New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Martin Glenn
Case #: 1:24-bk-11873
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2024
Terminated:Jan 06, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
New York Advisory Services, Inc.
551 5th Ave Rm 422
New York, NY 10176-0201
Represented By
New York Advisory Services, Inc.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee - NY Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green, Room 534
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 7 minutes ago
Monday, January 06, 2025
misc Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 01/06 8:51 AM
Case Closed. (Cantrell, Deirdra)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 04, 2025
13 13 misc Certificate of Mailing - Order to Dismiss Sun 01/05 12:10 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Order to Dismiss Related [+] . Notice Date 01/04/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #12 )
Thursday, January 02, 2025
12 12 1 pgs order Motion, Dismiss Case Thu 01/02 11:11 AM
Order signed on 1/2/2025 Granting Motion To Dismiss Chapter 11 Case. Related [+](Cantrell, Deirdra)
Related: [-] 5
11 11 1 pgs misc Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9013-3 Thu 01/02 9:37 AM
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9013-3 Filed by Greg M. Zipes on behalf of United States Trustee. (Zipes, Greg)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Mon 11/04 9:32 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Greg M. Zipes on behalf of United States Trustee. (Zipes, Greg)
Related: [-] 5
Sunday, November 03, 2024
9 9 misc Certificate of Mailing - must Sun 11/03 11:11 PM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Motion of United States Trustee Related [+] . Notice Date 11/03/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #6 )
Saturday, November 02, 2024
8 8 misc Certificate of Mailing - 341(a) Meeting Sun 11/03 12:11 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors Related [+] . Notice Date 11/02/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #3 )
Friday, November 01, 2024
7 7 misc Certificate of Mailing PDF notice Sat 11/02 12:12 AM
Certificate of Mailing Related [+] . Notice Date 11/01/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #2 )
6 6 1 pgs misc Motion by UST (BNC) Fri 11/01 11:40 AM
Notice of Hearing Re: Motion by United States Trustee to Convert Chapter 11 Case to Chapter 7, Motion to Dismiss Case with hearing to be held on 1/6/2025 at 02:00 PM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG) (Cantrell, Deirdra)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Fri 11/01 9:05 AM
Receipt of Motion to Convert Case 11 to 7([LINK 24-11873 mg] ) [motion,146] ( 15.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 211920. Fee amount 15.00. Related [+] (Harris)
Related: [-] Doc #5
Thursday, October 31, 2024
5 5 7 pgs motion Motion, Convert Case 11 to 7 (fee) Thu 10/31 5:46 PM
Motion to Convert Chapter 11 Case to Chapter 7 , Motion to Dismiss Case with hearing on January 6, 2025 at 2:00 pm filed by Greg M. Zipes on behalf of United States Trustee. (Zipes, Greg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Declaration
Att: 2 28 pgs Exhibits to declaration
4 4 misc Letter Thu 10/31 3:09 PM
Letter /dial -n information for creditors meeting Filed by Greg M. Zipes on behalf of United States Trustee. (Zipes, Greg)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs misc 341(a) Notice (Chapter 11) (BNC) Thu 10/31 8:08 AM
Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/5/2024 at 12:30 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Cappiello, Karen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
2 2 2 pgs order Scheduling Order (Will Generate PDF Notice to BNC) Wed 10/30 3:44 PM
Order, Signed on 10/30/2024, Scheduling Initial Case Conference. Conference to be held on 11/14/2024 at 02:00 PM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG). (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-]
1 1 24 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 10/30 1:19 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Fee Amount $ 1738, Receipt Number 10001526 Schedule A/B due 11/13/2024. Schedule D due 11/13/2024. Schedule E/F due 11/13/2024. Schedule G due 11/13/2024. Schedule H due 11/13/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 11/13/2024. Statement of Operations DUE at Time of Filing. Balance Sheet DUE at Time of Filing. Cash Flow Statement DUE at Time of Filing. List of Equity Security Holders due 11/13/2024. Resolution or Other Statement Authorizing Filing Pursuant to LR 1074-1 DUE at Time of Filing Local Rule 1007-2 Affidavit DUE at Time of Filling. Corporate Ownership Statement DUE at Time of Filing. Incomplete Filings due by 11/13/2024, Small Business Chapter 11 Plan due by 4/28/2025, Disclosure Statement due by 4/28/2025, Filed by New York Advisory Services, Inc. . (Porter, Minnie)Modified on 10/30/2024 (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]
misc Add Judge Wed 10/30 1:21 PM
Judge Martin Glenn added to the case. (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]