New York Southern District Court
Judge:Margaret M Garnett
Case #: 1:24-cv-08142
Nature of Suit160 Contract - Stockholders’ Suits
Cause28:1332fd Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Case Filed:Oct 25, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 23, 2025 4:41 AM EDT
Defendant
Laura M. Bishop
Represented By
Stephen Ehrenberg
Sullivan And Cromwell, Llp(nyc)
contact info
Marc De Leeuw
Sullivan And Cromwell, Llp(nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Carol J. Zierhoffer
Represented By
Stephen Ehrenberg
Sullivan And Cromwell, Llp(nyc)
contact info
Marc De Leeuw
Sullivan And Cromwell, Llp(nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Christine J. Thompson
Represented By
Eben Colby
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
James R. Carroll
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Marley Ann Brumme
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom Llp (ma)
contact info
Scott D. Musoff
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Defendant
Kenneth B. Robins
Represented By
Eben Colby
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
James R. Carroll
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Marley Ann Brumme
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom Llp (ma)
contact info
Scott D. Musoff
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Defendant
Mark A. Murray
Represented By
Stephen Ehrenberg
Sullivan And Cromwell, Llp(nyc)
contact info
Marc De Leeuw
Sullivan And Cromwell, Llp(nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Jennifer Toolin McAuliffe
Represented By
Eben Colby
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
James R. Carroll
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Marley Ann Brumme
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom Llp (ma)
contact info
Scott D. Musoff
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Defendant
Marie L. Knowles
Represented By
Stephen Ehrenberg
Sullivan And Cromwell, Llp(nyc)
contact info
Marc De Leeuw
Sullivan And Cromwell, Llp(nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Michael E. Kenneally
Represented By
Stephen Ehrenberg
Sullivan And Cromwell, Llp(nyc)
contact info
Marc De Leeuw
Sullivan And Cromwell, Llp(nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Arthur E. Johnson
Represented By
Stephen Ehrenberg
Sullivan And Cromwell, Llp(nyc)
contact info
Marc De Leeuw
Sullivan And Cromwell, Llp(nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Abigail P. Johnson
Represented By
Eben Colby
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
James R. Carroll
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Marley Ann Brumme
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom Llp (ma)
contact info
Scott D. Musoff
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Defendant
Robert W. Helm
Represented By
Stephen Ehrenberg
Sullivan And Cromwell, Llp(nyc)
contact info
Marc De Leeuw
Sullivan And Cromwell, Llp(nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Christopher M. Gouveia
Represented By
Eben Colby
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
James R. Carroll
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Marley Ann Brumme
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom Llp (ma)
contact info
Scott D. Musoff
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Defendant
Robert Gartland
Represented By
Stephen Ehrenberg
Sullivan And Cromwell, Llp(nyc)
contact info
Marc De Leeuw
Sullivan And Cromwell, Llp(nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Fidelity Management & Research Company LLC
Represented By
Eben Colby
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
James R. Carroll
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Marley Ann Brumme
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom Llp (ma)
contact info
Scott D. Musoff
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Defendant
John Engler
Represented By
Stephen Ehrenberg
Sullivan And Cromwell, Llp(nyc)
contact info
Marc De Leeuw
Sullivan And Cromwell, Llp(nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Ann E. Dunwoody
Represented By
Stephen Ehrenberg
Sullivan And Cromwell, Llp(nyc)
contact info
Marc De Leeuw
Sullivan And Cromwell, Llp(nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Laura M. Del Prato
Represented By
Eben Colby
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
James R. Carroll
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Marley Ann Brumme
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom Llp (ma)
contact info
Scott D. Musoff
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Defendant
John J. Burke III
Represented By
Eben Colby
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
James R. Carroll
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Marley Ann Brumme
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom Llp (ma)
contact info
Scott D. Musoff
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Defendant
Elizabeth S. Acton
Represented By
Stephen Ehrenberg
Sullivan And Cromwell, Llp(nyc)
contact info
Marc De Leeuw
Sullivan And Cromwell, Llp(nyc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Bryan Davis
Represented By
Lisa Jing
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
Shawn J. Rabin
Susman Godfrey L.L.P.
