Mertens et al v. Biden et al
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rodney H Holmes |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-01405 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 20, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 3:20 AM CDT |
Defendant
Administrative Office of the Courts
|
|
Defendant
Sioban Akers
|
|
Defendant
Cynthia Albin
|
|
Defendant
Kerry Allen
|
|
Defendant
Lutricia Allen
|
|
Defendant
Henry E. Autrey
|
|
Defendant
Averhealth
|
|
Defendant
Ballwin Police Department
|
|
Defendant
Barnes-Jewish Hospital of Saint Louis
|
|
Defendant
Crista Beracha
|
|
Defendant
Scott Bernstein
|
|
Defendant
Jorden Berti
|
|
Defendant
David S. Betz
|
|
Defendant
Joe Biden
|
|
Defendant
John R. Bird
|
|
Defendant
John M. Bodenhausen
|
|
Defendant
Bradley R. Bodeux
|
|
Defendant
John Borbonus
|
|
Defendant
Lance Christian Bretsnyder
|
|
Defendant
Unknown Brewer
|
|
Defendant
Bringing Family Together
|
|
Defendant
Maia Brodie
|
|
Defendant
Unknown Brooks
|
|
Defendant
Greg Brough
|
|
Defendant
Jillian Brown
|
|
Defendant
Michael Burgoyne
|
|
Defendant
Van Buskirk
|
|
Defendant
Adam Carnal
|
|
Defendant
Leigh Carson
|
|
Defendant
Alicia Carter
|
|
Defendant
Dr. Mina Charepoo
|
|
Defendant
Kelly Chevalier
|
|
Defendant
Circuit Court of Saint County
|
|
Defendant
City of Saint Louis Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Nathan S. Cohen
|
|
Defendant
Linda Colburn
|
|
Defendant
Kimberly Jean Coleman
|
|
Defendant
Jenna Conley
|
|
Defendant
Jenna Rohr Conley
|
|
Defendant
Anna Elizabeth Connely
|
|
Defendant
Adam Coonce
|
|
Defendant
County Clerk of Court Operations
|
|
Defendant
County of Saint Louis Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Crawford County Police Department
|
|
Defendant
Crisis Intervention Team of Saint Louis City
|
|
Defendant
David Redmond Crosby
|
|
Defendant
George Allen Crouch
|
|
Defendant
D.C.F.S. Crawford County
|
|
Defendant
Mary Davidson
|
|
Defendant
Duwain Dean
|
|
Defendant
Gina Dean
|
|
Defendant
Department of Social Services
|
|
Defendant
Alinda Dickerson
|
|
Defendant
Michael Dickerson
|
|
Defendant
Amy Diemer
|
|
Defendant
Jason D. Dodson
|
|
Defendant
Domestic Relations of Saint Louis County
|
|
Defendant
Shamantha Edwards
|
|
Defendant
Kenyatta Eleby
|
|
Defendant
Jamie Lynn Emahiser
|
|
Defendant
Brittany Erker
|
|
Defendant
Every Child's Hope
|
|
Defendant
Family Forward
|
|
Defendant
Federal Bureau of Investigation of Saint Louis
|
|
Defendant
James Fendelman
