Utah District Court
Case #: 4:24-mj-00091
Case Filed:Oct 03, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 05, 2024 2:44 AM MDT
Defendant
Christopher Jordan (1)
Represented By
Paul D. Riddle
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Brady Wilson
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/05/2024 6:41 AM MDT
Thursday, October 03, 2024
1 1 Arrest (Rule 5) of Christopher Jordan Warrant out of the USDC District of Columbia. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler (jlh)
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER SETTING HEARING as to Christopher Jordan. Initial Appearance - Rule 5 set for 10/3/2024 at 10:00 AM in Room 2B 206 (St George) before Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 10/3/2024.(jlh)
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler: Initial Appearance in Rule 5/5.1 Proceedings/Attorney Appointment as to Christopher Jordan held on 10/3/2024. Defendant present with counsel and in custody. Defendant requests counsel. Financial Affidavit submitted. Court appoints FPD counsel, Paul Riddle. Defendant is advised of rights. Defendant waives identity hearing. Defendant acknowledges identity on the record. Government is NOT seeking detention in this matter. Court heard from defense as to release. Court ordered dft released with conditions. See ORDER for details. Defendant to attend court in District of Columbia via zoom on 10/17 counsel to provide information to defendant. Any violation to be brought to the Courts attention IMMEDIATELY. Note: Any future review of detention will remain with the magistrate judge who entered the first detention order, even if an order of referral to a different magistrate judge is entered on this defendant's case. No attached document. Attorney for Plaintiff: Brady Wilson, Attorney for Defendant: Paul Riddle, FPD. Interpreter: Not Needed. Probation Officer: Gary Couch. Court Reporter: Electronic.(Time Start: 10:50, Time End: 11:15, Room 2B St. George.) (jlh)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORAL MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Christopher Jordan. (jlh)
Related: [-]
6 6 granting 5 Motion to Appoint Counsel as to Christopher Jordan (1); DOCKET TEXT ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER, Paul Riddle as to Christopher Jordan No attached document. Representation shall continue for any post-sentencing activities initiated by the US Probation Office. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 10/3/2024.(jlh)
Related: [-]
7 7 WAIVER of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearing by Christopher Jordan (jlh)
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Christopher Jordan NOTE: Any future review of detention will remain with the magistrate judge who entered the first detention order, even if an order of referral to a different magistrate judge is entered on this defendant's case Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 10/3/2024.(jlh)
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL that case has been transferred to District of Columbia per order entered 10/3/2024. Minute entries and Commitment to Another District Order sent. (jlh)
Related: [-]
10 10 Notice to USDC District of Columbia of a Rule 5 or Rule 32 Initial Appearance as to Christopher Jordan. Your case number is: 1:24-mj-00309. Docket sheet and documents attached. (If you require certified copies of any documents, please send a request to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov. If you wish to designate a different email address for future transfers, send your request to InterDistrictTransfer_TXND@txnd.uscourts.gov.) (jlh)
Related: [-]