contact info
Ari S. Ruben
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
Halley Wilder Josephs
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ethan Sam
Represented By
Lisa Jing
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
Shawn J. Rabin
Susman Godfrey L.L.P.
contact info
Ari S. Ruben
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
Halley Wilder Josephs
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
39 39 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Wed 03/26 6:19 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:28 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint . . Document filed by John J. Burke III, Laura M. Del Prato, Fidelity Management & Research Company LLC, Christopher M. Gouveia, Abigail P. Johnson, Jennifer Toolin McAuliffe, Kenneth B. Robins, Christine J. Thompson..(Musoff, Scott)
Related: [-]
38 38 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Wed 03/26 4:55 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:25 MOTION to Dismiss on Behalf of the Independent Trustee Defendants . . Document filed by Elizabeth S. Acton, Laura M. Bishop, Ann E. Dunwoody, John Engler, Robert Gartland, Robert W. Helm, Arthur E. Johnson, Michael E. Kenneally, Marie L. Knowles, Mark A. Murray, Carol J. Zierhoffer..(De Leeuw, Marc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
37 37 order Protective Order Fri 03/14 11:48 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Margaret M. Garnett on 3/14/2025) (mml)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
36 36 misc Proposed Protective Order Thu 03/13 4:31 PM
PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Bryan Davis, Ethan Sam..(Josephs, Halley)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
35 35 30+ pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Mon 03/03 5:12 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:25 MOTION to Dismiss on Behalf of the Independent Trustee Defendants .,28 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint . . Document filed by Bryan Davis, Ethan Sam..(Jing, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
34 34 30+ pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Fri 02/28 11:44 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:25 MOTION to Dismiss on Behalf of the Independent Trustee Defendants .,28 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint . . Document filed by Bryan Davis, Ethan Sam..(Josephs, Halley)
Related: [-]
33 33 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/28 10:08 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ari S. Ruben on behalf of Bryan Davis, Ethan Sam..(Ruben, Ari)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
32 32 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Fri 02/21 4:09 PM
ORDER granting31 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Application GRANTED. Plaintiffs may file a single opposition brief in response to Defendants' motions to dismiss (Dkt. Nos. 25 & 28), not to exceed 17,500 words. Plaintiffs' brief shall otherwise comport with Rule II(B)(2) of the Court's Individual Rules & Practices. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate Dkt. No. 31. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Margaret M. Garnett on 2/21/2025) (mml)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
31 31 motion Leave to File Document Thu 02/20 2:07 PM
LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Omnibus Memorandum of Law In Opposition to Motions to Dismiss addressed to Judge Margaret M. Garnett from Lisa Jing dated February 20, 2025. Document filed by Bryan Davis, Ethan Sam..(Jing, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
30 30 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Tue 01/28 9:56 PM
DECLARATION of Scott D. Musoff in Support re:28 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint .. Document filed by Laura M. Del Prato, John J. Burke III, Christopher M. Gouveia, Kenneth B. Robins, Fidelity Management & Research Company LLC, Abigail P. Johnson, Jennifer Toolin McAuliffe, Christine J. Thompson..(Musoff, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- Trust Instrument,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Fidelity Government Money Market Fund Annual Report,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - SPAXX Prospectus,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - FZCXX Prospectus,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Excerpts of T. Rowe Price Government Money Fund Prospectus,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - T. Rowe Price FAQs,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Fidelity Trading FAQs,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - FINRA Guidance,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - SEC Investor Bulletin
