Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael M Parker
Case #: 5:24-bk-52297
Case Filed:Nov 14, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$50,000,001 to $100 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Texas Solar Integrated, LLC
5631 University Hts
San Antonio, TX 78249-3991
Represented By
Raymond W. Battaglia
Law Offices Of Ray Battaglia, PLLC
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 25 minutes ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
152 152 cmp Complaint Mon 04/14 5:54 PM
Adversary case 25-05036 Complaint filed by Green Lease Co., LLC (attorney Omar Jesus Alaniz), 24 GL, LLC (attorney Omar Jesus Alaniz), 24 SGC1, LLC (attorney Omar Jesus Alaniz), 24 SGC2, LLC (attorney Omar Jesus Alaniz), Green Lease Co. No. 2, LLC (attorney Omar Jesus Alaniz), Green Lease Co. No. 2, LLC (attorney Omar Jesus Alaniz), Solar Green Col No. 1, LLC (attorney Omar Jesus Alaniz), Solar Green Co. No. 2, LLC (attorney Omar Jesus Alaniz), Solar Green Co. No. 3, LLC (attorney Omar Jesus Alaniz), WH&CM Holdings, LLC (attorney Omar Jesus Alaniz), Armstrong Operating Company, LLC (attorney Omar Jesus Alaniz) against Texas Solar Integrated, LLC, Michael Richard Sardo, Visible Solar LLC (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(91 (Declaratory judgment)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))). (Alaniz, Omar)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
151 151 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 04/11 9:22 PM
Adversary case 25-05035 Notice of Removal - Michael R. Sardo, SARDO INVESTMENTS, LLC against Willard H. Hammonds II, Green Lease Co., LLC ( Filing Fee: $ 350.00 ) (Nature(s) of Suit:(01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)))). (Alaniz, Omar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court Docket Sheet
Att: 2 Plaintiffs Original Petition
Att: 3 Business Court Case Information Sheet
Att: 4 Citation to Willard H. Hammond, II
Att: 5 Citation to Green lease Co., LLC
Att: 6 Issuance Request Form
Att: 7 Affidavit of Service as to Green Lease Co., LLC
Att: 8 Affidavit of Service as to Willard H. Hammond, II
Att: 9 Transfer Order
Att: 10 Business Court Welcome Letter
Att: 11 - Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue and Original Answer and Response Subject Thereto
Att: 12 Notice of Hearing
Att: 13 Adversary Coversheet
Thursday, April 10, 2025
150 150 motion Compensation Thu 04/10 6:15 PM
Interim Application for Compensation (21 Day Objection Language ), Fees $ 89,148.00, Expenses $ 752.44, For Time Period From 11/14/2024 To Time Period Ending 3/31/2025 filed by Raymond W. Battaglia for Debtor Texas Solar Integrated, LLC(Battaglia, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Fee Application Summary
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Retention Order
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Invoice
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Att: 5 Service List - Fee Application Summary Only
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
149 149 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 04/09 11:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/09/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 143 Order Regarding (related document(s):73 EMERGENCY Motion for Entry of an Order Compelling Debtor to Reject Master Installer Services Agreement filed by Michael S. Forshey for Interested Party Everbright, LLC, (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A - Declaration of Alexandru Bodea #(2) Proposed Order)(Forshey, Michael) Modified on 1/18/2025 .) (Order entered on 4/7/2025)
148 148 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 04/09 11:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/09/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 145 Request for Notice-All Parties/Creditors (Related Document(s):144 Order Regarding (related document(s):141 UNOPPOSED Motion to Continue Disclosure Statement Hearing filed by Raymond W. Battaglia for Debtor Texas Solar Integrated, LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order)(Battaglia, Raymond) (Related Document(s):129 Disclosure Statement filed by Raymond W. Battaglia for Debtor Texas Solar Integrated, LLC.) Modified on 4/5/2025 .) (Order entered on 4/7/2025))
147 147 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 04/09 11:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]
Related: [-] 142 Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: ( IF TIME ESTIMATE EXCEEDS 20 MINUTES, PLEASE E-MAIL DEANNA CASTLEBERRY AT: deanna_castleberry@txwb.uscourts.gov. ) (Related Document(s):138 Motion to Allow Late Filed Proof of Claim filed by Creditor Clifford R. Ellison. Hearing Scheduled For 4/30/2025 at 9:30 AM at SA Courtroom 1. ) Notice Date 04/09/2025. (Admin.
Monday, April 07, 2025
146 146 misc Certificate of Service Mon 04/07 4:56 PM
Certificate of Service filed by Raymond W. Battaglia for Debtor Texas Solar Integrated, LLC. (Battaglia, Raymond) Related [+]
Related: [-] 144 Order Regarding (related document(s):141 UNOPPOSED Motion to Continue Disclosure Statement Hearing filed by Raymond W. Battaglia for Debtor Texas Solar Integrated, LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order)(Battaglia, Raymond) (Related Document(s):129 Disclosure Statement filed by Raymond W. Battaglia for Debtor Texas Solar Integrated, LLC.) Modified on 4/5/2025.) (Order entered on 4/7/2025)
145 145 court Request for Notice-All Parties/Creditors (PDF) Mon 04/07 10:54 AM
Request for Notice-All Parties/Creditors Related [+] (Hardage, Bridget)
Related: [-] 144 Order Regarding (related document(s):141 UNOPPOSED Motion to Continue Disclosure Statement Hearing filed by Raymond W. Battaglia for Debtor Texas Solar Integrated, LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order)(Battaglia, Raymond) (Related Document(s):129 Disclosure Statement filed by Raymond W. Battaglia for Debtor Texas Solar Integrated, LLC.) Modified on 4/5/2025 .) (Order entered on 4/7/2025)
144 144 order BK-Regarding Matter (pdf) Mon 04/07 10:51 AM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 4/7/2025) (Hardage, Bridget)
Related: [-] 141 UNOPPOSED Motion to Continue Disclosure Statement Hearing filed by Raymond W. Battaglia for Debtor Texas Solar Integrated, LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order)(Battaglia, Raymond) (Related Document(s):129 Disclosure Statement filed by Raymond W. Battaglia for Debtor Texas Solar Integrated, LLC.) Modified on 4/5/2025 .
143 143 order BK-Regarding Matter (pdf) Mon 04/07 7:06 AM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 4/7/2025) (McGee, Maxine)
Related: [-] 73 EMERGENCY Motion for Entry of an Order Compelling Debtor to Reject Master Installer Services Agreement filed by Michael S. Forshey for Interested Party Everbright, LLC, (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A - Declaration of Alexandru Bodea #(2) Proposed Order)(Forshey, Michael) Modified on 1/18/2025 .
court Hearing Continued (NO FORM) Mon 04/07 5:42 AM
Hearing RESET Related [+] Hearing Scheduled For 5/21/2025 at 9:30 AM at SA Courtroom 1. (Castleberry, Deanna)
Related: [-] 129 Disclosure Statement filed by Raymond W. Battaglia for Debtor Texas Solar Integrated, LLC.
court Notice Regarding ZOOM Request (MMP) Mon 04/07 7:59 AM
Judge's Notice, Permitting Reagan "Tres" Gibbs, III Appearance at hearing on 04/09/2025, via ZOOM, https://www.zoomgov.com/my/parkercourt1. Prior to the Hearing starting ALL PARTIES DIALING INTO ZOOM SHOULD MAKE SURE TO USE THE NAME IN WHICH WAS APPROVED FOR ZOOM. PARTIES WILL BE HELD IN A WAITING STATUS WHERE YOU WILL REMAIN UNTIL YOUR CASE IS CALLED AT WHICH TIME YOU WILL BE MOVED INTO THE LIVE COURT HEARING. Related [+] (Castleberry, Deanna)
Related: [-] 129 Disclosure Statement filed by Raymond W. Battaglia for Debtor Texas Solar Integrated, LLC.