Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Raymond A Jackson
Referred: Lawrence R Leonard
Case #: 2:24-cv-00645
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Oct 29, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Apr 27, 2025 5:33 AM EDT
Defendant
Hyundai Motor America
Represented By
Michael Gregg, Jr.
Rosewaldorf PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Amy Ewing Mills
Represented By
James Ben Feinman
James B. Feinman Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Jack Allen Mills Jr.
Represented By
James Ben Feinman
James B. Feinman Attorney At Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
notice Notice (other) Wed 04/16 9:53 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE that this matter will be dismissed agreed with prejudice by the Court unless a stipulation of dismissal is submitted by counsel within eleven (11) days from the date of this notice. This deadline may be extended only by an order of the Court obtained by counsel. If this matter requires court approval of the settlement, you should arrange an appropriate date for a hearing on settlement approval with the assigned judge's calendar clerk. The court appreciates your giving this matter your prompt attention. (jhie, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Settlement (by Attorney) Thu 04/03 3:26 PM
NOTICE of Settlement Joint by Amy Ewing Mills, Jack Allen Mills Jr. (Feinman, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
7 7 4 pgs order Order Rule 16b Scheduling Order Tue 12/17 5:34 PM
Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order. Final Pretrial Conference to be conducted on 5/29/2025 at 10:00 a.m. in Norfolk. Jury Trial to commence on 6/10/2025 at 10:00 a.m. in Norfolk. The parties are ORDERED to schedule a settlement conference with the Magistrate Judge on or before the Final Pretrial Conference. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 12/17/2024. (bap, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
minutes Scheduling Conference-Rule16b Mon 12/16 9:41 AM
Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference held. (bap, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
6 6 order Rule 26(f) Pretrial Order Fri 11/22 10:50 AM
RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference to be conducted remotely on 12/16/2024 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 11/22/2024. (bap, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
misc Refer for 16 b Wed 11/20 9:30 AM
Refer for 16(b) (jhie, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 11/19 2:59 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hyundai Motor America, Inc.. (Gregg, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 11/19 2:57 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Hyundai Motor America, Inc..(Gregg, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 10/30 9:25 AM
Summons Issued as to Hyundai Motor America, Inc., NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(epri, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Motions Procedures
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Tue 10/29 5:17 PM
Proposed Summons by Amy Ewing Mills (Feinman, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 10/29 5:14 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9820426.), filed by Amy Ewing Mills.(Feinman, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Wed 10/30 9:20 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, )
Related: [-]