Wisconsin Western District Court
Judge:William M Conley
Referred: Anita Marie Boor
Case #: 3:24-cv-00759
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Oct 29, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Apr 27, 2025 4:14 AM CDT
Defendant
CMFG Life Insurance Company
Represented By
Holly E. Courtney
Michael Best & Friedrich LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Erick J. Vertein
Represented By
Nicholas E. Fairweather
Hawks Quindel, S.C.
contact info
Emma Knatterud-Johnson
Hawks Quindel, S.C.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
TruStage Financial Group, Inc.
Terminated: 04/04/2025
Represented By
Audrey N. Luzader
Michael Best & Friedrich LLP
contact info
Holly E. Courtney
Michael Best & Friedrich LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
12 12 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 04/16 3:56 PM
ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Defendant CMFG Life Insurance Company. (Courtney, Holly) Modified on 4/16/2025. (lak)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 04/03 2:32 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against TruStage Financial Group, Inc., filed by Erick J. Vertein. (Fairweather, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Dismissal and Notice of Rights
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 04/02 3:02 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against TruStage Financial Group, Inc., filed by Erick J. Vertein. (Fairweather, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Dismissal and Notice of Rights
Thursday, March 13, 2025
9 9 order Pretrial Conference Order Thu 03/13 4:57 PM
Pretrial Conference Order -[LINK:Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge William M. Conley] attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 4/3/2025. Dispositive Motions due 1/16/2026. Settlement Letters due 5/29/2026. Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures and Motions in Limine due 6/5/2026. Responses due 6/19/2026. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/30/2026 at 02:30 PM. Second Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/7/2026 at 02:30 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 7/13/2026 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anita Marie Boor on 3/13/2025. (voc)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference Thu 03/13 3:11 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Anita Marie Boor: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 3/13/2025 [00:25] (ckl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
8 8 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Thu 03/06 10:13 AM
Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Fairweather, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
utility Set Pretrial or Status Conference Tue 02/04 9:12 AM
Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 3/13/2025 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Anita M. Boor. Please call (669) 254-5252 and enter meeting ID 161 2455 6623 when prompted. Wait to be admitted into the conference. The parties are advised that a Rule 26(f) conference shall occur not less than two weeks before the preliminary pretrial conference, and that the parties' report or reports must be filed not less than one week before the preliminary pretrial conference.[[LINK:Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference] attached] (voc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/03 4:41 PM
ANSWER by Defendant TruStage Financial Group, Inc.. (Courtney, Holly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 12/11 2:15 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant TruStage Financial Group, Inc.. (Courtney, Holly)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
misc Action Requested Fri 12/06 8:50 AM
Action Requested: Defendant TruStage Financial Group, Inc.'s[LINK:Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations and Citizenship] is due. (lak)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/05 8:46 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Audrey N. Luzader for Defendant TruStage Financial Group, Inc.. (Luzader, Audrey)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/05 7:10 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Holly E. Courtney for Defendant TruStage Financial Group, Inc.. (Courtney, Holly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 12/03 3:56 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant TruStage Financial Group, Inc.. TruStage Financial Group, Inc. waiver sent on 12/3/2024, answer due 2/3/2025. (Fairweather, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 10/29 4:39 PM
Summons Issued as to TruStage Financial Group, Inc. (jef)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/29 4:15 PM
COMPLAINT against TruStage Financial Group, Inc.. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number CWIWDC-3513075.), filed by Erick J. Vertein. (Fairweather, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Dismissal and Notice of Rights,
Att: 2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons
utility Add Judge for Shell Case Opening Tue 10/29 4:35 PM
Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Anita Marie Boor. (jef)
Related: [-]
utility Standard Attachments Sent Tue 10/29 4:36 PM
Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service:[LINK:NORTC] ,[LINK:Corporate Disclosure Statement] . (jef)
Related: [-]