Arizona District Court
Judge:Maria S Aguilera
Case #: 4:24-cv-00527
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 28, 2024
Terminated:Dec 18, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 3:45 AM MST
Defendant
5210 Farness LLC
Defendant
Steven A Wool
Plaintiff
Personalized Healthcare Of Tucson PLLC
Represented By
Hannah Hatch Porter
Gallagher & Kennedy Pa - Phoenix
contact info
Elizabeth Boston Malloy
Holland & Knight Llp - Nashville
contact info
Taylor J Askew
Holland & Knight Llp - Nashville
contact info
Michael Rudolph Ross
Gallager & Kennedy PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Sevi Health LLC
Represented By
Hannah Hatch Porter
Gallagher & Kennedy Pa - Phoenix
contact info
Elizabeth Boston Malloy
Holland & Knight Llp - Nashville
contact info
Taylor J Askew
Holland & Knight Llp - Nashville
contact info
Michael Rudolph Ross
Gallager & Kennedy PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Southern Arizona Internal Medicine PLLC
Represented By
Hannah Hatch Porter
Gallagher & Kennedy Pa - Phoenix
contact info
Elizabeth Boston Malloy
Holland & Knight Llp - Nashville
contact info
Taylor J Askew
Holland & Knight Llp - Nashville
contact info
Michael Rudolph Ross
Gallager & Kennedy PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM MST
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
minute_ord ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 12/18 3:45 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to doc10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Civil Case Terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SCA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
10 10 2 pgs notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Entire Case/Action Tue 11/26 4:27 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Sevi Health LLC, Southern Arizona Internal Medicine PLLC, Personalized Healthcare Of Tucson PLLC. (Porter, Hannah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
misc Remark (Public) Thu 11/14 8:50 AM
Remark: Out of state attorneys Taylor J Askew and Elizabeth Boston Malloy terminated as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
9 9 misc 25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Election Form Deadline Wed 11/13 3:06 PM
Magistrate Election Form resent and deadline reset. (Second Notice.) (DLC)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time Mon 11/11 5:14 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time Notice of Agreement to Arbitrate and of Forthcoming Voluntary Dismissal Pending Initiation of Arbitration and Motion to Stay Pending Deadlines by Sevi Health LLC, Southern Arizona Internal Medicine PLLC, Personalized Healthcare Of Tucson PLLC.(Porter, Hannah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
7 7 2 pgs service Summons Issued Tue 10/29 2:34 PM
Summons Issued as to 5210 Farness LLC, Steven A Wool.(SCA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Monday, October 28, 2024
6 6 misc New Case Opened Tue 10/29 2:32 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-23613825. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Maria S Aguilera. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 24-00527 TUC-MSA. Magistrate Election form attached. (SCA)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Submitted Tue 10/29 2:31 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by 5210 Farness LLC, Steven A Wool.(SCA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
4 4 6 pgs misc Disclosure Statement Tue 10/29 2:31 PM
Disclosure Statement by Personalized Healthcare Of Tucson PLLC. (Porter, Hannah) (SCA)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement Tue 10/29 2:30 PM
Disclosure Statement by Southern Arizona Internal Medicine PLLC. (Porter, Hannah) (SCA)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement Tue 10/29 2:29 PM
Disclosure Statement by Sevi Health LLC. (Porter, Hannah) (SCA)
Related: [-]
1 1 43 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 10/29 2:27 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 405.00, receipt number AAZDC-23613825 filed by Southern Arizona Internal Medicine PLLC, Sevi Health LLC, Personalized Healthcare Of Tucson PLLC. (Porter, Hannah)(SCA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 96 pgs Exhibit