Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-11254

Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John W Kolwe
Case #: 2:24-ap-01071
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 01, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Michael Kotler, MD
Represented By
Michael Kotler, MD
contact info
Defendant
Kathryn Steele
Represented By
Kathryn Steele
contact info
Defendant
Steele Strategies, Inc.
Represented By
Steele Strategies, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Shannon Robbins Davidoff
Represented By
Shannon Robbins Davidoff
contact info
Defendant
SRRD Strategies, LLC
Represented By
SRRD Strategies, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Richard Veltre
Represented By
Richard Veltre
contact info
Defendant
The Veltre Group, LLC
Represented By
The Veltre Group, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Republic Vanguard Insurance Company
Represented By
Republic Vanguard Insurance Company
contact info
Defendant
Homeland Insurance Company of New York
Represented By
Homeland Insurance Company of New York
contact info
Plaintiff
Dwayne Murray
Represented By
Alicia M. Bendana
Lugenbuhl, Wheaton, Peck, Rankin & Hubbard
contact info
Cynthia M. Cimino
Brownelaw, LLC
contact info
David Browne
Brownelaw, LLC
contact info
Christopher T. Caplinger
Lugenbuhl Wheaton Peck Rankin Hubbard
contact info
Katherine Elizabeth Clark
Lugenbuhl Wheaton Peck Rankin & Hubbard
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
84 84 miscap Certificate of Service (PF) Mon 04/28 4:50 PM
Certificate of Service Re April 21, 2025 Order Filed by Shannon Robbins Davidoff, SRRD Strategies, LLC, Kathryn Steele, Steele Strategies, Inc. (Kaul, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
83 83 motion Extend Time (Motion) (AP) Fri 04/25 12:19 PM
Motion to Extend Time Filed by Lisa Jones (Follette, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
82 82 miscap Certificate of Service (PF) Wed 04/23 3:35 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Homeland Insurance Company of New York Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)81 Generic Order) (LaSalle, Heather
81 81 order Generic Motion (Order) (AP) Wed 04/23 1:36 PM
Order Granting Motion to Participate Remotely. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Related [+] Signed on 4/22/25. (Lew, K)
Related: [-] 76 Generic Motion filed by Defendant Homeland Insurance Company of New York
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
80 80 miscap Certificate of Service (PF) Tue 04/22 12:20 PM
Certificate of Service on Order Granting Reorganized Debtors Motion for Permission to Participate Remotely for the April 22, 2025 Status Conference Filed by RemoteMD, L.L.C. Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)79 Generic Order) (Congeni, Leo
court Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched Wed 04/23 1:06 PM
Hearing Held/Continued Related [+]. RULING: Status Conference is continued to 5/28/2025 at 03:30 PM by U. S. Courthouse, 800 Lafayette Street, Courtroom 5, Lafayette, Louisiana 70501. (Hess, Karen)
Related: [-] Status Conference
Monday, April 21, 2025
79 79 order Generic Motion (Order) Mon 04/21 5:04 PM
Order Granting Motion for Permission to Participate Remotely for the April 22, 2025 Status Conference IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Related [+] Signed on 4/21/25. (Lew, K)
Related: [-] 77 Generic Motion filed by Interested Party RemoteMD, L.L.C.,78 Generic Motion filed by Defendant Kathryn Steele, Defendant Steele Strategies, Inc., Defendant Shannon Robbins Davidoff, Defendant SRRD Strategies, LLC