29 29 30+ pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Tue 01/28 9:32 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:28 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint . . Document filed by Laura M. Del Prato, John J. Burke III, Christopher M. Gouveia, Kenneth B. Robins, Fidelity Management & Research Company LLC, Abigail P. Johnson, Jennifer Toolin McAuliffe, Christine J. Thompson..(Musoff, Scott)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Dismiss Tue 01/28 9:26 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint . Document filed by Laura M. Del Prato, John J. Burke III, Christopher M. Gouveia, Kenneth B. Robins, Fidelity Management & Research Company LLC, Abigail P. Johnson, Jennifer Toolin McAuliffe, Christine J. Thompson..(Musoff, Scott)
Related: [-]
27 27 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Tue 01/28 6:22 PM
DECLARATION of Marc De Leeuw in Support re:25 MOTION to Dismiss on Behalf of the Independent Trustee Defendants .. Document filed by Robert Gartland, Robert W. Helm, Michael E. Kenneally, Mark A. Murray, Carol J. Zierhoffer, John Engler, Arthur E. Johnson, Marie L. Knowles, Elizabeth S. Acton, Laura M. Bishop, Ann E. Dunwoody..(De Leeuw, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7
26 26 30+ pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Tue 01/28 6:17 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:25 MOTION to Dismiss on Behalf of the Independent Trustee Defendants . . Document filed by Robert Gartland, Robert W. Helm, Michael E. Kenneally, Mark A. Murray, Carol J. Zierhoffer, John Engler, Arthur E. Johnson, Marie L. Knowles, Elizabeth S. Acton, Laura M. Bishop, Ann E. Dunwoody..(De Leeuw, Marc)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Dismiss Tue 01/28 6:15 PM
MOTION to Dismiss on Behalf of the Independent Trustee Defendants . Document filed by Robert Gartland, Robert W. Helm, Michael E. Kenneally, Mark A. Murray, Carol J. Zierhoffer, John Engler, Arthur E. Johnson, Marie L. Knowles, Elizabeth S. Acton, Laura M. Bishop, Ann E. Dunwoody..(De Leeuw, Marc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
24 24 misc Notice of Filing Transcript Tue 01/14 7:05 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERNECE proceeding held on 1/7/2025 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Transcript Tue 01/14 7:04 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERNECE held on 1/7/2025 before Judge Margaret M. Garnett. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Devon Gerber, (212) 805-0320. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/4/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/14/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/14/2025..(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 01/07 10:08 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Margaret M. Garnett: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/7/2025. Counsel Halley Josephs, Shawn Rabin and Lisa Jing present for Plaintiffs. Counsel Scott Musoff and Eben Colby present for Defendant Fidelity Management & Research Company LLC et al. Counsel Marc De Leeuw and Matthew Souza present for remaining Defendants. (Court Reporter Carly Davis) (kv)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
22 22 misc Letter Mon 12/23 7:43 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Margaret M. Garnett from Scott D. Musoff, Lisa Jing, and Stephen Ehrenberg dated December 23, 2024 re: Response to the Court's October 29, 2024 Order. Document filed by Laura M. Del Prato, John J. Burke III, Christopher M. Gouveia, Kenneth B. Robins, Fidelity Management & Research Company LLC, Abigail P. Johnson, Jennifer Toolin McAuliffe, Christine J. Thompson..(Musoff, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit - Civil Management Plan And Scheduling Order
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
21 21 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/04 1:23 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion for Eben P. Colby to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Margaret M. Garnett)(Text Only Order) (kv)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/04 1:22 PM
ORDER granting17 Motion for James R. Carroll to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Margaret M. Garnett)(Text Only Order) (kv)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Wed 12/04 9:37 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 17 MOTION for James R. Carroll to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30270999. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Wed 12/04 9:41 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 18 MOTION for Eben P. Colby to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30271013. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
