Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Steve C Jones
Referred: John K Larkins, III
Case #: 1:24-cv-04942
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Oct 29, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Apr 27, 2025 5:08 AM EDT
Defendant
Missouri Higher Education Loan Authority
Represented By
Eleanor Keith Emanuel
Watstein Terepka LLP
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Department of Education
Plaintiff
David Borge Santos, Jr.
Represented By
Octavio Gomez
The Consumer Lawyers, PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
Terminated: 03/13/2025
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Terminated: 04/10/2025
Defendant
Trans Union LLC
Terminated: 03/20/2025
Represented By
Paul W Sheldon
Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett Moser, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
26 26 motion Extension of Time Mon 04/28 11:19 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading or Motion with Brief In Support by U.S. Department of Education. (Ben-David, Neeli)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
25 25 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 04/10 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. filed by David Borge Santos, Jr (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Thu 04/10 4:12 PM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING25 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (ddm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
24 24 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 04/02 9:36 AM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Missouri Higher Education Loan Authority d/b/a Mohela by David Borge Santos, Jr (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
23 23 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 03/20 11:25 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Trans Union LLC filed by David Borge Santos, Jr (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Thu 03/20 2:34 PM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING23 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice as to Trans Union LLC pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (ddm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
22 22 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 03/13 10:42 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Equifax Information Services LLC filed by David Borge Santos, Jr (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Thu 03/13 10:54 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING22 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice as to Equifax Information Services LLC pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (ddm)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
21 21 notice Notice of Filing Mon 03/03 1:30 PM
NOTICE of Filing Service of Process by David Borge Santos, Jr re11 Return of Service Executed as to the U.S. Department of Education(Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Service Delivery Confirmation
service Return of Service Executed as to USA Mon 03/03 2:31 PM
Per21 - Return of Service Executed by David Borge Santos, Jr. U.S. Department of Education served on 2/26/2025, answer due 4/28/2025. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
20 20 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Clerks Entry of Default Tue 02/18 11:11 AM
ORDER denying19 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Against Defendant U.S. Department of Education. Because this case has been pending for over 90 days, and the U.S. Department of Education remains unserved, the Court will give Plaintiff an opportunity to perfect service under Rule 4(i) no later than March 4, 2025. Plaintiff is warned that the failure to perfect service may result in the dismissal of his claims against the U.S. Department of Education. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 02/18/2025. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
19 19 motion Clerks Entry of Default Mon 02/17 2:16 PM
MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to U.S. Department of Education by David Borge Santos, Jr. (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
18 18 service Certificate of Service Tue 01/28 12:01 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by David Borge Santos, Jr of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
17 17 order Scheduling Order Fri 01/17 3:48 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER and Instructions Regarding Management of Civil Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 01/17/2025. (ddm)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Fri 01/17 2:01 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by David Borge Santos, Jr. (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 01/02 3:23 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by David Borge Santos, Jr (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Filing Thu 01/02 2:31 PM
NOTICE of Filing Service of Process by David Borge Santos, Jr re11 Return of Service Executed as to the U.S. Department of Education(Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Service Delivery Confirmation
Thursday, December 26, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 12/26 9:08 AM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Trans Union LLC by David Borge Santos, Jr (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/23 3:27 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT (Defendant Higher Education Loan Authority of the State of Missouri's Answer and Affirmative Defenses) by Missouri Higher Education Loan Authority. Discovery ends on 5/22/2025.(Emanuel, Eleanor)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
11 11 service Return of Service Executed Fri 12/13 3:13 PM
Return of Service Executed by David Borge Santos, Jr. U.S. Department of Education served on 12/4/2024, answer due 12/26/2024. (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 12/12 11:33 AM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Equifax Information Services LLC by David Borge Santos, Jr (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
9 9 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 12/02 3:39 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. and Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union LLC. (Sheldon, Paul)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Mon 12/02 3:37 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Trans Union LLC.(Sheldon, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 12/02 5:07 PM
ORDER by docket entry only granting8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Trans Union LLC's answer or other response to the complaint will be due no later than 12/23/24. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 12/2/24. (emm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 11/27 9:35 AM
ORDER by docket entry granting Defendant Missouri Higher Education Loan Authority d/b/a MOHELA's ("MOHELA") Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint.7 MOHELA shall have through and including December 24, 2024, to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 11/27/24. (JKL)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Mon 11/25 4:45 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, (Defendant Missouri Higher Education Loan Authority d/b/a MOHELA's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint) by Missouri Higher Education Loan Authority.(Emanuel, Eleanor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, November 21, 2024
6 6 service Return of Service Executed Thu 11/21 3:48 PM
Return of Service Executed by David Borge Santos, Jr. Trans Union LLC served on 11/11/2024, answer due 12/2/2024. (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Return of Service Executed Thu 11/21 3:47 PM
Return of Service Executed by David Borge Santos, Jr. Missouri Higher Education Loan Authority served on 11/12/2024, answer due 12/3/2024. (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 11/21 3:46 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Borge Santos, Jr. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. waiver mailed on 11/8/2024, answer due 1/7/2025. (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
3 3 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 11/08 12:15 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by David Borge Santos, Jr. (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 10/31 5:24 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Missouri Higher Education Loan Authority, Trans Union LLC, U.S. Department of Education. (tas)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/31 5:21 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by David Borge Santos, Jr. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13826987)(tas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet