Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Beth Bloom
Referred: Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein
Case #: 1:24-cv-24048
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 21, 2024
Last checked: Friday Dec 06, 2024 5:32 AM EST
Defendant
Global Source Recycling Company, LLC
Represented By
Benjamin Jacobs Widlanski
Kozyak Tropin Throckmorton LLP
contact info
Meaghan E. Goldstein
contact info
Detra Shaw-Wilder
Kozyak Tropin & Throckmorton
contact info
Defendant
Derek Wachob
915 S 45th West Pl
Sapulpa, OK 74066
Represented By
Benjamin Jacobs Widlanski
Kozyak Tropin Throckmorton LLP
contact info
Meaghan E. Goldstein
contact info
Detra Shaw-Wilder
Kozyak Tropin & Throckmorton
contact info
Interested Party
Geoff Lieberthal
Represented By
Allan Aaron Joseph
Fuerst Ittleman David & Joseph
contact info
Plaintiff
Chad Braver
801 W Dilido Dr.
Miami Beach, FL 33139
Represented By
Stephen Joseph Kolski, Jr.
Stephen J. Kolski & Associates, P.A.
contact info
Nicholas Anniello Petrosino
Stephen J. Kolski & Associates, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Skip Braver
Represented By
Stephen Joseph Kolski, Jr.
Stephen J. Kolski & Associates, P.A.
contact info
Nicholas Anniello Petrosino
Stephen J. Kolski & Associates, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
110 110 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Discovery Hearing. A discovery hearing is hereby scheduled to take place in Courtroom 5 of the C. Clyde Atkins United States Courthouse, 301 North Miami Avenue, Miami, Florida, 33128 on April 16, 2025, at 2:30 p.m. before United States Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein. The Parties must appear in person for the hearing. If the Parties resolve any of the discovery issues, they shall promptly notify chambers via email. Signed by Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein on 4/15/2025. (MFE)
Related: [-]
109 109 ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULING ORDER AND CERTAIN PRETRIAL DEADLINES: Amended Pleadings due by 5/27/2025. Discovery due by 8/5/2025. Expert Discovery due by 8/5/2025. Joinder of Parties due by 5/27/2025. Mediation Deadline 8/7/2025. In Limine Motions due by 11/17/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2025. Motions due by 8/15/2025. Joint Pretrial Stipulation due by 11/17/2025. Jury Trial set for 12/1/2025 at 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom. Calendar Call set for 11/25/2025 at 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/14/2025. See attached document for full details. (gqa) [LINK:Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
108 108 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 04/14 4:35 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting Motion to Extend Certain Trial Order Deadlines. ECF No.107 . Amended Scheduling Order to follow. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (tsn)
Related: [-]
107 107 motion Extension of Time Mon 04/14 4:15 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time Extend Deadlines from the Trial Courts Order by Skip Braver, Chad Braver. Responses due by 4/28/2025.(Kolski, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit A The Proposed Order
Friday, April 11, 2025
106 106 order Order on Expedited Motion Fri 04/11 5:36 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part104 Expedited Motion for Excess Pages. The Defendants are permitted to file an Omnibus Motion to Dismiss not to exceed 30 pages; Plaintiffs are permitted to file an Opposition not to exceed 30 pages; any Reply shall not exceed 15 pages. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
Related: [-]
105 105 3 pgs misc Memorandum Fri 04/11 5:10 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition of DEFENDANTS' EXPEDITED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION by Skip Braver, Chad Braver. (Kolski, Stephen)
Related: [-]
104 104 4 pgs motion Expedited Motion Fri 04/11 4:08 PM
Defendant's EXPEDITED MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitations re74 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal by PARAGON INDUSTRIES, INC, WACHOB PROPERTIES, LLC, WACHOB IRREVOCABLE TRUST DATED JULY 21, 2011, Derek Wachob, Global Source Recycling Company, LLC.(Iragorri Bernal, Antonia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A