California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-03482
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2024
Terminated:Oct 08, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Oct 13, 2024 12:41 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Brendan Barber
Doj-Usao
contact info
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Musab Khaled Shehadeh (1)
Terminated: 10/08/2024
Represented By
Crystal Dawn Erlandson
Sevens Legal, Apc
contact info
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Lisa Kadenge Muloma
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Material Witness
Mohammad Natheir Mohammad Alwashah
Terminated: 10/08/2024
Represented By
Jonathan D Frank
Law Office Of Jonathan D Frank
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/13/2024 1:32 AM PDT
Thursday, September 12, 2024
Arrest of Musab Khaled Shehadeh (no document attached) (fjp)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Musab Khaled Shehadeh.(fjp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Minute Order by Magistrate Judge Benjamin J. Cheeks: Material Witness Attorney Jonathan D Frank for Mohammad Natheir Mohammad Alwashah appointed. Initial Appearance set for 9/13/2024 before Magistrate Judge Benjamin J. Cheeks. (no document attached) (gac)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Musab Khaled Shehadeh (1) $10,000 P/S secured by 1 FRA, 10% cash deposit.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin J. Cheeks on 9/13/2024. (cxl)
Related: [-]
6 6 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Musab Khaled Shehadeh (cxl)
Related: [-]
7 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Benjamin J. Cheeks: Initial Appearance as to Musab Khaled Shehadeh held on 9/13/2024. Appointed Federal Defenders for Musab Khaled Shehadeh. Bond set as to Musab Khaled Shehadeh (1) $10,000 PS secured by 1 FRA and 10% cash deposit. Rule 5 advisement provided. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 9/26/24 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Benjamin J. Cheeks. Arraignment set for 10/10/24 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Benjamin J. Cheeks. ) The Court confirms the appointment of MW counsel Jonathan Frank(n/a). (CD# 9/13/2024 BJC 24-1:2:08-3:09). (Plaintiff Attorney Carlos Arguello AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Julian Bugarin, Marissa Martinez FD-S/A). (aje)
Related: [-]
8 8 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Musab Khaled Shehadeh (no document attached) (aje)
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER as to Musab Khaled Shehadeh: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin J. Cheeks on 9/13/24. (aje)
Related: [-]