California Central District Court
Judge:Mark C Scarsi
Referred: Pedro V Castillo
Case #: 2:24-cv-08993
Nature of Suit230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause28:1443(1) Notice of Removal - Rent, Lease & Ejectment
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2024
Terminated:Oct 22, 2024
Case in other court:Superior Court of CA for the County of Los Angeles, 24SMUD01802
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 16, 2025 1:29 AM PDT
Defendant
Briana Walters
3640 S Sepulveda Boulevard, No. 256
Los Angeles, CA 90034
Plaintiff
NF Capital Finance, LP
Represented By
Manisha Bajaj
Kimball Tirey And St John LLP
contact info
Mackenzie Clara Gonzales
Kimball Tirey And St John LLP
contact info
Chris J. Evans
Kimball Tirey And St. John LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
9 9 misc Receipt Fri 11/15 3:57 PM
Receipt of Remand by Los Angeles County Superior Court, Santa Monica on 11/5/2024 (lc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
8 8 misc Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form Tue 10/22 7:04 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT. SANTA MONICA, No. 24SMUD01802. (lc)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 10/22 7:01 PM
ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: The Court sua sponte REMANDS this action to the California Superior Court for theCounty of for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Defendant's application to proceed in forma pauperis3 is denied as moot. Case Remanded to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Santa Monica, No. 24SMUD01802. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated.) (lc)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 10/18 4:23 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 10/18 4:23 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 10/18 4:22 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (et)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 10/18 4:11 PM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS (Short Form) filed by Defendant Briana Walters. (et)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 10/18 4:07 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Briana Walters. (et)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 10/18 4:05 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA for the County of Los Angeles, case number 24SMUD01802 with CONFORMED E-FILED copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge Mark C. Scarsi, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo., filed by Defendant Briana Walters.. (et)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
answer Answer to Complaint Fri 10/18 4:06 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT1 filed by Defendant Briana Walters. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/16/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ). (et)
Related: [-]