New York Southern District Court
Judge:Lewis A Kaplan
Referred: Ona T Wang
Case #: 1:24-cv-08783
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Nov 19, 2024
Terminated:Mar 26, 2025
Last checked: Friday Jan 03, 2025 3:29 AM EST
Defendant
Wisdom Digital Media, Inc.
Represented By
Daniel Jason Dimuro
Gordon & Rees LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Hugh Kretschmer
Represented By
Craig B. Sanders
Sanders Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
18 18 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 04/01 1:30 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Wisdom Digital Media, Inc.. Document filed by Hugh Kretschmer. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Wed 03/26 11:44 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:16 Notice of Settlement filed by Wisdom Digital Media, Inc. ENDORSEMENT : The case is dismissed with prejudice and without costs subject to right to reinstate by serving and filing a notice to that effect on or before April 25, 2025 if the settlement has not been consummated by then. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/25/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
misc AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Terminated - Submitted Wed 03/26 11:57 AM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE TERMINATED- SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 3/26/25 in a court action filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (yv)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 03/24 11:10 AM
NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Wisdom Digital Media, Inc...(Dimuro, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 02/19 1:30 PM
ORDER granting14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Application GRANTED. Defendant's deadline to respond to the complaint is March 24, 2025. The conference currently scheduled for March 4 is adjourned to April 8, 2025, at 10:30 a.m. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 2/19/2025) (rro)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Set/Reset Hearings Wed 02/19 1:32 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Wisdom Digital Media, Inc. answer due 3/24/2025., Set/Reset Hearings:( Initial Conference set for 4/8/2025 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang.) (rro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 02/18 4:22 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Daniel DiMuro dated February 18, 2025. Document filed by Wisdom Digital Media, Inc...(Dimuro, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 01/16 12:48 PM
ORDER granting11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Application GRANTED. Defendant's response to the complaint is due February 20, 2025. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 1/16/2025) (rro)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 01/16 12:55 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Wisdom Digital Media, Inc. answer due 2/20/2025. (rro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
12 12 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Wed 01/15 2:57 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Wisdom Digital Media, Inc...(Dimuro, Daniel)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 01/15 2:23 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Daniel DiMuro dated January 15, 2025. Document filed by Wisdom Digital Media, Inc...(Dimuro, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
10 10 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Tue 12/03 11:38 AM
INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: An Initial Pretrial Conference in accordance with Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure will be held on Tuesday, March 04, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 12/3/2024) Initial Conference set for 3/4/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (ar) Modified on 12/3/2024 (ar)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 11/25 3:50 PM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/25/2024) (ar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/20 3:45 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Jason Dimuro on behalf of Wisdom Digital Media, Inc...(Dimuro, Daniel)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 11/20 2:54 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Wisdom Digital Media, Inc. waiver sent on 11/20/2024, answer due 1/21/2025. Document filed by Hugh Kretschmer..(Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Opening - Submitted Wed 11/20 2:43 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(pc)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 11/20 2:34 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wisdom Digital Media, Inc...(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 11/20 10:32 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 11/20 10:32 AM
Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 11/20 10:32 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
4 4 misc AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney Tue 11/19 8:00 AM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 11/19 7:59 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Wisdom Digital Media, Inc., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Hugh Kretschmer..(Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 11/19 7:58 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 11/19 7:58 AM
COMPLAINT against Wisdom Digital Media, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30202860)Document filed by Hugh Kretschmer..(Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Original Photographs,
Att: 2 Exhibit Infringing uses of Photographs