California Central District Court
Judge:Autumn D Spaeth
Case #: 8:24-cv-02145
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Oct 03, 2024
Terminated:Dec 05, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 01, 2025 1:21 AM PDT
Defendant
Ara A. Tchaghlassian
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Julio Cruz
Represented By
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Kevin Hyunjong Hong
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, December 05, 2024
9 9 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Thu 12/05 3:30 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by PLAINTIFF Julio Cruz. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
8 8 notice Settlement Mon 11/25 3:28 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by plaintiff Julio Cruz. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
7 7 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 11/06 9:31 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Julio Cruz, upon Defendant Ara A. Tchaghlassian served on 10/26/2024, answer due 11/18/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon ARA A. TCHAGHLASSIAN, DEFENDANT in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
4 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Julio Cruz. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Julio Cruz. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-38333988 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Julio Cruz(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]