California Eastern District Court
Judge:Troy L Nunley
Referred: Carolyn K Delaney
Case #: 2:24-cv-03111
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Nov 12, 2024
Terminated:Nov 26, 2024
Last checked: Friday Dec 27, 2024 12:20 AM PST
Defendant
Thunder Valley Casino
Plaintiff
Quoc H. Nguyen
6231 63rd Street
Sacramento, CA 95824


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 11/26 4:53 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE (text only); Pursuant to Plaintiff's NOTICE of voluntary dismissal3 , this action is DISMISSED. CASE CLOSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 11/26 12:16 PM
NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Quoc H. Nguyen. (Becknal, R.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
2 2 motion In Forma Pauperis Tue 11/12 5:13 PM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Quoc H. Nguyen. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/12 5:12 PM
COMPLAINT against Thunder Valley Casino by Quoc H. Nguyen. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc IFP Application Tue 11/12 5:14 PM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]