Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Gerald A Mchugh
Case #: 2:24-cv-05657
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1391 Personal Injury
Case Filed:Oct 23, 2024
Terminated:Feb 10, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 4:33 AM EDT
Defendant
WALI CHAUDHRY
2707 Arlington Drive, Apt. 204
Alexandra, VA 22306
Represented By
ALYSON M. SCIACCA
Law Offices Of W. Kelly Mcwilliams
contact info
Defendant
QUALITY FREIGHT LINE INC
7261 Linden Tree Ln.
Springfield, VA 22152
Represented By
ALYSON M. SCIACCA
Law Offices Of W. Kelly Mcwilliams
contact info
Plaintiff
ANDRE SHELTON
2014 N 8th Street
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19151
Represented By
MARC I. SIMON
Simon & Simon, PC
contact info
ROMAN T. GALAS
Simon & Simon
contact info

GPO Jan 27 2025
MEMORANDUM; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 1/27/25. 1/27/25 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
GPO Jan 27 2025
ORDER THAT ATTORNEY MARC I. SIMON IS REPRIMANDED FOR VIOLATING RULE 11(B). PRACTICING LAW IS A PRIVILEGE THAT COMES WITH SIGNIFICANT RESPONSIBILITIES TO CLIENTS, OTHER PARTIES, THE COURT, TAXPAYERS, AND SOCIETY AT LARGE. FAILING TO COMPLY WITH THE DUTIES OF AN ATTORNEY BY FILING PLEADINGS CONTAINING FALSE REPRESENTATIONS AND LEGALLY UNSUPPORTABLE CONTENTIONS IS A VIOLATION OF RULE 11 THAT WASTES RESOURCES. ATTORNEY MARC I. SIMON SHALL PERSONALLY PAY $7,500 TO THE CLERKS OFFICE, UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT OF THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA, WITHIN TEN (10) DAYS OF THIS ORDER. THIS SUM SHALL NOT BE COUNTED AS A LITIGATION EXPENSE, OR IN ANY WAY BE DEDUCTED FROM ANY JUDGMENT OR SETTLEMENT PLAINTIFF SHELTON MAY ULTIMATELY COLLECT; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 1/27/25. 1/27/25 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
misc Remark Tue 02/11 8:14 AM
THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS TRANSFERRED TO USDC MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PA (JL)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order Mon 02/10 4:03 PM
ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS TRANSFERRED TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 2/10/25. 2/10/25 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs order Order Mon 02/10 4:01 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT WITHIN 10 DAYS OF EXECUTION OF THIS STIPULATION, PLAINTIFF ANDRE SHELTON (PLAINTIFF) SHALL FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT WHICH, PER THE PARTIES AGREEMENT, SHALL AMEND PARAGRAPH 6 AS FOLLOWS: ON OR ABOUT JANUARY 16, 2024, AT OR ABOUT 12:40 AM, PLAINTIFF WAS THE OPERATOR OF A MOTOR VEHICLE TRAVELING SOUTH ON INTERSTATE 81 (I-81) IN/NEAR SWATARA TOWNSHIP, PA, APPROACHING MILE MARKER 93.0. PLAINTIFF AND THE NAMED DEFENDANTS SHALL SUBSEQUENTLY TAKE ALL NECESSARY STEPS TO TRANSFER THIS ACTION TO THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 2/10/25. 2/10/25 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
misc Deposit of Funds Fri 02/07 2:49 PM
$7500 Payment of Sanctions by Attorney, Marc I. Simon on 2/5/25. Receipt # 20026891 (sbt)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Order Mon 01/27 3:37 PM
ORDER THAT ATTORNEY MARC I. SIMON IS REPRIMANDED FOR VIOLATING RULE 11(B). PRACTICING LAW IS A PRIVILEGE THAT COMES WITH SIGNIFICANT RESPONSIBILITIES TO CLIENTS, OTHER PARTIES, THE COURT, TAXPAYERS, AND SOCIETY AT LARGE. FAILING TO COMPLY WITH THE DUTIES OF AN ATTORNEY BY FILING PLEADINGS CONTAINING FALSE REPRESENTATIONS AND LEGALLY UNSUPPORTABLE CONTENTIONS IS A VIOLATION OF RULE 11 THAT WASTES RESOURCES. ATTORNEY MARC I. SIMON SHALL PERSONALLY PAY $7,500 TO THE CLERKS OFFICE, UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT OF THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA, WITHIN TEN (10) DAYS OF THIS ORDER. THIS SUM SHALL NOT BE COUNTED AS A LITIGATION EXPENSE, OR IN ANY WAY BE DEDUCTED FROM ANY JUDGMENT OR SETTLEMENT PLAINTIFF SHELTON MAY ULTIMATELY COLLECT; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 1/27/25. 1/27/25 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
14 14 21 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Mon 01/27 3:33 PM
MEMORANDUM; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 1/27/25. 1/27/25 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
13 13 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Fri 12/20 9:45 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by ANDRE SHELTON. (SIMON, MARC)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order Fri 12/13 4:59 PM
ORDER THAT ATTORNEY MARC I. SIMON IS GRANTED LEAVE, SHOULD HE SO CHOOSE, TO SUBMIT TO THE COURT IN WRITING WITHIN TEN DAYS ANY SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF OR MATERIALS HE WISHES THE COURT TO CONSIDER WHEN DECIDING WHICH SANCTIONS ARE APPROPRIATE; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 12/13/24. 12/13/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 12/06 11:08 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ANDRE SHELTON served Summons and Complaint upon QUALITY FREIGHT LINE INC by PERSONAL. QUALITY FREIGHT LINE INC served on 12/4/2024, answer due 12/26/2024. (SIMON, MARC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
10 10 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Thu 12/05 8:33 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by ANDRE SHELTON. (SIMON, MARC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 11/26 4:55 PM
ORDER THAT ATTORNEY MARC I. SIMON IS HEREBY ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE IN WRITING WITHIN 10 DAYS WHY HE SHOULD NOT BE SUBJECT TO RULE 11 SANCTIONS FOR FILING A CONTRADICTORY AND FACTUALLY INACCURATE COMPLAINT, INCONGRUOUSLY REPRESENTING THAT THE MOTOR VEHICLE ACCIDENT AT ISSUE IN THIS CASE OCCURRED IN "ALEXANDRA" VIRGINIA AND ASSERTING VENUE WITHIN THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA ON THE GROUND THAT "A SUBSTANTIAL PORTION OF THE EVENTS OR OMISSIONS GIVING RISE TO THE CLAIMS OCCURRED HERE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 11/26/24. 11/26/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
8 8 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Mon 11/25 4:51 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by WALI CHAUDHRY, QUALITY FREIGHT LINE INC.(SCIACCA, ALYSON)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 11/20 4:47 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ANDRE SHELTON re: PS served Summons and Complaint upon WALI CHAUDHRY by PERSONAL. WALI CHAUDHRY served on 10/31/2024, answer due 11/21/2024. (SIMON, MARC)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
6 6 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 11/18 7:26 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by WALI CHAUDHRY, QUALITY FREIGHT LINE INC.MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(SCIACCA, ALYSON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum MEMORANDUM OF LAW,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order TEXT OF PROPOSED ORDERS,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit A Plaintiffs Complaint, ECF No. 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit B Pennsylvania Police Report dated 1/16/24,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit C Results of Corporate Database Search of Defendant Quality Freight Line Inc. on Virginia State Corporation Commission (VA SCC) website
Thursday, November 14, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/14 1:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ALYSON M. SCIACCA on behalf of WALI CHAUDHRY, QUALITY FREIGHT LINE INC with Jury Demand(SCIACCA, ALYSON)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/28 12:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ROMAN T. GALAS on behalf of ANDRE SHELTON (GALAS, ROMAN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Thu 10/24 12:11 PM
NOTICE by ANDRE SHELTON Updated Designation Form (SIMON, MARC)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 10/24 10:54 AM
Summons Issued as to WALI CHAUDHRY, QUALITY FREIGHT LINE INC. Forwarded To: E-MAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 10/24/24 (JL)
Related: [-]
misc Attorney Required Forms Thu 10/24 10:14 AM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Designation form (Outdated Form, Please Re-file Using Updated Form on the Court's Website). (sbt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Wed 10/23 4:40 PM
COMPLAINT against WALI CHAUDHRY ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17831421.), filed by ANDRE SHELTON.(SIMON, MARC)
Related: [-]