|
|
Defendant
John Fenley
|
|
Defendant
Mayra Flesner
|
|
Defendant
Deputy Unknown Fluck
|
|
Defendant
Charles B. Flynn
|
|
Defendant
Franklin County Police Department
|
|
Defendant
Michael E. Gardner
|
|
Defendant
Jessica Whelan Giddens
|
|
Defendant
Joan M. Gilmer
|
|
Defendant
Frank Ross Gipson
|
|
Defendant
Elliot Goldberger
|
|
Defendant
Jacquelyn Gonz
|
|
Defendant
Good Shepherd
|
|
Defendant
Bill Grant
|
|
Defendant
Mary W. Greaves
|
|
Defendant
Joseph L. Green
|
|
Defendant
William Gregory
|
|
Defendant
Mark W. Haefner
|
|
Defendant
Holly Hamilton
|
|
Defendant
Robert N. Hamilton
|
|
Defendant
Ryley Hamilton
|
|
Defendant
Michelle Hammond
|
|
Defendant
Renee Hardin-Tammons
|
|
Defendant
Shevon Harris
|
|
Defendant
Betty Jene Hasnmann
|
|
Defendant
Health and Human Services of the United States
|
|
Defendant
Matthew Hill Hearne
|
|
Defendant
Unknown Hecox
|
|
Defendant
Robert M. Heggie
|
|
Defendant
Sandra Faragut Hemphil
|
|
Defendant
Deborah C. Moron Henry
|
|
Defendant
Megan Julian Higgins
|
|
Defendant
Bruce F. Hilton
|
|
Defendant
Jodie Hodge
|
|
Defendant
Marshall Hoekel
|
|
Defendant
Jennifer Hoffman
|
|
Defendant
Neil Hogan
|
|
Defendant
Holon Inclusive Health System
|
|
Defendant
Homeland Security of Saint Louis
|
|
Defendant
Dale W. Hood
|
|
Defendant
Colleen Hubble
|
|
Defendant
Cortnie Hulett
|
|
Defendant
Tiffany Hytrek
|
|
Defendant
Tiffany Ann Hytrek
|
|
Defendant
Internal Affairs Division
|
|
Defendant
Venus Jackson
|
|
Defendant
Jefferson County Sheriff's Department
|
|
Defendant
Erica Jenkins
|
|
Defendant
Bridgett Kastner
|
|
Defendant
Cara C. Keeble
|
|
Defendant
Mark Kiesewetter
|
|
Defendant
Troy Korte
|
|
Defendant
Kelly Landre-Wright
|
|
Defendant
Teresa Langford
|
|
Defendant
John R. Lasater
|
|
Defendant
Julia Pusateri Lasater
|
|
Defendant
Chimene Yavonne Laskey
|
|
Defendant
Myra Leary
|
|
Defendant
Dr. Unknown Lebowitz
|
|
Defendant
Betsy Ledgerwood
|
|
Defendant
Beth Lewandowski
|
|
Defendant
Rachel Lien
|
|
Defendant
Rachna Lien
|
|
Defendant
Carol Love
|
|
Defendant
Unknown Lunyou
|
|
Defendant
Daymond Wayne Lynn
|
|
Defendant
Emily Mathews
|
|
Defendant
Jacqueline Matreci
|
|
Defendant
Unknown McClure
|
|
Defendant
Unknown McKinney
|
|
Defendant
Amanda Bundren McNelley
|
|
Defendant
Jeffrey Paul Medler
|
|
Defendant
Sarah Melz
|
|
Defendant
Mercy Hospital South
|
|
Defendant
Mercy South
|
|
Defendant
Edward Miles
An Individual 1521 E. Grand
St. Louis, MO 63107 |
|
Defendant
Jeff Millar
|
|
Defendant
Henry Miller, Jr.
