California Eastern District Court
Judge:Dale A Drozd
Referred: Jeremy D Peterson
Case #: 2:24-cv-03012
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause15:1126 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 1:20 AM PDT
Counter Claimant
Laudando & Associates LLC
Represented By
Andrew D. Gish, PHV
contact info
Michael M. Powell, PHV
contact info
Ryan K. Iwahashi
Gish PLLC
contact info
Joel Lin
Gish PLLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Carbon Autonomous Robotic Systems Inc.
Represented By
Juanita Rose Brooks
Fish And Richardson, PC
contact info
Audrey A. Millemann
Weintraub Tobin Chediak Coleman Grodin
contact info
Chandrika Vira, PHV
Sterne Kessler Goldstein & Fox
contact info
Adil A. Shaikh, PHV
Fish & Richardson P.C.
contact info
Ralph Wilson Powers, III
Sterne Kessler Goldstein & Fox
contact info
Matthew A. Colvin, PHV
Fish & Richardson
contact info
Steven Pappas, PHV
Sterne, Kessler, Goldstein & Fox P.L.L.C.
contact info
Richard A. Crudo, PHV
Sterne Kessler Goldstein & Fox
contact info
John S. Goetz, PHV
Fish & Richardson P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Laudando & Associates LLC
Represented By
Andrew D. Gish, PHV
contact info
Michael M. Powell, PHV
contact info
Ryan K. Iwahashi
Gish PLLC
contact info
Joel Lin
Gish PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Carbon Autonomous Robotic Systems Inc.
Represented By
Juanita Rose Brooks
Fish And Richardson, PC
contact info
Audrey A. Millemann
Weintraub Tobin Chediak Coleman Grodin
contact info
Ryan E. Conkin, PHV
Sterne Kessler Goldstein & Fox
contact info
David Y. Wang, PHV
Sterne Kessler Goldstein & Fox
contact info
Chandrika Vira, PHV
Sterne Kessler Goldstein & Fox
contact info
Adil A. Shaikh, PHV
Fish & Richardson P.C.
contact info
Ralph Wilson Powers, III
Sterne Kessler Goldstein & Fox
contact info
Matthew A. Colvin, PHV
Fish & Richardson
contact info
Steven Pappas, PHV
Sterne, Kessler, Goldstein & Fox P.L.L.C.
contact info
Richard A. Crudo, PHV
Sterne Kessler Goldstein & Fox
contact info
John S. Goetz, PHV
Fish & Richardson P.C.
contact info

GPO Nov 06 2024
PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/5/2024 GRANTING 7 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Matthew A. Colvin, PHV for Carbon Autonomous Robotic Systems Inc.. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Kyono, V)
GPO Nov 06 2024
PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/5/2024 GRANTING 8 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney John S. Goetz, PHV for Carbon Autonomous Robotic Systems Inc. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Kyono, V)
GPO Nov 06 2024
PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/5/2024 GRANTING 9 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Adil A. Shaikh, PHV for Carbon Autonomous Robotic Systems Inc. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Kyono, V)
GPO Nov 21 2024
PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/21/2024 GRANTING 17 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added Attorney Andrew D. Gish, PHV for Laudando & Associates LLC. The Pro Hac Vice Attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Lopez, K)
GPO Nov 21 2024
PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/21/2024 GRANTING 18 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added Attorney Michael M. Powell, PHV for Laudando & Associates LLC. The Pro Hac Vice Attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Lopez, K)

Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
60 60 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/23 8:05 PM
ANSWER with Jury Demand by Laudando & Associates LLC.(Lin, Joel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
59 59 motion Notice of Request to Seal Document(s) Tue 04/22 10:58 PM
NOTICE of Request to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by Laudando & Associates LLC. (Lin, Joel)
Related: [-]
58 58 30+ pgs misc Memorandum Tue 04/22 10:53 PM
MEMORANDUM by Laudando & Associates LLC in OPPOSITION TO re49 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Carbon Autonomous Robotic Systems Inc..(Lin, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 15 pgs Declaration of Christopher Laudando,
Att: 2 Declaration of Joel Lin
Friday, April 18, 2025
57 57 order Minute Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing Fri 04/18 1:39 PM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) issued by Courtroom Deputy for District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/18/2025: Due to the unavailability of the court, the hearing on defendant's52 motion to withdraw as attorney currently set for 5/20/2025 is hereby ADVANCED to 5/5/2025 at 01:30 before Judge Drozd on Zoom. The parties are referred to Judge Drozd's5 -1] Standing Order for Zoom appearance information. (Deputy Clerk PAB)
Related: [-]
56 56 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 04/18 11:06 AM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) issued by Courtroom Deputy for District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/18/2025: Having considered the parties'55 joint motion to modify the scheduling order and good cause appearing, the55 joint motion is GRANTED and the case schedule is hereby modified as set out in55 -1] Exhibit A. The court notes that the Final Pretrial Conference is now set for 2/22/2027 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Dale A. Drozd by Zoom and the Jury Trial is now set for 4/27/2027 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Deputy Clerk PAB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
55 55 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 04/17 12:15 PM
MOTION JOINT MOTION TO MODIFY THE SCHEDULING ORDER by Laudando & Associates LLC. Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2025 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd.(Lin, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A