19 19 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 12/03 9:08 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent FMR, LLC for Fidelity Management & Research Company LLC. Document filed by Fidelity Management & Research Company LLC..(Musoff, Scott)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 12/03 8:53 PM
MOTION for Eben P. Colby to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30271013. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Laura M. Del Prato, John J. Burke III, Christopher M. Gouveia, Kenneth B. Robins, Fidelity Management & Research Company LLC, Abigail P. Johnson, Jennifer Toolin McAuliffe, Christine J. Thompson..(Colby, Eben)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Eben P. Colby,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (Massachusetts),
Att: 3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (Maine),
Att: 4 Exhibit Proposed Order
17 17 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 12/03 8:35 PM
MOTION for James R. Carroll to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30270999. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Laura M. Del Prato, John J. Burke III, Christopher M. Gouveia, Kenneth B. Robins, Fidelity Management & Research Company LLC, Abigail P. Johnson, Jennifer Toolin McAuliffe, Christine J. Thompson..(Carroll, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of James R. Carroll,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Exhibit Proposed Order
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/03 8:11 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marley Ann Brumme on behalf of Laura M. Del Prato, John J. Burke III, Christopher M. Gouveia, Kenneth B. Robins, Fidelity Management & Research Company LLC, Abigail P. Johnson, Jennifer Toolin McAuliffe, Christine J. Thompson..(Brumme, Marley)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/03 8:05 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott D. Musoff on behalf of Laura M. Del Prato, John J. Burke III, Christopher M. Gouveia, Kenneth B. Robins, Fidelity Management & Research Company LLC, Abigail P. Johnson, Jennifer Toolin McAuliffe, Christine J. Thompson..(Musoff, Scott)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 11/21 12:08 PM
ORDER granting13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that the responsive pleading and motion to dismiss briefing schedule jointly proposed by the parties above is so-ordered. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate Dkt. No. 13. SO ORDERED. Elizabeth S. Acton answer due 1/28/2025; Laura M. Bishop answer due 1/28/2025; John J. Burke III answer due 1/28/2025; Laura M. Del Prato answer due 1/28/2025; Ann E. Dunwoody answer due 1/28/2025; John Engler answer due 1/28/2025; Fidelity Management & Research Company LLC answer due 1/28/2025; Robert Gartland answer due 1/28/2025; Christopher M. Gouveia answer due 1/28/2025; Robert W. Helm answer due 1/28/2025; Abigail P. Johnson answer due 1/28/2025; Arthur E. Johnson answer due 1/28/2025; Michael E. Kenneally answer due 1/28/2025; Marie L. Knowles answer due 1/28/2025; Jennifer Toolin McAuliffe answer due 1/28/2025; Mark A. Murray answer due 1/28/2025; Kenneth B. Robins answer due 1/28/2025; Christine J. Thompson answer due 1/28/2025; Carol J. Zierhoffer answer due 1/28/2025. (Signed by Judge Margaret M. Garnett on 11/21/2024) (mml)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 11/21 12:11 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 1/28/2025. Responses due by 2/28/2025. Replies due by 3/26/2025. (mml)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 11/20 6:37 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Motion and Associated Papers addressed to Judge Margaret M. Garnett from Marc De Leeuw dated November 20, 2024. Document filed by Robert Gartland, Robert W. Helm, Michael E. Kenneally, Mark A. Murray, Carol J. Zierhoffer, John Engler, Arthur E. Johnson, Marie L. Knowles, Elizabeth S. Acton, Laura M. Bishop, Ann E. Dunwoody..(De Leeuw, Marc)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/20 6:21 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marc De Leeuw on behalf of Robert Gartland, Robert W. Helm, Michael E. Kenneally, Mark A. Murray, Carol J. Zierhoffer, John Engler, Arthur E. Johnson, Marie L. Knowles, Elizabeth S. Acton, Laura M. Bishop, Ann E. Dunwoody..(De Leeuw, Marc)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/20 6:17 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Ehrenberg on behalf of Robert Gartland, Robert W. Helm, Michael E. Kenneally, Mark A. Murray, Carol J. Zierhoffer, John Engler, Arthur E. Johnson, Marie L. Knowles, Elizabeth S. Acton, Laura M. Bishop, Ann E. Dunwoody..(Ehrenberg, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
10 10 service Certificate of Service Complaints Wed 11/06 2:28 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Fidelity Management & Research Company LLC served on 10/30/2024, answer due 11/20/2024. Service was accepted by INGRID LOPEZ, AGENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS. Document filed by Ethan Sam; Bryan Davis..(Josephs, Halley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Tue 10/29 4:34 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/7/2025 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Margaret M. Garnett. (Signed by Judge Margaret M. Garnett on 10/29/2024) (mml)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued Mon 10/28 3:20 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fidelity Management & Research Company LLC..(pc)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 10/28 2:19 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ABIGAIL P. JOHNSON, JENNIFER TOOLIN MCAULIFFE, CHRISTINE J. THOMPSON, ELIZABETH S. ACTON, LAURA M. BISHOP, ANN E. DUNWOODY, ROBERT GARTLAND, ROBERT W. HELM, MICHAEL E. KENNEALLY, MARK A. MURRAY, CAROL J. ZIERHOFFER, JOHN ENGLER, ARTHUR E. JOHNSON, MARIE L. KNOWLES, LAURA M. DEL PRATO, JOHN J. BURKE III, CHRISTOPHER M. GOUVEIA, AND KENNETH B. ROBINS, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Bryan Davis, Ethan Sam..(Jing, Lisa)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 10/28 1:45 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Margaret M. Garnett. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 10/28 1:45 PM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 10/28 1:46 PM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Mon 10/28 1:46 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Lisa Jing. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand blank;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $5,000,000;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Mon 10/28 1:46 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Lisa Jing. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Bryan Davis, Ethan Sam. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 10/28 1:46 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Lisa Jing to RE-FILE Document No. 6 Request for Issuance of Summons,,,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; File each summons separately or create one summons form with each party's name and address listed on a rider. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 10/25 10:01 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ABIGAIL P. JOHNSON, JENNIFER TOOLIN MCAULIFFE, CHRISTINE J. THOMPSON, ELIZABETH S. ACTON, LAURA M. BISHOP, ANN E. DUNWOODY, ROBERT GARTLAND, ROBERT W. HELM, MICHAEL E. KENNEALLY, MARK A. MURRAY, CAROL J. ZIERHOFFER, JOHN ENGLER, ARTHUR E. JOHNSON, MARIE L. KNOWLES, LAURA M. DEL PRATO, JOHN J. BURKE III, CHRISTOPHER M. GOUVEIA, AND KENNETH B. ROBINS, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Bryan Davis, Ethan Sam..(Jing, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix JENNIFER TOOLIN MCAULIFFE,
Att: 2 Appendix CHRISTINE J. THOMPSON,
Att: 3 Appendix ELIZABETH S. ACTON,
Att: 4 Appendix LAURA M. BISHOP,
Att: 5 Appendix ANN E. DUNWOODY,
Att: 6 Appendix ROBERT GARTLAND,
Att: 7 Appendix ROBERT W. HELM,
Att: 8 Appendix MICHAEL E. KENNEALLY,
Att: 9 Appendix MARK A. MURRAY,
Att: 10 Appendix CAROL J. ZIERHOFFER,
Att: 11 Appendix JOHN ENGLER,
Att: 12 Appendix ARTHUR E. JOHNSON,
Att: 13 Appendix MARIE L. KNOWLES,
Att: 14 Appendix LAURA M. DEL PRATO,
Att: 15 Appendix JOHN J. BURKE III,
Att: 16 Appendix CHRISTOPHER M. GOUVEIA,
Att: 17 Appendix KENNETH B. ROBINS
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 10/25 9:40 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to FIDELITY MANAGEMENT & RESEARCH COMPANY LLC, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Bryan Davis, Ethan Sam..(Jing, Lisa)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/25 8:53 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shawn J. Rabin on behalf of Bryan Davis, Ethan Sam..(Rabin, Shawn)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/25 8:46 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Halley Wilder Josephs on behalf of Bryan Davis, Ethan Sam..(Josephs, Halley)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 10/25 7:45 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Jing, Lisa)
Related: [-]
1 1 44 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 10/25 7:20 PM
COMPLAINT against Elizabeth S. Acton, Laura M. Bishop, John J. Burke III, Laura M. Del Prato, Ann E. Dunwoody, John Engler, Fidelity Management & Research Company LLC, Robert Gartland, Christopher M. Gouveia, Robert W. Helm, Abigail P. Johnson, Arthur E. Johnson, Michael E. Kenneally, Marie L. Knowles, Jennifer Toolin McAuliffe, Mark A. Murray, Kenneth B. Robins, Christine J. Thompson, Carol J. Zierhoffer. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30099242)Document filed by Ethan Sam, Bryan Davis..(Jing, Lisa)
Related: [-]