Maryland District Court
Judge:James K Bredar
Case #: 1:24-cv-02816
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e-2 Job Discrimination
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2024
Terminated:Mar 06, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 5:28 AM EDT
Defendant
Kurt Bluemel, Inc.
Represented By
Alexander V Cranford
Jackson Lewis, P.C.
contact info
Emmett F McGee, Jr
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By
Eric Stephen Thompson
Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Thursday, March 06, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 03/06 3:33 PM
ORDER GRANTING13 Joint Motion for Approval of Consent Decree and APPROVING Consent Decree. Closing case. Signed by Judge James K Bredar on 3/6/2025. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Decree
Monday, March 03, 2025
13 13 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 03/03 12:11 PM
Joint MOTION re12 Order Joint Memorandum in Support of Consent Decree by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission(Thompson, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
Friday, February 28, 2025
12 12 1 pgs order Order Fri 02/28 9:35 AM
ORDER DIRECTING the parties to file a joint motion to accompany the Consent Decree on or before March 13, 2025. Signed by Judge James K Bredar on 2/27/2025. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Fri 02/14 12:12 PM
NOTICE by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission of Filing Proposed Consent Decree (Thompson, Eric)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 02/13 2:18 PM
ORDER GRANTING9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer1 Complaint; Kurt Bluemel, Inc.'s answer due 4/12/2025. Signed by Judge James K Bredar on 2/13/2025. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
9 9 motion Extension of Time Tue 02/11 4:40 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file a response to the complaint by Kurt Bluemel, Inc.(Cranford, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 01/14 2:32 PM
ORDER GRANTING7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer1 Complaint; Kurt Bluemel, Inc.'s answer due 2/12/2025. Signed by Judge James K Bredar on 1/14/2025. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 01/13 5:43 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer TO COMPLAINT by Kurt Bluemel, Inc.(McGee, Emmett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, December 12, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 12/12 11:50 AM
ORDER GRANTING5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint; Kurt Bluemel, Inc.'s answer extended to 1/13/2025. Signed by Judge James K Bredar on 12/12/2024. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 12/11 5:12 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Response to the Complaint by Kurt Bluemel, Inc.(McGee, Emmett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Order Tue 12/10 3:50 PM
ORDER Directing Plaintiff to file and serve within 30 days a Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default as to defendant Kurt Bluemel, Inc.. Signed by Judge James K Bredar on 12/10/2024. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 10/09 4:07 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Kurt Bluemel, Inc. waiver sent on 10/9/2024, answer due 12/9/2024.(Thompson, Eric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
2 2 service Request for Waiver of Service Tue 10/01 8:14 AM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Kurt Bluemel on 10 1-2024 by EEOC. Waiver of Service due by 10/31/2024.(Thompson, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 unexecuted waiver of service
Monday, September 30, 2024
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 09/30 6:22 PM
COMPLAINT against Kurt Bluemel, filed by EEOC.(Thompson, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet