Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Julia K Munley
Referred: Mp
Case #: 3:24-cv-01896
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Nov 04, 2024
Terminated:Jan 30, 2025
Defendant
John Doe #1
Defendant
John Doe #2
Defendant
Lt. Fowler
Defendant
Lt. Goodrum
Defendant
Thurp
Plaintiff
Otis Mays

GPO Dec 17 2024
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 12/17/24. (sm)
GPO Dec 17 2024
ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry), DENYING Plaintiff's 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; Plaintiff shall pay the filing fee within 21 days of this order; Failure to timely pay the requisite filing/administrative fees, will result in the dismissal of this case. Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 12/17/24. (sm)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, January 30, 2025
20 20 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 01/30 9:43 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE for failure to pay the filing fee; Pltf 's emergency motion3 for TRO is Dismissed as Moot; Pltf's 2nd request for an enlargement of time to pay the full filing fee is denied; Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 1/30/25. (sm)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
19 19 1 pgs order Order Fri 01/03 3:49 PM
ORDER re GRANTING request15 for extension of time to pay the filing fee- due 1/21/25 Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 1/3/25. (sm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
18 18 misc Request (Do not use if you are filing a motion or requesting default; see default events below) Thu 01/02 1:00 PM
REQUEST for 60 day extension to pay filing fee by Otis Mays. (dw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
17 17 misc Response (Do not use this event if your document is a Brief) Tue 12/31 1:37 PM
RESPONSE from Clerks Office to16 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend re Cost of Copies. (cp) (Main Document 17 replaced on 12/31/2024) (cp)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Extension of Time to Amend Tue 12/31 1:34 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend (with Request for copy of original complaint) by Otis Mays.(cp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover letter
Monday, December 30, 2024
15 15 misc Request (Do not use if you are filing a motion or requesting default; see default events below) Mon 12/30 1:15 PM
REQUEST for 45 Day Extension to Pay Filing Fee by Otis Mays. (dw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order (Memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 12/17 2:58 PM
ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry), DENYING Plaintiff's6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; Plaintiff shall pay the filing fee within 21 days of this order; Failure to timely pay the requisite filing/administrative fees, will result in the dismissal of this case. Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 12/17/24. (sm)
Related: [-]
13 13 5 pgs order Memorandum (Order to follow as separate docket entry) Tue 12/17 2:54 PM
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 12/17/24. (sm)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 12/16 1:58 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Otis Mays. *address updated on the docket* (dj)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
11 11 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Mon 12/02 2:34 PM
CERTIFIED Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (dw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order - 15 Day Administrative Order Wed 11/20 10:11 AM
FIFTEEN (15) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - Within 15 days of the date of this Order, the Warden or other appropriate official of the institution at which Plaintiff is currently incarcerated is directed to provide to the Court, under oath, or declare under penalty of perjury, a statement of the current balance in the Plaintiffs account and a record of the transactions in his account that have occurred with the preceding six (6) months. Order sent to Warden and plaintiff. Signed by LP on 11/20/2024. (lp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
9 9 misc Response (Do not use this event if your document is a Brief) Tue 11/19 2:52 PM
RESPONSE by Clerk's Office to8 Request for Copies. (dw)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Request (Do not use if you are filing a motion or requesting default; see default events below) Tue 11/19 2:39 PM
REQUEST by Otis Mays for copy of his complaint, docket sheet and 2241 forms. (dw)
Related: [-]
7 7 service AO 398 and AO 399 Waiver of Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff Tue 11/19 2:38 PM
AO 398 Form Completed by Plaintiff. (dw)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 11/19 2:37 PM
UNCERTIFIED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Otis Mays.(dw)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order - 30 Day Administrative Order Mon 11/04 11:47 AM
THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 11/04/2024.(lp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 IFP (civil rights)
4 4 misc Pro Se Letter Issued - DJ IS PRESIDING JUDGE Mon 11/04 11:40 AM
PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number and the AO 85 Notice & Consent Form. (lp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Consent,
Att: 2 Instruction Sheet,
Att: 3 Fed and Local Rules,
Att: 4 398 Forms,
Att: 5 399 Form
3 3 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 11/04 11:34 AM
Emergency Motion Temporary Restraining Order (TRO) by Otis Mays.(lp)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Document Filed Mon 11/04 11:22 AM
Application to proceed in forma pauperis (incorrect form submitted by Otis Mays). (lp)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/04 11:21 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Otis Mays.(lp)
Related: [-]