/27 12:57 PM
Letter Motion from Abraham S. Israel requesting another judge and a change of address submitted to Judge Miroslav Lovric. New address is 483 E. Utica St., Buffalo, NY 14208 (tll)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Letter Request Mon 01/27 7:24 AM
TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff Motion7 seeking that his In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Motion5 be withdrawn is GRANTED. Therefore, IFP Motion5 is DENIED as being WITHDRAWN. As a result, if Plaintiff desires to continue to pursue this action he must, within 30 days of this Order, pay the $405.00 filing fee in full. This action cannot proceed until Plaintiff pays the filing fee given that he has withdrawn his IFP application. Furthermore, if Plaintiff wishes to discontinue this action, he should file a letter so advising. Plaintiff is advised that failure to comply with this court order or failure to pursue this litigation may result in sanctions being imposed pursuant to fed. R. Civ. P. 37 & 41, including dismissal of the case. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 1/27/2025. (Copy served on Plaintiff via regular mail) (jdc )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
7 7 motion Letter Request/Motion Thu 01/23 1:56 PM
Letter Motion from Abraham S. Israel requesting withdrawal of his In Forma Pauperis Motion and his change of address request filed over the counter in Syracuse submitted to Judge Miroslav Lovric. (tll)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 01/21 2:35 PM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS filed over the counter in Syracuse by Abraham S. Israel Effective Date 1/31/2025 Old Address: 1409 S. McBride St. #2, Syracuse, NY 13202 New Address: 483 E. Utica St, Buffalo, NY 14208 (tll)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
5 5 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 11/05 2:29 PM
AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Abraham S. Israel. Filed over the counter in the Syracuse Clerk's Office. Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (mmg)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
4 4 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 11/04 9:19 AM
TEXT ORDER: Plaintiffs Motion2 seeking Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis is DENIED as incomplete. Plaintiff failed to completely answer questions 1, 2, 3, & 8. See Docket, IFP2 . If Plaintiff desires to pursue this action he must, within 30 days, either (1) pay the $405.00 filing fee in full, or (2) submit a completed and signed IFP application form in accordance with the Court's Local Rules. Plaintiff is advised that failure to comply with court orders or failure to pursue this litigation may result in sanctions being imposed pursuant to fed. R. Civ. P. 37 & 41, including dismissal of the case. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 11/4/2024. (Copy served on Plaintiff via regular mail) (jdc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
3 3 misc Pro Se Handbook and Notice Issued Fri 09/27 1:18 PM
PRO SE NOTICE issued and explained to Abraham S. Israel at time complaint was filed. {Pro Se Plaintiff stated they already have a copy of the local rules and pro se handbook} (ztc)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 09/27 1:15 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Abraham S. Israel. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. (ztc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/27 1:13 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against L. Cooper, Gordon J. Cuffy, Christina DeJoseph, Delong, William J. Fitzpatrick, E. Francisco, Marsha Hunt, Donald Kelly, Bradley W. Oastler, Esq, Phillips, The City of Syracuse, The County of Onondaga, Ronnie White, Jr. filed by Abraham S. Israel. {Filed over SYR Public Counter} (ztc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet