New York Southern District Court
Judge:J Paul Oetken
Case #: 1:24-cv-08610
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:44 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Nov 13, 2024
Terminated:Dec 04, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Dec 28, 2024 3:56 AM EST
Defendant
BA Diversity Media, Inc.
a Delaware corporation 275 Park Ave. Suite A
Brooklyn, NY 11205
Defendant
Brand Advance Group
Defendant
Brand Advance LTD
Defendant
Brand Advance UK
Defendant
Chris Kenna
Plaintiff
Brand Advance LLC
401 East Las Olas Blvd. Suite 1400
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301
Represented By
Marshall Adams
Marshall A. Adams, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 53 minutes ago
Friday, December 06, 2024
misc Received Acknowledgment (Electronic Case Transfer) Wed 12/11 11:26 AM
Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Eastern District of New York acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 1:24-cv-08384, filed on 12/5/2024. (tro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
23 23 1 pgs misc AO 120 Form Trademark - Case Terminated - Submitted Thu 12/05 9:23 AM
AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE TERMINATED - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 12/4/2024 in a court action filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(mml)
Related: [-]
22 22 1 pgs order Order Thu 12/05 9:10 AM
ORDER: On consent of the Plaintiff, this case is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. The transfer shall be effectuated forthwith. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 12/4/2024) (mml)
Related: [-]
transfer Case Transferred Out - District Transfer Thu 12/05 9:15 AM
CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of New York. (mml)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
21 21 misc Letter Tue 12/03 2:08 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Marshall A. Adams, Esq. dated 12/3/2024 re: NOTICE OF CONSENT TO TRANSFER PURSUANT TO [DE 20] ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OR CONSENT TO TRANSFER. Document filed by Brand Advance LLC..(Adams, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 29, 2024
20 20 order Order Fri 11/29 11:29 AM
ORDER: In its memorandum in support of a TRO and preliminary injunction, Plaintiff states that venue is proper in this judicial district pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1391, as Defendant maintains offices in this district. ECF No. 19 at 18. And in its complaint, Plaintiff states that Venue is proper in this judicial district pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1391, as Defendant Kenna resides in New York and the foreign entities do business and have an office in New York. ECF No. 4 at 3. The allegations and attached documents indicate that Defendants New York office is in Brooklyn, New York, and public information suggests that Defendant Kenna resides in Brooklyn to the extent that he may reside in New York City. Brooklyn is in the Eastern District of New York, not the Southern District of New York. Accordingly, Plaintiff shall show cause within 7 days why this case should not be transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404 or file a letter indicating its consent to such transfer. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken) (Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
19 19 25 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Wed 11/27 3:46 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:18 EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Other Relief . . Document filed by Brand Advance LLC..(Adams, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Defs appearing in ads, social media etc,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - 2021.03.10 Email from Pltf to Def,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - 2021.03.17 Email from Def to Pltf,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - DE corporation registered,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. 5 - Defs using Pltfs Mark in YouTube video,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. 6 - WeareBrandAdvance logo,
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex. 7 - Def using Brand Advance Mark online,
Att: 8 Exhibit Ex. 8 - 2024.09.29 Search for Brand Advance Group,
Att: 9 Exhibit Ex. 9 - 2024.09.29 Search for Brand Advance,
Att: 10 Exhibit Ex. 10 - Identity Architects video,
Att: 11 Exhibit Ex. 11 - Defs using Pltfs Mark in NY offices,
Att: 12 Exhibit Ex. 12 - Defs using U.S. based websites that create business connections,
Att: 13 Exhibit Ex. 13 - Social Media,
Att: 14 Exhibit Ex. 14 - Def giving interviews,
Att: 15 Exhibit Ex. 15 - Defs advertising positions,
Att: 16 Exhibit Ex. 16 - Glassdoor review,
Att: 17 Exhibit Ex. 17 - Glassdoor review CEO,
Att: 18 Exhibit Ex. 18 - Infringing marketing and advertising activities,
Att: 19 Exhibit Ex. 19 - LinkedIn,
Att: 20 Exhibit Ex. 20 - 2024.07.25 Pltfs cease and desist letter,
Att: 21 Exhibit Ex. 21 - LinkedIn 2,
Att: 22 Exhibit Ex. 22 - Brand Advance Trademark
18 18 motion Temporary Restraining Order Wed 11/27 3:37 PM
EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Other Relief . Document filed by Brand Advance LLC..(Adams, Marshall) ( Refer to ECF Rule 13.19(b) and (c) for directions regarding promptly alerting the court to this filing. )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
17 17 service Summons Issued Mon 11/25 5:04 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brand Advance LTD..(pc)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Summons Issued Mon 11/25 5:04 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brand Advance UK..(pc)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Issued Mon 11/25 5:03 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brand Advance Group..(pc)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Issued Mon 11/25 5:03 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BA Diversity Media, Inc...(pc)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Issued Mon 11/25 5:02 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chris Kenna..(pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
12 12 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 11/22 1:07 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BRAND ADVANCE UK, re:4 Complaint,,. Document filed by Brand Advance LLC..(Adams, Marshall)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 11/22 1:06 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BRAND ADVANCE LTD, re:4 Complaint,,. Document filed by Brand Advance LLC..(Adams, Marshall)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 11/22 1:04 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BRAND ADVANCE GROUP, re:4 Complaint,,. Document filed by Brand Advance LLC..(Adams, Marshall)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 11/22 12:59 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BA DIVERSITY MEDIA, INC, re:4 Complaint,,. Document filed by Brand Advance LLC..(Adams, Marshall)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 11/22 12:52 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chris Kenna, re:4 Complaint,,. Document filed by Brand Advance LLC..(Adams, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
7 7 misc AO 120 Form Patent - Case Opening - Submitted Thu 11/21 4:19 PM
AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(gp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
6 6 1 pgs misc AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney Wed 11/20 1:29 PM
AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Adams, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
5 5 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 11/19 11:56 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Adams, Marshall)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Complaint Tue 11/19 11:26 AM
COMPLAINT against BA Diversity Media, Inc., Brand Advance Group, Brand Advance LTD, Brand Advance UK, Chris Kenna. Document filed by Brand Advance LLC..(Adams, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Brand Advance Trademark,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. 2 UK00003447070 & UK00003447073,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. 3 DB Emails BA UK and NYC for first time 3 10-2021 - Trademark Infringement - Brand Advance,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. 4 DB receives reply from CK - BA March 17 2021 - Trademark Infringement - Brand Advance,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. 5 DE Entity,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. 6 April 20 2022 - Media Leader,
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex. 7 July 25, 2024 - Plaintiff Letter - Notice of Infringement and Hardship - BRAND ADVANCE
Monday, November 18, 2024
3 3 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Mon 11/18 1:00 PM
ORDER: Initial Conference set for 2/26/2025 at 11:00 AM before Judge J. Paul Oetken. Counsel should call (888) 557-8511 at the scheduled time. The access code is 9300838. Counsel who appear at the pretrial conference must be authorized to negotiate terms of settlement. Members of the public may join but are instructed to place their phones on mute. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 11/18/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Order Mon 11/18 12:27 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff shall remedy the ECF filing deficiencies noted on the docket no later than November 25, 2024, including filing a Civil Cover Sheet, or this action will be dismissed without prejudice. So ordered. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken) (Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 11/14 9:30 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 11/14 9:31 AM
Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 11/14 9:31 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Thu 11/14 9:31 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Marshall Adams. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Arbitration code e (Exempt); County code Kings; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Thu 11/14 9:31 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Marshall Adams. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Brand Advance UK, BA Diversity Media, Inc., Brand Advance LTD, Brand Advance Group. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Thu 11/14 9:31 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Marshall Adams to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit AO 120 Form/AO 121 Form Thu 11/14 9:31 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney Marshall Adams to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet Thu 11/14 9:31 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Marshall Adams. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 11/13 3:58 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-30179708)Document filed by Brand Advance LLC..(Adams, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Brand Advance Trademark,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. 2 UK00003447070 & UK00003447073,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. 3 DB Emails BA UK and NYC for first time 3 10-2021 - Trademark Infringement - Brand Advance,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. 4 DB receives reply from CK - BA March 17 2021 - Trademark Infringement - Brand Advance,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. 5 DE Entity,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. 6 April 20 2022 - Media Leader,
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex. 7 July 25, 2024 - Plaintiff Letter - Notice of Infringement and Hardship - BRAND ADVANCE