New Mexico District Court
Case #: 2:24-mj-01635
Case Filed:Nov 11, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 13, 2024 12:17 AM MST
Defendant
Manuel Alberto Gonzalez-Rangel (1)
Represented By
Victoria Trull
Federal Public Defender'S Office Las Cruces
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Richard C Williams
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/13/2024 12:30 AM MST
Friday, November 08, 2024
Arrest of Manuel Alberto Gonzalez-Rangel (kls)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
Hearing as to Manuel Alberto Gonzalez-Rangel: Initial Appearance set for 11/12/2024 at 09:06 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower) before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. (kls)
Related: [-]