Indiana Southern District Court
Judge:James R Sweeney II
Referred: Crystal S Wildeman
Case #: 1:24-cv-02006
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Nov 15, 2024
Terminated:Mar 07, 2025
Last checked: Monday Dec 30, 2024 3:56 AM EST
Defendant
SYNCHRONY BANK
Plaintiff
JAMES-PAYTON SHOWERS
3603 Clarks Creek Road Lot 40
Plainfield, IN 46168


Docket last updated: 04/23/2025 2:58 PM EDT
Thursday, November 14, 2024
1 1 19 pgs COMPLAINT against SYNCHRONY BANK, filed by JAMES-PAYTON SHOWERS. (No fee paid with this filing)(CCG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
2 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff JAMES-PAYTON SHOWERS. (CCG)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
3 3 1 pgs MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (CCG)
Related: [-]
4 4 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (KLS) (CCG)
Related: [-]
5 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET, filed by Plaintiff JAMES-PAYTON SHOWERS. (AAS)
Related: [-]