|
|
Defendant
Darrell Missey
|
|
Defendant
Missouri Attorney General's Office
A Municipal Entity
Jefferson City, MO 65109 |
|
Defendant
Missouri Department of Social Services
A Municipal Entity 221 W. High Street
Jefferson City, MO 65101 |
|
Defendant
Missouri Eastern Court of Appeals
|
|
Defendant
Diane Monahan
|
|
Defendant
Ashley Janel Moore
|
|
Defendant
Kenzie Mooty
|
|
Defendant
Molly Murphy
|
|
Defendant
John Thomas Nanny
|
|
Defendant
Rick Nelson
|
|
Defendant
Colby Newborn
|
|
Defendant
Cynthia Newborn
|
|
Defendant
Arthur Nissenbaum
|
|
Defendant
Arthur H. Nissenbaum
|
|
Defendant
Matthew H. Noce
|
|
Defendant
Tina Nugent
|
|
Defendant
Kurt S. Odenwald
|
|
Defendant
Gabby Olejnik
|
|
Defendant
Olive Street Pharmacy
|
|
Defendant
Mary E. Ott
|
|
Defendant
Ed Page
|
|
Defendant
Dr. Christopher Parks
|
|
Defendant
Michael L. Parson
An Individual Governor of Missouri P.O. Box 720
Jefferson City, MO 65102 |
|
Defendant
Patrick W. Pedano
|
|
Defendant
Ann Pendegrass
|
|
Defendant
Krista S. Peyton
|
|
Defendant
Andrew Pichler
|
|
Defendant
Jennifer Piper
|
|
Defendant
Sarah E. Pitlyk
|
|
Defendant
Sarah Pleban
|
|
Defendant
Kelly Ploesser
|
|
Defendant
Sylvia Pociask
|
|
Defendant
Elaine Pudlowski
|
|
Defendant
Chad Rackers
|
|
Defendant
Lynn Reichert
|
|
Defendant
James D. Reid
|
|
Defendant
Sharon Remis
|
|
Defendant
Jesus Alejandro Martinez Reyes
|
|
Defendant
Richmond Heights Police Department
|
|
Defendant
Patricia Ann Riehl
|
|
Defendant
Gordon H Robinson
|
|
Defendant
Robinwood Elementary
|
|
Defendant
Deputy Krystal Rock
|
|
Defendant
Megan Anne Rodgers
|
|
Defendant
Deborah Roeder
|
|
Defendant
Laura Roy
|
|
Defendant
Mary R. Russell
|
|
Defendant
Justin Ruth
|
|
Defendant
Saint Louis City Police Department
|
|
Defendant
Saint Louis City Sheriff's Department
|
|
Defendant
Saint Louis County Bar
|
|
Defendant
Saint Louis County Police Department
A Municipal Entity 7900 Forsyth Blvd.
Clayton, MO 63105 |
|
Defendant
Saint Louis Federal Court Legal Advice Clinic
|
|
Defendant
Joseph S. Sanchez
|
|
Defendant
Dr. Susan Sanderson
|
|
Defendant
Corporal Unknown Scharfenberg
|
|
Defendant
Matthew T. Schelp
|
|
Defendant
Sargent Unknown Schilli
|
|
Defendant
Patricia Seidel
|
|
Defendant
Carl Seltzer
|
|
Defendant
Nicole Mertens Senn
|
|
Defendant
Elizabeth Middelton Sheehan
|
|
Defendant
Shelby C. Shire
|
|
Defendant
Franco Sicuro
|
|
Defendant
Alejandro Sigala
|
|
Defendant
Alicia Sigala
|
|
Defendant
Lisa Sigmund
|
|
Defendant
Sargent Unknown Simon
|
|
Defendant
Rodney W. Sippel
|
|
Defendant
Sanda Smajlovic-Gunn
|
|
Defendant
Unknown Smith
|
|
Defendant
Olainki Spraggins
|
|
Defendant
Laura Stobie
|
|
Defendant
Sullivan Police Department
A Municipal Entity 400 East Locust
Union, MO 63084 |
|
Defendant
Supreme Court of Missouri
|
|
Defendant
Shirley R. Tasker
|
|
Defendant
Betty Thompson
|
|
Defendant
Charlie Thompson
|
|
Defendant
George Edward Tillman
|
|
Defendant
Evita Tolu
|
|
Defendant
John Tressler
|
|
Defendant
Matthew Edwin Lee Voorhees
|
|
Defendant
Devon Nicole Votaw
|
|
Defendant
Brian Wach
|
|
Defendant
Justin Wach
|
|
Defendant
WebWatcher
|
|
Defendant
WebWatcher by Awareness Technologies
|
|
Defendant
Hannah Weis
|
|
Defendant
Ericka Wentzel
|
|
Defendant
Kimberly D. Whittle
|
|
Defendant
Eric Willbanks
|
|
Defendant
Brenton Williams
|
|
Defendant
Briana Williams
|
|
Defendant
Darnell M. Willis
|
|
Defendant
Armand Wilson
|
|
Defendant
Joanne Wilson
|
|
Defendant
Nicole S. Zellweger
|
|
Defendant
Deputy Trevor Zugmaier
|
|
Plaintiff
Ariel Alton
An Enfranchised Living Soul 1227 N Florissant Rd.
