Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Leo T Sorokin
Case #: 1:24-cv-12785
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Nov 04, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Dec 19, 2024 4:44 AM EST
Defendant
Newton Cardoso
Defendant
Elvira Ferrer
Defendant
Joshua Oliver
Defendant
Town of Falmouth
Plaintiff
Patricia Harris
Represented By
Joshua O'Neill
Boston Defender LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/27/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Sunday, April 27, 2025
29 29 respm Opposition to Motion Sun 04/27 10:45 PM
Opposition re22 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Patricia Harris.(O'Neill, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Monday, April 14, 2025
28 28 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 04/14 8:51 AM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re:27 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Friday, April 25, 2025 to File Response/Reply to the Town of Falmouth's22 Motion to Dismiss. ALLOWED. Responses due by 4/25/2025. (FGD)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
27 27 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 04/11 7:43 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Friday, April 25, 2025 to File Response/Reply to the Town of Falmouth's Motion to Dismiss by Patricia Harris.(O'Neill, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
26 26 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 03/25 9:54 AM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re:25 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Friday, April 11, 2025 to File Response/Reply to the Town of Falmouth's 22 Motion to Dismiss. ALLOWED. (FGD)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
25 25 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 03/24 12:43 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Friday, April 11, 2025 to File Response/Reply to the Town of Falmouth's 22 Motion to Dismiss by Patricia Harris.(O'Neill, Joshua) Modified on 3/24/2025: Updated docket text. (FGD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
24 24 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 03/11 9:23 AM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: re15 Motion to Dismiss. The first Motion to Dismiss (#15) filed by the Town of Falmouth is TERMINATED AS MOOT in light of the second Motion filed by the Town (#22) in response to the Amended Complaint (# 18 ). That Motion remains under advisement. (SED)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
23 23 19 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 03/10 4:25 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re22 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Town of Falmouth.(Papia, Francesca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
22 22 motion Dismiss Mon 03/10 4:24 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Town of Falmouth.(Papia, Francesca)
Related: [-]
21 21 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 03/10 4:01 PM
ANSWER to18 Amended Complaint by Joshua Oliver.(Papia, Francesca)
Related: [-]
20 20 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 03/10 3:57 PM
ANSWER to18 Amended Complaint by Elvira Ferrer.(Papia, Francesca)
Related: [-]
19 19 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 03/10 3:56 PM
ANSWER to18 Amended Complaint by Newton Cardoso.(Papia, Francesca)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
18 18 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 02/24 4:59 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Patricia Harris.(O'Neill, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Monday, February 03, 2025
17 17 2 pgs order Order Mon 02/03 4:53 PM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. New Civil Cases General Procedural ORDER. (FGD)
Related: [-]
16 16 19 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 02/03 3:55 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Town of Falmouth.(Papia, Francesca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
15 15 motion Dismiss Mon 02/03 3:53 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Town of Falmouth.(Papia, Francesca)
Related: [-]
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/03 3:49 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Joshua Oliver.(Papia, Francesca)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/03 3:48 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Elvira Ferrer.(Papia, Francesca)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/03 3:47 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Newton Cardoso.(Papia, Francesca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
11 11 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 01/28 9:26 AM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re:10 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to February 3, 2024 to File Responsive Pleading. ALLOWED. Newton Cardoso answer due 2/3/2025; Elvira Ferrer answer due 2/3/2025; Joshua Oliver answer due 2/3/2025; Town of Falmouth answer due 2/3/2025. (FGD)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 01/27 3:40 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to February 3, 2024 to File Responsive Pleading by Town of Falmouth, Newton Cardoso, Joshua Oliver, Elvira Ferrer.(Donohue, Thomas)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/27 3:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R Donohue on behalf of Town of Falmouth, Newton Cardoso, Joshua Oliver, Elvira Ferrer (Donohue, Thomas)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/27 3:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Francesca Marie Papia on behalf of Town of Falmouth, Newton Cardoso, Joshua Oliver, Elvira Ferrer (Papia, Francesca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 12/04 3:21 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Patricia Harris. Joshua Oliver waiver sent on 11/27/2024, answer due 1/27/2025. (O'Neill, Joshua)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 12/04 3:20 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Patricia Harris. Elvira Ferrer waiver sent on 11/27/2024, answer due 1/27/2025. (O'Neill, Joshua)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 12/04 3:20 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Patricia Harris. Town of Falmouth waiver sent on 11/27/2024, answer due 1/27/2025. (O'Neill, Joshua)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 12/04 3:19 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Patricia Harris. Newton Cardoso waiver sent on 11/27/2024, answer due 1/27/2025. (O'Neill, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 11/06 10:00 AM
Summons Issued as to Newton Cardoso, Elvira Ferrer, Joshua Oliver, Town of Falmouth. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Phillips, Sophie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Tue 11/05 10:54 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Horvath, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/04 9:37 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10682018 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Patricia Harris.(O'Neill, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Form