New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Nusrat J Choudhury
Case #: 2:24-cv-07516
Nature of Suit150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 28, 2024
Terminated:Dec 06, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 5:10 AM EDT
Defendant
Saptalis Pharmaceuticals LLC
Represented By
Jason Husgen
Husch Blackwell LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kesin Pharma Corporation
Represented By
Edward G. Bailey
Bailey Law, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 73 minutes ago
Friday, December 06, 2024
order Order Dismissing Case Fri 12/06 10:21 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The case is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) in light of the Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (ECF No. 15), because Defendant has neither filed an answer nor a motion for summary judgment. Case closed. Ordered by Judge Nusrat J. Choudhury on 12/6/2024. (NB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 12/04 2:53 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kesin Pharma Corporation (Bailey, Edward)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Letter Wed 12/04 1:30 PM
Letter by Kesin Pharma Corporation (Bailey, Edward)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
13 13 motion Pre Motion Conference Wed 11/27 3:26 PM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference to Judge Choudhury by Saptalis Pharmaceuticals LLC. (Husgen, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge - Declined Mon 11/25 4:06 PM
NOTICE to Assign District Judge: The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this case to a district judge. (CT)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 11/25 4:16 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Nusrat Jahan Choudhury and Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (AC)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
12 12 misc Letter Fri 11/22 3:53 PM
Letter Notification to Court of Saptalis's Intent to File Motion to Dismiss by Saptalis Pharmaceuticals LLC (Husgen, Jason)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 11/22 3:49 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Saptalis Pharmaceuticals LLC (Husgen, Jason)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/22 3:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Husgen on behalf of Saptalis Pharmaceuticals LLC (aty to be noticed) (Husgen, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
9 9 9 pgs misc Redacted Document Wed 11/20 12:09 PM
REDACTION to1 Complaint, by Kesin Pharma Corporation (Bailey, Edward)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
order Order on Motion to Seal Document Tue 11/19 3:15 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff's motion (DE8 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to seal DE1 . Plaintiff shall re-file a redacted version of the Complaint on the public docket. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst on 11/19/2024. (GS)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
8 8 motion Seal Document Mon 11/18 3:36 PM
MOTION to Seal Document1 Complaint, by Kesin Pharma Corporation. (Bailey, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 11/06 11:59 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kesin Pharma Corporation. Saptalis Pharmaceuticals LLC served on 11/1/2024, answer due 11/22/2024. (Bailey, Edward)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 10/30 10:34 AM
Summons Issued as to Saptalis Pharmaceuticals LLC. (AMF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
5 5 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 10/29 11:21 AM
Proposed Summons. by Kesin Pharma Corporation (Bailey, Edward)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Opportunity to Consent Tue 10/29 7:59 AM
Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (CG)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Tue 10/29 7:56 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (CG)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 10/29 7:58 AM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CG)
Related: [-]
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Tue 10/29 7:59 AM
Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: No name and address on the To Section and the Plaintiffs attorney name and addresses section., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (CG)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
2 2 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 10/28 3:49 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SDM)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 10/28 1:53 PM
COMPLAINT against Saptalis Pharmaceuticals LLC filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18433658 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Kesin Pharma Corporation. (Bailey, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Exclusive License and Commercial Agreement,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet