American Medical Home Health Services-San Antonio,
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-10191
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-10191
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Eduardo V Rodriguez |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-10193 |
Case Filed: | Nov 09, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $500,001 to $1 million |
Est. Liabilities | $500,001 to $1 million |
Nature of Business | Health Care Business |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
American Medical Home Health Services-San Antonio, LLC
1409 N Stuart Place Rd
Harlingen, TX 78552-6364 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
615 E. Houston Street Suite 533
San Antonio, TX 78205 |
Docket last updated: 57 minutes ago |
Tuesday, November 19, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Letter Notice of Undeliverable Mail to Debtor/Debtor's Attorney (jrm2) |
|
Saturday, November 16, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 66. Notice Date 11/16/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, November 14, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/14/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, November 13, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
trustee
Chapter 11 Meeting of Creditors for Corporate Debtor Set (BNC NOTICING)
Wed 11/13 2:53 PM
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 for Non-Individual Debtor Set 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/16/2024 at 01:30 PM, US Trustee Corpus Christi Teleconference. Last day to object to dischargeability under section 523 is 2/14/2025. Proofs of Claims due by 1/17/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 5/8/2025. (Flannery, Jeremy) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee. Melissa A Haselden added to case as trustee. (Flannery, Jeremy) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, November 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
court
Entry
Tue 11/12 12:52 PM
An Order for Joint Administration has been docketed in this case directing all further pleadings, reports, and noticesother than Schedules, a Statement of Financial Affairs, other documents the Debtor shall file under 11 U.S.C. § 521, proofs of claims, and monthly operating reports are to be filed in the Jointly Administered Case. (njc7) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Order Directing Joint Administration. Signed on 11/12/2024 (njc7) |
|
trustee
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 11/12 8:56 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Flannery, Jeremy) |
||
Saturday, November 09, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by American Medical Home Health Services-San Antonio, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan (Small Business) due by 02/7/2025.Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 12/9/2024 (Jordan, Shelby) |
|
crditcrd
none
Sat 11/09 3:31 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-10193 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A25699828. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |