New York Northern District Court
Judge:Elizabeth C Coombe
Referred: Mitchell J Katz
Case #: 6:24-cv-01395
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78j(b)ss Stockholder Suit
Case Filed:Nov 15, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 04, 2025 6:01 AM EST
Consol Defendant
Wolfspeed, Inc.
Represented By
Debo P. Adegbile
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr Llp - Ny Office
contact info
Consol Defendant
Neill P. Reynolds
Represented By
Debo P. Adegbile
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr Llp - Ny Office
contact info
Consol Defendant
Gregg A. Lowe
Represented By
Debo P. Adegbile
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr Llp - Ny Office
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
William Maizner
Represented By
Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Joseph Alexander Hood, II
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Luis Ferreira
Represented By
Sarah E. Delaney
Block & Leviton LLP
contact info
Defendant
Gregg A. Lowe
Represented By
Debo P. Adegbile
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr Llp - Ny Office
contact info
Defendant
Neill P. Reynolds
Represented By
Debo P. Adegbile
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr Llp - Ny Office
contact info
Defendant
Wolfspeed, Inc.
Represented By
Debo P. Adegbile
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr Llp - Ny Office
contact info
Movant
Ahmed Soliman
Represented By
Brian P Murray
Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP
contact info
Movant
Laborers District Council and Contractors Pension Fund of Ohio
Represented By
Sarah E. Delaney
Block & Leviton LLP
contact info
Movant
Khurram Shahzad
Represented By
Phillip Kim
The Rosen Law Firm
contact info
Movant
Derick Pearlin
Represented By
Gregory M. Nespole
Levi & Korsinsky LLP
contact info
Movant
Mitchell Gregg
Represented By
Lawrence P. Eagel
Bragar Eagel & Squire, P.C.
contact info
Movant
Pawan Banjade
One Commerce Plaza
Albany, NY 12260
Represented By
Robert S. Rosborough, IV
Whiteman, Osterman Law Firm - Albany Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Dr. Syed M. Alam
Represented By
Alan Ellman
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info
Samuel H. Rudman
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Cai Guangjian
Represented By
Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Joseph Alexander Hood, II
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
He Jie
Represented By
Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Joseph Alexander Hood, II
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Gary Zagami
Represented By
Gregory M. Nespole
Levi & Korsinsky LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Qiu Shaomei
Represented By
Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Joseph Alexander Hood, II
Pomerantz LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, March 17, 2025
54 54 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/17 10:39 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicole Elizabeth Prunetti on behalf of Gregg A. Lowe, Neill P. Reynolds, Wolfspeed, Inc. (Prunetti, Nicole)
Related: [-]
53 53 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/17 10:37 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Bongiorno on behalf of Gregg A. Lowe, Neill P. Reynolds, Wolfspeed, Inc. (Bongiorno, Michael)
Related: [-]
52 52 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/17 10:35 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tamar Kaplan-Marans on behalf of Gregg A. Lowe, Neill P. Reynolds, Wolfspeed, Inc. (Kaplan-Marans, Tamar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
51 51 order Order on Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/13 11:31 AM
TEXT ORDER granting the #48 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions. Counsel is reminded that, once the above is accomplished, a NOTICE OF APPEARANCE MUST FILED IN THIS ACTION or you will not receive electronic notifications in the case. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Mitchell J. Katz on 3/13/2025. (kck)
Related: [-]
50 50 order Order on Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/13 11:29 AM
TEXT ORDER granting the #47 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions. Counsel is reminded that, once the above is accomplished, a NOTICE OF APPEARANCE MUST FILED IN THIS ACTION or you will not receive electronic notifications in the case. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Mitchell J. Katz on 3/13/2025. (kck)
Related: [-]
49 49 order Order on Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/13 11:27 AM
TEXT ORDER granting the #44 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions. Counsel is reminded that, once the above is accomplished, a NOTICE OF APPEARANCE MUST FILED IN THIS ACTION or you will not receive electronic notifications in the case. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Mitchell J. Katz on 3/13/2025. (kck)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
48 48 motion Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/10 3:41 PM
MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Tamar B. Kaplan-Marans for Defendants Gregg A. Lowe, Neill P. Reynolds, and Wolfspeed, Inc. $100 fee paid on 3/10/2025-receipt no. 27MB39EL. [THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND VIEWABLE BY COURT USERS ONLY] Motions referred to Mitchell J. Katz. (ham) Modified on 3/10/2025 (ham)
Related: [-]
47 47 motion Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/10 3:24 PM
MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nicole E. Prunetti as to Defendants Gregg A. Lowe, Neill P. Reynolds, and Wolfspeed, Inc. $100 fee paid on 3/10/2025-receipt no. 27MB398J. [THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND VIEWABLE BY COURT USERS ONLY] Motions referred to Mitchell J. Katz. (ham) Modified on 3/10/2025 (ham)
Related: [-]