Saint Louis, MO 63135 |
|
Plaintiff
Ryan Nicholas Brown
An Enfranchised Living Soul 201 Turtle Dr. Apt 101
Fenton, MO 63026 |
|
Plaintiff
Alexandra Marie Dean
An Enfranchised Living Soul 4573 Jonathan St.
Hastings, FL 32145 |
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Marryann Dickerson
An Enfranchised Living Soul 8589 Bowden St.
Douglas, GA 30134 |
|
Plaintiff
Brooke J. Marr
An Enfranchised Living Soul 3540 Lucy Ave.
St. Louis, MO 63116 |
|
Plaintiff
James Mertens
An Enfranchised Living Soul 49497 Highway 49
Annapolis, MO 63620 |
|
Plaintiff
Justin E. Shire
An Enfranchised Living Soul 2392 Derby Road
Birmingham, MI 48009 |
|
Plaintiff
Whitney Thompson
An Enfranchised Living Soul 19 Marymount Ct
Valley Park, MO 63088 |
Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, April 21, 2025 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to James Mertens. Returned document(s):4 Letter Magistrate Consent Non-Compliance,5 Letter Magistrate Consent Non-Compliance,6 Letter Magistrate Consent Non-Compliance. Could not verify new address and mail was not resent. (JEB) |
|
Friday, April 11, 2025 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Ryan Brown. Returned document(s):9 Letter Magistrate Consent Non-Compliance. Could not verify new address and mail was not resent. (HMA) |
|
Friday, March 21, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Letter from Clerk sent to Plaintiff Ariel Alton re: Failure to file Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 3/27/2025. (CLH) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 03/21 4:32 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11. Mailed to party not set up for electronic delivery. Fri Mar 21 16:32:55 CDT 2025 (CLH) |
||
Thursday, March 20, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Letter from Clerk sent to Plaintiff Justin E. Shire re: Failure to file Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 3/27/2025. (CLH) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
10 | 10
![]() Letter from Clerk sent to Plaintiff Brooke J. Marr re: Failure to file Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 3/27/2025. (CLH) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
9 | 9
![]() Letter from Clerk sent to Plaintiff Ryan Nicholas Brown re: Failure to file Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 3/27/2025. (CLH) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
7 | 7
![]() Letter from Clerk sent to Plaintiff Whitney Thompson re: Failure to file Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 3/27/2025. (CLH) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
6 | 6
![]() Letter from Clerk sent to Plaintiff Alexandra Marie Dean re: Failure to file Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 3/27/2025. (CLH) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
5 | 5
![]() Letter from Clerk sent to Plaintiff Michelle Marryann Dickerson re: Failure to file Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 3/27/2025. (CLH) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
4 | 4
![]() Letter from Clerk sent to Plaintiff James Mertens re: Failure to file Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 3/27/2025. (CLH) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 03/20 3:07 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 6. Mailed to party not set up for electronic delivery. Thu Mar 20 15:07:03 CDT 2025 (CLH) |
||
Tuesday, October 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08
Tue 10/22 6:22 PM
Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto) |
|
misc
Case Opening Notification
Tue 10/22 9:32 AM
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Rodney H. Holmes. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible.[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (JWD) |
||
misc
Complaint Letter Created (Case Opening Event ONLY)
Tue 10/22 9:32 AM
***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD) |
||
misc
Complaint Letter Processed (Case Opening Event ONLY)
Tue 10/22 10:00 AM
***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Tue Oct 22 10:00:53 CDT 2024 (admin,) |
||
Sunday, October 20, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff James Mertens. (JWD) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants, Jury Demand, filed by Ryan Nicholas Brown, Whitney Thompson, Justin E. Shire, James Mertens, Ariel Alton, Alexandra Marie Dean, Brooke J. Marr, Michelle Maryann Dickerson.(JWD) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |