Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Sara Lioi
Case #: 5:24-cv-01851
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Oct 24, 2024
Terminated:Jan 31, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 22, 2025 4:28 AM EDT
Defendant
Stark County, Ohio Probate Court
Plaintiff
Greg Kennedy
1803 Saint Elmo NE
Canton, OH 44705

GPO Jan 31 2025
Memorandum Opinion and Order granting plaintiff's 2 motion to proceed in forma pauperis and dismissing the case. Chief District Judge Sara Lioi on 1/31/2025. (V,A)

Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, January 31, 2025
4 4 order Judgment Fri 01/31 8:22 AM
Judgment Entry . For the reasons set forth in the contemporaneously filed memorandum opinion and order, plaintiff Greg Kennedy's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. No.2 ) is granted. This case is dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(h)(3). The Court further certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith. Chief District Judge Sara Lioi on 1/31/2025. (V,A)
Related: [-]
3 3 minutes ~Util - Terminate Motions Memorandum Opinion and Order Fri 01/31 8:16 AM
Memorandum Opinion and Order granting plaintiff's2 motion to proceed in forma pauperis and dismissing the case. Chief District Judge Sara Lioi on 1/31/2025. (V,A)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Fri 01/31 8:24 AM
Copy of3 Memorandum Opinion and Order and4 Judgment Entry mailed to Greg Kennedy at 1803 Saint Elmo NE Canton, OH 44705 on 1/31/2025. (V,A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 10/24 4:51 PM
Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Greg Kennedy. Related document(s)1 . (E,CK)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/24 4:49 PM
Complaint against Stark County, Ohio Probate Court. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Greg Kennedy. (E,CK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judge Thu 10/24 4:49 PM
Chief District Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (E,CK)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Thu 10/24 4:50 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. (E,CK)
Related: [-]