Idaho District Court
Judge:Amanda K Brailsford
Case #: 2:24-cv-00539
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Case Filed:Nov 06, 2024
Terminated:Feb 04, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Dec 22, 2024 3:45 AM MST
Defendant
Maria Lynne Centers
8551 N. Government Way Apt. #B16
Hayden, ID 83835
Defendant
Lakeside Pediatric & Adolescent Medicine, PLLC
980 Ironwood Dr, Ste. 302
Coeur d'Alene, ID 83814
Represented By
Aaron Glen Eskue
Powers Farley, PC
contact info
Portia L Rauer
Powers Farley
contact info
Plaintiff
James Richard Newlin
10570 Greenwood Ave N Apt 308
Seattle, WA 98133

GPO Feb 04 2025
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that: Newlin's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (Dkt. 9) is GRANTED. Lakeside's Motion to Dismiss and/or for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 11) is GRANTED. Centers' Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 21) is GRANTED. This case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as against ALL DEFENDANTS. Newlin's Motion to Appear Remotely (Dkt. 5); Newlin's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Dkt. 12); Newlin's Motion to Strike Lakeside's Motion to Dismiss and/or for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 16); and Lakeside's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. 30) are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (hs)

Docket last updated: 04/27/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
38 38 appeal USCA Scheduling Order Wed 03/05 10:45 AM
USCA 25-1368 Time Schedule Order as to36 Notice of Appeal, filed by James Richard Newlin. (Notice sent by e-mail to Court Reporter) (hs)
Related: [-]
37 37 appeal USCA Case Number Wed 03/05 10:43 AM
USCA Case Number 25-1368 for36 Notice of Appeal filed by James Richard Newlin. (hs)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
36 36 appeal Notice of Appeal Fri 02/28 1:03 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to34 Judgment, by James Richard Newlin. Filing Fee Paid. $ 605, receipt number 200050137. (Notice sent to Court Reporter & 9th Cir)(hs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Representation Statement,
Att: 2 Envelope
utility Receipt Fri 02/28 1:01 PM
RECEIPT: Civil Filing Fee-Appeal Fee Fee Received $ 605.00, receipt # 200050137 Paid in Full (ch)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
35 35 misc Response (generic) Thu 02/06 12:49 PM
RESPONSE re30 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ,31 Declaration filed by James Richard Newlin. (hs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
34 34 order Judgment Tue 02/04 4:26 PM
JUDGMENT - In accordance with this Courts February 4, 2025, Memorandum Decision and Order granting Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Dkts.11 ,21 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that judgment be entered in Defendants' favor and that this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (hs)
Related: [-]
33 33 8 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 02/04 4:22 PM
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that: Newlin's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (Dkt.9 ) is GRANTED. Lakeside's Motion to Dismiss and/or for Summary Judgment (Dkt.11 ) is GRANTED. Centers' Motion to Dismiss (Dkt.21 ) is GRANTED. This case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as against ALL DEFENDANTS. Newlin's Motion to Appear Remotely (Dkt.5 ); Newlin's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Dkt.12 ); Newlin's Motion to Strike Lakeside's Motion to Dismiss and/or for Summary Judgment (Dkt.16 ); and Lakeside's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt.30 ) are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (hs)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
32 32 2 pgs order Order ~Util- Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 01/31 2:47 PM
ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, by no later than February 5, 2025, Lakeside must file a supplemental brief identifying the authority under which it asserts Mr. Newlin's website is unlawful and addressing why Lakeside is likely to succeed on the merits of establishing that the website is unlawful. Further, it is ordered that, by no later than February 12, 2024, Mr. Newlin may file a response to Lakeside's motion for preliminary injunctive relief. If necessary, the Court will have a hearing on the matter on Friday, February 14, 2024, at 12 PM Mountain Time via video conference. Before that hearing, the Courtroom Deputy will share instructions for accessing the video conference. Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (hs)
Related: [-]
31 31 misc Declaration Fri 01/31 9:25 AM
DECLARATION of Aaron G. Eskue re30 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Lakeside Pediatric & Adolescent Medicine, PLLC . (Eskue, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
30 30 motion Temporary Restraining Order Thu 01/30 5:07 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Aaron Glen Eskue appearing for Defendant Lakeside Pediatric & Adolescent Medicine, PLLC. Responses due by 2/20/2025(Eskue, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Declaration of Aaron G. Eskue,
Att: 3 Declaration of Lesa Dagon,
Att: 4 Declaration of Kayla Ellis
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
29 29 notice Notice of Availability Setting Deadline Tue 01/28 9:09 AM
NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to Maria Lynne Centers re21 MOTION to Dismiss Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 2/27/2025. (hs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
28 28 misc Reply (generic) Wed 01/15 12:24 PM
REPLY to Defendant Lakeside Pediatric & Adolescent Medicine, PLLC's Statement of Disputed Material Facts re22 Response to Motion, filed by James Richard Newlin.(hs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
27 27 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 01/15 12:21 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re12 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by James Richard Newlin.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/16/2025.(hs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
26 26 respm Response to Motion Wed 01/08 10:45 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by James Richard Newlin. Replies due by 1/21/2025.(hs)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Consent Filed Tue 01/07 1:55 PM
Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (hs)
Related: [-]
24 24 respm Response to Motion Tue 01/07 11:18 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re16 MOTION to Strike11 MOTION to Dismiss and/or for Summary Judgment filed by Lakeside Pediatric & Adolescent Medicine, PLLC. Replies due by 1/21/2025.(Eskue, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
23 23 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 01/02 2:17 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re11 MOTION to Dismiss and/or for Summary Judgment filed by Lakeside Pediatric & Adolescent Medicine, PLLC.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/3/2025.(Eskue, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
22 22 respm Response to Motion Mon 12/30 4:47 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re12 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Lakeside Pediatric & Adolescent Medicine, PLLC. Replies due by 1/13/2025.(Eskue, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Aaron G. Eskue in Support of Defendant Lakeside Pediatric's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Defendant Lakeside Pediatric's Statement of Disputed Material Facts
Thursday, December 26, 2024
21 21 motion Dismiss Fri 12/27 11:53 AM
Defendant Maria Lynne Centers' MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 1/16/2025(km)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion,
Att: 2 Affidavit in Support
20 20 misc Errata Fri 12/27 11:51 AM
Notice of ERRATA for12 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, by Plaintiff James Richard Newlin. (km)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Envelope
Thursday, December 19, 2024
18 18 misc Reply (generic) Thu 12/19 2:57 PM
REPLY to Defendant Lakeside Pediatric & Adolescent Medicine, PLLC's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts Dkt.11 , filed by James Richard Newlin. (hs)
Related: [-]
17 17 respm Response to Motion Thu 12/19 2:56 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re11 MOTION to Dismiss and/or for Summary Judgment filed by James Richard Newlin. Replies due by 1/2/2025.(hs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
19 19 misc Consent Filed Mon 12/23 1:15 PM
Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jd)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Strike Tue 12/17 12:51 PM
MOTION to Strike11 MOTION to Dismiss and/or for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff James Richard Newlin. Responses due by 1/7/2025 (hs)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
15 15 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/13 8:16 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lakeside Pediatric & Adolescent Medicine, PLLC. (Rauer, Portia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Availability Setting Deadline Wed 12/11 9:10 AM
NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for James Richard Newlin, Lakeside Pediatric & Adolescent Medicine, PLLC, Maria Lynne Centers re1 Complaint,11 MOTION to Dismiss and/or for Summary Judgment . Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 2/10/2025. (jd)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 12/11 9:11 AM
DOCKET TEXT NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/10 9:13 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Portia L Rauer on behalf of Lakeside Pediatric & Adolescent Medicine, PLLC (Rauer, Portia)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
12 12 motion Partial Summary Judgment Mon 12/09 4:47 PM
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff James Richard Newlin. Responses due by 12/30/2024.(jd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service,
Att: 4 Statement of Facts,
Att: 5 Envelope
11 11 motion Dismiss Mon 12/09 4:12 PM
MOTION to Dismiss and/or for Summary Judgment Aaron Glen Eskue appearing for Defendant Lakeside Pediatric & Adolescent Medicine, PLLC. Responses due by 12/30/2024(Eskue, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Defendant Lakeside Pediatric's Motion to Dismiss and/or for Summary Judgment,
Att: 2 Declaration of Aaron G. Eskue in Support of Defendant Lakeside Pediatric's Motion to Dismiss and/or for Summary Judgment,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit D,
Att: 7 Exhibit E,
Att: 8 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts
Thursday, December 05, 2024
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 12/05 1:33 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Maria Lynne Centers, Lakeside Pediatric & Adolescent Medicine, PLLC, filed by James Richard Newlin.(hs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 31 pgs Redlined Version of Amended Complaint dkt. 42,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service,
Att: 3 Envelope
9 9 motion Amend/Correct Thu 12/05 1:27 PM
MOTION to Amend1 Complaint, by Plaintiff James Richard Newlin. Responses due by 12/26/2024 (hs)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 12/03 7:08 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Richard Newlin. Maria Lynne Centers served on 11/16/2024, answer due 12/9/2024; Lakeside Pediatric & Adolescent Medicine, PLLC served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024.(hs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service - Lakeside Pediatric,
Att: 2 Envelope
Monday, November 25, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 11/25 10:53 AM
ORDER ON MOTION TO PERMIT ELECTRONIC CASE FILINGS AND APPEAR REMOTELY - Plaintiffs Motion to Permit Electronic Case Filings (Dkt.4 ) is DENIED. Plaintiffs Motion to Appear Remotely (Dkt.5 ) is RESERVED. Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Order Mon 11/25 8:57 AM
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: Consistent with District of Idaho Local Civ. Rule 4.1, within thirty days of filing the complaint, Plaintiff must file with the Court a status report regarding whether service of the summons and complaint has been effectuated or waived by each defendant and, if so, the date(s) on which each such service or waiver of service occurred. If service of the summons and complaint has not been completed, Plaintiff must inform the Court of the status of his efforts to serve the Defendants. Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (pdg)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
5 5 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 11/22 1:30 PM
MOTION to Appear Remotely by Plaintiff James Richard Newlin. Responses due by 12/13/2024(hs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Envelope
4 4 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 11/22 1:23 PM
MOTION for PACER CM/ECF ACCESS by Plaintiff James Richard Newlin. Responses due by 12/13/2024 (hs) (hs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (11/22/2024) Certificate of Service
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 11/06 4:27 PM
Summons Issued as to Maria Lynne Centers. (Mailed issued summons to pro se Plaintiff) (ef)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 11/06 4:26 PM
Summons Issued as to Lakeside Pediatric & Adolescent Medicine, PLLC. (Mailed issued summons to pro se Plaintiff). (ef)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11/06 3:55 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Summons Issued, filed by James Richard Newlin.(ef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Envelope 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Cover Sheet,
Att: 11 Summons,
Att: 12 Summons,
Att: 13 Envelope
utility Receipt Thu 11/07 8:44 AM
RECEIPT: Civil Filing Fee Fee Received $ 405.00, receipt # 200050105 Paid in Full (ch)
Related: [-]