Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-10843

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Christopher G Bradley
Case #: 1:24-ap-01059
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Oct 28, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Alexander Ali Yousefian
13800 Lyndhurst St 91
Austin, TX 78717
Represented By
Alexander Ali Yousefian
contact info
Plaintiff
PfP Industries, LLC
Represented By
Mark Font
Mark A. Font, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Sunday, April 27, 2025
50 50 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/27 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/27/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 49 Order Regarding (related document(s):48 Agreed Motion to Allow Counsel to Share Expert Reports Filed by Stephen W. Sather for Defendant Alexander Ali Yousefian. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Sather, Stephen) (related document(s):46 Agreed Protective Order (related document(s):45 Motion for Entry of Agreed Protective Order Filed by Mark Font for Plaintiff PfP Industries, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Agreed Protective Order)) (Order entered on 4/22/2025))) (Order entered on 4/25/2025)
Friday, April 25, 2025
49 49 order AP-Regarding Matter (PDF) Fri 04/25 3:09 PM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 4/25/2025) (Turner, Blayne)
Related: [-] 48 Agreed Motion to Allow Counsel to Share Expert Reports Filed by Stephen W. Sather for Defendant Alexander Ali Yousefian. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Sather, Stephen) (related document(s):46 Agreed Protective Order (related document(s):45 Motion for Entry of Agreed Protective Order Filed by Mark Font for Plaintiff PfP Industries, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Agreed Protective Order)) (Order entered on 4/22/2025))
48 48 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Fri 04/25 8:41 AM
Agreed Motion to Allow Counsel to Share Expert Reports Filed by Stephen W. Sather for Defendant Alexander Ali Yousefian. (Sather, Stephen) Related [+]
Related: [-] 46 Agreed Protective Order (related document(s):45 Motion for Entry of Agreed Protective Order Filed by Mark Font for Plaintiff PfP Industries, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Agreed Protective Order)) (Order entered on 4/22/2025)
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 24, 2025
47 47 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/24 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/24/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 46 Agreed Protective Order (related document(s):45 Motion for Entry of Agreed Protective Order Filed by Mark Font for Plaintiff PfP Industries, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Agreed Protective Order)) (Order entered on 4/22/2025)
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
46 46 order BK-Agreed Order (Austin) (pdf) Tue 04/22 4:12 PM
Agreed Protective Order Related [+] (Order entered on 4/22/2025) (Turner, Blayne)
Related: [-] 45 Motion for Entry of Agreed Protective Order Filed by Mark Font for Plaintiff PfP Industries, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Agreed Protective Order)
45 45 motion ~Motion (Generic) (Adversary) Tue 04/22 12:50 PM
Motion for Entry of Agreed Protective Order Filed by Mark Font for Plaintiff PfP Industries, LLC. (Font, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Agreed Protective Order
Monday, April 21, 2025
44 44 misc ~Document (Adversary) Mon 04/21 3:28 PM
**Unsigned order removed from docket.** Agreed Protective Order filed by Mark Font for Plaintiff PfP Industries, LLC (Font, Mark) Modified on 4/22/2025 (Turner, Blayne)
Related: [-]