Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Virginia M Hernandez Cov
Referred: Sean P Flynn
Case #: 8:24-cv-02621
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Nov 11, 2024
Terminated:Jan 02, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Dec 26, 2024 3:29 AM EST
Defendant
Prestige Family Assets Group LLC
Represented By
Garrison Michael Cohen
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nigel Lucombe
Represented By
Gerald D Lane, Jr
The Law Offices Of Jibrael S. Hindi, PLLC
contact info
Faaris Kamal Uddin
The Law Offices Of Jibrael S. Hindi
contact info
Jibrael S. Hindi
The Law Offices Of Jibrael S. Hindi
contact info
Zane Charles Hedaya
The Law Offices Of Jibrael S. Hindi
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, January 03, 2025
17 17 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 01/03 10:46 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
16 16 order Order Thu 01/02 1:16 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: The case is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice. (Doc. # 15 ). The Clerk shall close the case. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/2/2025. (RAS)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of voluntary dismissal Thu 01/02 12:09 PM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Nigel Lucombe (Lane, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
14 14 order Order Thu 12/19 1:05 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by January 16, 2025, file a completed Case Management Report. The Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery in the vast majority of cases. If the parties believe that more than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. After the Case Management Report is filed, the Court will determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/19/2024. (RAS)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons returned executed Thu 12/19 9:12 AM
RETURN of service executed on 11/13/2024 by Nigel Lucombe as to Prestige Family Assets Group LLC. (Hedaya, Zane)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
12 12 order Order Tue 12/17 11:44 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel for Defendant has appeared, but Plaintiff has not yet filed the return of service, or proof of waiver, as required under the Rules. Accordingly, Plaintiff is directed to file either the return of service or proof of waiver by December 20, 2024. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/17/2024. (RAS)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
11 11 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 12/02 1:01 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: The Court grants the defendant's unopposed motion for an extension of time to file its answer. (Doc. # 9 ). Based upon the reasons stated within the motion, the Court finds good cause to grant the requested extension. The defendant's answer is now due on January 2, 2025. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/2/2024. (RAS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 11/27 12:45 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Garrison Michael Cohen on behalf of Prestige Family Assets Group LLC. Lead Counsel: Garrison M. Cohen, Esq.. (Cohen, Garrison)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Wed 11/27 12:33 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Prestige Family Assets Group LLC. (Cohen, Garrison)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 11/15 4:11 PM
NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of a Related Action Tue 11/12 6:07 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Nigel Lucombe. Related case(s): No (Uddin, Faaris)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Tue 11/12 6:06 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Nigel Lucombe identifying Other Affiliate Jibrael S Hindi for Nigel Lucombe.. (Uddin, Faaris)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 11/12 6:03 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Faaris Kamal Uddin on behalf of Nigel Lucombe. Lead Counsel: Faaris K. Uddin. (Uddin, Faaris)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons issued Tue 11/12 10:13 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Prestige Family Assets Group LLC. (JOS)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 11/12 10:10 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL All Counsel of Record of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JOS)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 11/12 9:07 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:24-cv-2621-VMC-SPF. (RPB) Modified on 11/12/2024 to edit the docket text (RPB)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 11/11 3:57 PM
COMPLAINT against Prestige Family Assets Group LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22706612) filed by Nigel Lucombe.(Uddin, Faaris)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet