California Northern District Court
Judge:Virginia K Demarchi
Case #: 5:24-cv-07879
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Nov 12, 2024
Terminated:Apr 24, 2025
Last checked: Friday Dec 27, 2024 12:19 AM PST
Defendant
USCIS
Represented By
Luz Restrepo
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
Alissa Emmel
Represented By
Luz Restrepo
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
Ur Jaddou
Represented By
Luz Restrepo
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By
Luz Restrepo
Doj-Civ
contact info
Plaintiff
Manoj Chander Tuguru Thiruvedhi
Represented By
Niralkumar Patel
Kldp, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kalyanasundaram Suryanarayanan
Represented By
Niralkumar Patel
Kldp, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jason Samuel Sukumaran
Represented By
Niralkumar Patel
Kldp, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sridhar Srinivasan
Represented By
Niralkumar Patel
Kldp, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nilesh Kumar Singh
Represented By
Niralkumar Patel
Kldp, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jayalaxmi Bochihalli Shekarraju
Represented By
Niralkumar Patel
Kldp, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Vijay Ratthinam
Represented By
Niralkumar Patel
Kldp, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ravi Ramadasu
Represented By
Niralkumar Patel
Kldp, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Chiranjit Mukherjee
Represented By
Niralkumar Patel
Kldp, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Swapnil Modak
Represented By
Niralkumar Patel
Kldp, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Subramanian Kanthi Muragan
Represented By
Niralkumar Patel
Kldp, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sameera Gupta
Represented By
Niralkumar Patel
Kldp, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kushal Govindbhai Gevaria
Represented By
Niralkumar Patel
Kldp, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Varun Ganesh
Represented By
Niralkumar Patel
Kldp, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Hiteshkumar Keshavjibhai Gamdha
Represented By
Niralkumar Patel
Kldp, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Abhijith Reddy Dudipala
Represented By
Niralkumar Patel
Kldp, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Prudhvi Chaitanya Dhulipalla
Represented By
Niralkumar Patel
Kldp, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mahendiran Chandrasekar
Represented By
Niralkumar Patel
Kldp, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/27/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
18 18 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 04/24 11:09 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ravi Ramadasu, Vijay Ratthinam, Nilesh Kumar Singh, Sridhar Srinivasan, Subramanian Kanthi Muragan, Jason Samuel Sukumaran, Kalyanasundaram Suryanarayanan, Manoj Chander Tuguru Thiruvedhi, Chiranjit Mukherjee, Jayalaxmi Bochihalli Shekarraju, Mahendiran Chandrasekar, Prudhvi Chaitanya Dhulipalla, Abhijith Reddy Dudipala, Hiteshkumar Keshavjibhai Gamdha, Varun Ganesh, Kushal Govindbhai Gevaria, Sameera Gupta, Swapnil Modak (Patel, Niralkumar)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
17 17 order Order Tue 03/25 5:10 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER. Pursuant to 16 Joint Status Report, the parties shall provide a further status report to the Court no later than May 8, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 3/25/2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
16 16 misc Status Report Mon 03/24 9:47 AM
Joint Status Report by USCIS, Ur Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas. Related [+]
Related: [-] strepo, Luz
Monday, February 10, 2025
15 15 order Order Mon 02/10 6:24 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER. Pursuant to 14 Joint Status Report, the parties shall provide a further status report to the Court no later than March 24, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 2/10/2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
14 14 misc Status Report Fri 02/07 7:24 AM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) filed by USCIS, Ur Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Alissa Emmel. Related [+]
Related: [-] strepo, Luz
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 02/05 9:05 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Vijay Ratthinam, Nilesh Kumar Singh, Subramanian Kanthi Muragan, Manoj Chander Tuguru Thiruvedhi, Mahendiran Chandrasekar, Kushal Govindbhai Gevaria (Patel, Niralkumar)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 12/27 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ravi Ramadasu, Sridhar Srinivasan, Jason Samuel Sukumaran, Kalyanasundaram Suryanarayanan, Chiranjit Mukherjee, Jayalaxmi Bochihalli Shekarraju, Prudhvi Chaitanya Dhulipalla, Abhijith Reddy Dudipala, Varun Ganesh, Sameera Gupta, Swapnil Modak (Patel, Niralkumar)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
11 11 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 12/24 3:57 PM
ORDER granting 10 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 12/24/2024. (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
10 10 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 12/23 10:57 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Joint) filed by USCIS, Ur Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Alissa Emmel. Related [+]
Related: [-] strepo, Luz
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Wed 12/11 1:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Luz Restrepo on behalf of USCIS, Ur JADDOU, Alejandro MAYORKAS, Alissa EMMEL Related [+]
Related: [-] strepo, Luz
Monday, November 18, 2024
8 8 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 11/18 6:47 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ravi Ramadasu, Vijay Ratthinam, Nilesh Kumar Singh, Sridhar Srinivasan, Subramanian Kanthi Muragan, Jason Samuel Sukumaran, Kalyanasundaram Suryanarayanan, Manoj Chander Tuguru Thiruvedhi, Chiranjit Mukherjee, Jayalaxmi Bochihalli Shekarraju, Mahendiran Chandrasekar, Prudhvi Chaitanya Dhulipalla, Abhijith Reddy Dudipala, Hiteshkumar Keshavjibhai Gamdha, Varun Ganesh, Kushal Govindbhai Gevaria, Sameera Gupta, Swapnil Modak.. (Patel, Niralkumar)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 11/15 12:32 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety. Re:7 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge,, filed by Manoj Chander Tuguru Thiruvedhi, Kalyanasundaram Suryanarayanan, Abhijith Reddy Dudipala, Varun Ganesh, Kushal Govindbhai Gevaria, Chiranjit Mukherjee, Prudhvi Chaitanya Dhulipalla, Swapnil Modak, Sameera Gupta, Vijay Ratthinam, Hiteshkumar Keshavjibhai Gamdha, Ravi Ramadasu, Mahendiran Chandrasekar, Nilesh Kumar Singh, Subramanian Kanthi Muragan, Sridhar Srinivasan, Jason Samuel Sukumaran, Jayalaxmi Bochihalli Shekarraju (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 11/14 10:58 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ravi Ramadasu, Vijay Ratthinam, Nilesh Kumar Singh, Sridhar Srinivasan, Subramanian Kanthi Muragan, Jason Samuel Sukumaran, Kalyanasundaram Suryanarayanan, Manoj Chander Tuguru Thiruvedhi, Chiranjit Mukherjee, Jayalaxmi Bochihalli Shekarraju, Mahendiran Chandrasekar, Prudhvi Chaitanya Dhulipalla, Abhijith Reddy Dudipala, Hiteshkumar Keshavjibhai Gamdha, Varun Ganesh, Kushal Govindbhai Gevaria, Sameera Gupta, Swapnil Modak.. (Patel, Niralkumar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued as to USA Wed 11/13 3:29 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order Wed 11/13 3:27 PM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Wed 11/13 3:32 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Parties added to action incorrectly . Counsel is reminded not to add parties in all caps. For future reference, please refer to https://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. See Guide to E-Filing New Civil Cases (Section III.c Adding Parties).Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re:1 Complaint filed by Kalyanasundaram SURYANARAYANAN, Hiteshkumar Keshavjibhai GAMDHA, Abhijith Reddy DUDIPALA, Jason Samuel SUKUMARAN, Subramanian KANTHI MURUGAN, Ravi RAMADASU, Jayalaxmi Bochihalli SHEKARRAJU, Swapnil MODAK, Varun GANESH, Chiranjit Mukherjee, Vijay RATTHINAM, Manoj Chander TUGURU THIRUVEDHI, Sridhar SRINIVASAN, Sameera GUPTA, Kushal Govindbhai GEVARIA, Nilesh Kumar SINGH, Mahendiran CHANDRASEKAR, Prudhvi Chaitanya DHULIPALLA (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 11/12 9:31 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/26/2024. (exl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 11/12 8:32 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Ravi RAMADASU, Vijay RATTHINAM, Nilesh Kumar SINGH, Sridhar SRINIVASAN, Subramanian KANTHI MURUGAN, Jason Samuel SUKUMARAN, Kalyanasundaram SURYANARAYANAN, Manoj Chander TUGURU THIRUVEDHI, Chiranjit MUKHERJEE, Jayalaxmi Bochihalli SHEKARRAJU, Mahendiran CHANDRASEKAR, Prudhvi Chaitanya DHULIPALLA, Abhijith Reddy DUDIPALA, Hiteshkumar Keshavjibhai GAMDHA, Varun GANESH, Kushal Govindbhai GEVARIA, Sameera GUPTA, Swapnil MODAK (Patel, Niralkumar)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Tue 11/12 8:31 AM
Proposed Summons. (Patel, Niralkumar)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/12 8:30 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20037183.). Filed by Vijay RATTHINAM, Kushal Govindbhai GEVARIA, Mahendiran CHANDRASEKAR, Manoj Chander TUGURU THIRUVEDHI, Jayalaxmi Bochihalli SHEKARRAJU, Chiranjit MUKHERJEE, Sridhar SRINIVASAN, Kalyanasundaram SURYANARAYANAN, Varun GANESH, Prudhvi Chaitanya DHULIPALLA, Swapnil MODAK, Nilesh Kumar SINGH, Subramanian KANTHI MURUGAN, Jason Samuel SUKUMARAN, Sameera GUPTA, Abhijith Reddy DUDIPALA, Ravi RAMADASU, Hiteshkumar Keshavjibhai GAMDHA.(Patel, Niralkumar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' I-526E Receipt Notices,
Att: 2 Exhibit Redacted I-526E Approval Notice,
Att: 3 Exhibit Redacted I-526E Approval Notice,
Att: 4 Exhibit USCIS Form Data,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet Civl Cover Sheet