Georgia Northern District Court
Case #: 1:10-cr-00210
Case Filed:May 12, 2010
Terminated:Nov 04, 2011

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 03/27/2025 4:49 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 12, 2010
9 9 INDICTMENT as to Li Qin Chen (1) count(s) 1, Huicun Zhang (2) count(s) 1. (UNSEALED PURSUANT TO ORDER FILED 6/22/10) (ryc). Modified on 6/23/2010 to attach PDF document to previously sealed docket entry (ryc).
Related: [-]
10 10 MOTION to Seal 30 Indictment by USA as to Li Qin Chen, Huicun Zhang. (ryc). Modified on 6/23/2010 to attach PDF document to previously sealed docket entry (ryc).
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER GRANTING10 Motion to Seal 30 Indictment as to Li Qin Chen (1), Huicun Zhang (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge C. Christopher Hagy on 5/12/2010 (ryc). Modified on 6/23/2010 to attach PDF document to previously sealed docket entry (ryc).
Related: [-]
12 12 Defendant Information Sheet as to Li Qin Chen. (ryc) Modified on 6/23/2010 to attach PDF document to previously sealed docket entry. (ryc)
Related: [-]
13 13 Defendant Information Sheet as to Huicun Zhang. (ryc) Modified on 6/23/2010 to attach PDF document to previously sealed docket entry. (ryc)
Related: [-]
14 14 Praecipe filed. Arrest Warrant Issued as to Li Qin Chen and delivered to USM on 5/12/10. (ryc) Modified on 6/23/2010 to attach PDF document to previously sealed docket entry. (ryc)
Related: [-]
15 15 Praecipe filed. Arrest Warrant Issued as to Huicun Zhang and delivered to USM on 5/12/10. (ryc) Modified on 6/23/2010 to attach PDF document to previously sealed docket entry. (ryc)
Related: [-]
30 30 INDICTMENT as to Li Qin Chen (1) count(s) 1, Huicun Zhang (2) count(s) 1. (UNSEALED PURSUANT TO ORDER FILED 6/22/10) (ryc)
Related: [-]